Knudson v. M/V American Spirit et al
Plaintiff: |
Jeffrey Todd Knudson |
Defendant: |
M/V American Spirit, American Steamship Company and M/V AMERICAN INTEGRITY |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv14854 |
Filed: |
December 22, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan |
Office: |
Detroit Office |
County: |
Chippewa |
Presiding Judge: |
George Caram Steeh |
Presiding Judge: |
R. Steven Whalen |
Nature of Suit: |
Marine |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 26, 2020 |
Filing
253
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 211 Second Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Reasserted Affirmative Defense of Comparative Negligence. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
|
March 25, 2020 |
Filing
252
ORDER denying 231 Motion in Limine; denying 232 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 233 Motion in Limine; denying 234 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
|
November 7, 2019 |
Filing
223
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S SECOND 212 Motion to Compel - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
|
March 20, 2019 |
Filing
181
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 144 Motion in Limine; denying 145 Motion in Limine; denying 146 Motion in Limine; granting 148 Motion in Limine; granting 149 Motion in Limine; granting 150 Motion in Limine; denying 151 Motion in Limine; denying 152 Motion in Limine; denying 153 Motion in Limine; denying 154 Motion in Limine; denying 155 Motion in Limine; see order for rulings on 157 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
|
February 26, 2019 |
Filing
142
ORDER denying defendants' Motion for Reconsideration 141 and denying defendants' cross-motion for partial summary judgment 138 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
|
January 17, 2019 |
Filing
140
ORDER granting 133 plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding enforceability of contractual maintenance rate. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
|
July 17, 2018 |
Filing
130
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 123 Motion for an Order Directing Plaintiff to Appear for a Mental Examination - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
|
April 5, 2018 |
Filing
122
ORDER Denying defendants' objections to the Magistrate Judge's decision 107 and denying plaintiff's objections to the Magistrate Judge's decision 120 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
|
February 15, 2018 |
Filing
104
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S 80 MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Reports of Paul Macellari and Maureen Ziegler, and Related Testimony - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen (CCie).
|
November 16, 2017 |
Filing
102
ORDER denying 100 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 101 Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal and to stay proceedings pending appeal. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
|
October 24, 2017 |
Filing
99
ORDER granting plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 93 , denying plaintiff's contingent Motions for Certification of interlocutory appeal and stay 95 , and denying defendants' Motion for Reconsideration or certification of interlocutory appeal 92 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
|
August 30, 2017 |
Filing
90
ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 60 , denying without prejudice plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment dismissing certain affirmative defenses 58 , denying defendants' Motion to Bifurcate 61 and sustaining in part and overruling in part defendants' objections to Order granting motion to compel 74 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?