Ford Motor Company et al v. Thermoanalytics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ford Motor Company and Ford Global Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Thermoanalytics, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv13992
Filed: October 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A. Drain
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Komives
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 OPINION and ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 67 . Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (DPar)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO PRECLUDE PORTIONS OF EXPERT TESTIMONY UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 37(c) 64 AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY REGARDING TOPICS ALREADY ADJUDICATED ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT 65 . Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER striking 75 Response and ordering new response brief to be filed. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (DPer)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) 48 . Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 25 . Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (DPar)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT 19 , DENYING DEFENDANTS EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY 24 AS MOOT, AND ISSUING FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford Motor Company et al v. Thermoanalytics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Gregory D. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ford Global Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Gregory D. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermoanalytics, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce L. Sendek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?