Ford Motor Company et al v. Autel US Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ford Motor Company and Ford Global Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Autel US Inc. and Autel Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2014cv13760
Filed: September 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Flint Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Terrence G. Berg
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 57 , 65 Ieon Chens' and Launch Tech Co. LTD's Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford Motor Company et al v. Autel US Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Gregory D. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ford Global Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Gregory D. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autel US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autel Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?