Versata Software, Inc., et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Versata Software, Inc. and Trilogy, Inc.
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Versata Software, Inc, Trilogy Software, Inc. and Trilogy Development Group, Inc.
Petitioner: Richard B Dietl, Beau Dietl & Associates, Inc., Timothy Gilbert, Louis Zaneri and Stacey Coopes
Respondent: Manisha Tambe and Manoj Tambe
Counter Claimant: Versata Development Group, Inc.
Special Master: Larry Graham
Interested Party: Sreejit Sivasankaran
Case Number: 2:2015cv10628
Filed: February 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1045 SEALED Sur-Reply re #1030 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Ford Motor Company. by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Webb, Dan)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 MOTION for Leave to File Its Sur-Reply to Ford's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Seal (Unopposed) by Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #1044 MOTION for Leave to File Its Sur-Reply to Ford's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Seal (Unopposed) filed by Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 01/20/2023. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 11) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 4/17/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/27/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1042 REDACTED VERSION of #1041 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion by Ford Motor Company (LeRoy, John)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 SEALED REPLY to Response re #1030 Sealed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Option for Versata Surreply by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #1040 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Option for Versata Surreply filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1039 RESPONSE to #1030 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Ford Motor Company. (Redacted) filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Webb, Dan)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 SEALED RESPONSE re #1030 Sealed Motion to Ford's Renewed Motion for Judgement as a Matter of Law by Versata Software, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 ORDER Granting Versata's Unopposed #1035 Motion to File Its Response to Ford's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #1036 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (UNOPPOSED) filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (UNOPPOSED) by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 MOTION to Seal Versata's Response to Ford's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (UNOPPOSED) by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on #1018 MOTION for Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Make an Election of Remedy and #1030 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Ford Motor Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2023 at 12:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1612192641?pwd=bndYVUc3MXUwcE1BSHZ4THlUa0JPdz09 Passcode: 744944 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1612192641# or +16469641167,,1612192641#| (HRya)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on #1030 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Ford Motor Company.. Motion Hearing RESET for 3/31/2023 at 12:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1612192641?pwd=bndYVUc3MXUwcE1BSHZ4THlUa0JPdz09 Passcode: 744944 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1612192641# or +16469641167,,1612192641#| (HRya)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on #1030 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Ford Motor Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2023 at 12:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1612192641?pwd=bndYVUc3MXUwcE1BSHZ4THlUa0JPdz09 Passcode: 744944 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1612192641# or +16469641167,,1612192641#| (HRya)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 REDACTED VERSION of #1030 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Ford Motor Company. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Revised Agreed Jury Instructions) (LeRoy, John)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Revised Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions) (LeRoy, John)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1029 ORDER Granting Ford Motor Company's #1028 Unopposed Motion for Page Extension. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 MOTION for Leave to File For Page Extension - Unopposed by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law - Unopposed by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #1027 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law - Unopposed filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 REPLY to Response re #1018 MOTION for Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Make an Election of Remedy filed by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (UNOPPOSED) Re Ford's Reply Brief to 1018 by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #1025 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (UNOPPOSED) Re Ford's Reply Brief to 1018 filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER to Seal Certain Trial Transcripts. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 1/20/2023. Ford to file renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law by no later than February 17, 2023. Versata to file response by no later than March 10, 2023. Ford to file reply by no later than March 24, 2023. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HRya)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1018 MOTION for Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Make an Election of Remedy UNOPPOSED by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #1023 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1018 MOTION for Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Make an Election of Remedy UNOPPOSED filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 1/20/2023 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 RESPONSE to #1018 MOTION for Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Make an Election of Remedy filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 ORDER Granting #1019 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1018 MOTION for Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Make an Election of Remedy. Response due by 1/13/2023, Reply due by 1/27/2023.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1018 MOTION for Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Make an Election of Remedy by Versata Software, Inc.. (Mitby, Steven)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 MOTION for Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Make an Election of Remedy by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 MOTION to Seal (UNOPPOSED) by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 11/10/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 20) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 12/29/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #1017 MOTION to Seal (UNOPPOSED) filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 MOTION (Ex Parte) to Redact Trial Transcripts re #972 Transcript,,, #968 Transcript, #962 Transcript,,, #975 Transcript,,, #974 Transcript, #967 Transcript,,, by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redaction Request-Transcript, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Carter, Matthew)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 11/10/2022. Ford to file motion regarding election of remedies by no later than December 8, 2022. Versata to file response no later than January 6, 2023. Ford to file reply by January 20, 2023. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HRya)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 REDACTED Version of #997 SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 13-A held on 10/21/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2023. (Smith, R.)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 REDACTED Version of #974 SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 7-A held on 10/13/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2023. (Smith, R.)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 REDACTED Version of #968 SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 5-A held on 10/11/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2023. (Smith, R.)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 ORDER Granting Versata's #1009 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines to Request Trial Transcript Redactions. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 REDACTED Version of #962 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 4-B held on 10/07/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2023. (Cavanagh, Linda)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 MOTION TO EXTEND Deadlines to Request Trial Transcript Redactions (Unopposed) by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 16 held on 10/26/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 15) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/21/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 15 held on 10/25/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 58) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/21/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 14 held on 10/24/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 255) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/21/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 11/10/2022 at 2:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 Jury Verdict Form. (HRya)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Jury Trial Held and Completed on 10/26/2022. Jury Deliberation also held and JURY VERDICT REACHED. (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (HRya)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 SEALED Identification and Description of Each Component Comprising Each of the Four Alleged Combination Trade Secrets Asserted by Versata. (HRya)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 10/25/2022. Jury Deliberation also held. Jury Deliberations CONTINUED for 10/26/2022 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (HRya)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) (CORRECTED) re #999 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) by Ford Motor Company. by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 MOTION to Seal #999 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) by Ford Motor Company. by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 999 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 998 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages UNOPPOSED by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 10/24/2022. CONTINUED Jury Trial set for 10/25/2022 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (HRya)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 10/24/2022 re #1001 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) (CORRECTED) re #999 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) by Ford Motor Company filed by Ford Motor Company Disposition: Motion Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (HRya)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #1000 MOTION to Seal #999 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
October 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 997 SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 13-A held on 10/21/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 214) Attorneys of record may purchase a copy of the transcript from the Court Reporter/Transcriber. (Smith, R.)
October 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 996 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 13-B held on 10/21/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 91) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/14/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 995 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 12-B held on 10/20/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 122) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/14/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 994 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 12-A held on 10/20/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 133) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/14/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50 by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (HRya)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 10/21/2022. CONTINUED Jury Trial set for 10/24/2022 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith and Linda Cavanagh) (HRya)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: ORAL Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2022 re MOTION for Judgment filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. Disposition: Motion Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (HRya)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 993 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company filing Ford's Proposed Jury Instruction on Misappropriation of Combinations (Lewry, Thomas) Modified on 10/21/2022 (SKra).[WRONG EVENT USED-PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS]
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 992 NOTICE OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (HRya)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 991 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 11-B held on 10/19/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 129) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 990 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 11-A held on 10/19/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 114) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 989 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 10-A held on 10/18/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 193) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 10/20/2022. CONTINUED Jury Trial set for 10/21/2022 at 8:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith and Linda Cavanagh) (HRya)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 988 Bench Order rendered at a hearing held on 10/19/2022 before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Granting ORAL MOTION to Withdraw #976 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Testimony by Paul Seiler. (TEXT-ONLY, NO IMAGE ATTACHED) (HRya)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 10/19/2022. CONTINUED Jury Trial set for 10/20/2022 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith and Linda Cavanagh) (HRya)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL MOTION to Withdraw #976 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Testimony by Paul Seiler by Versata Development Group, Inc.. (HRya)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 987 NOTICE by Versata Software, Inc. Letter Brief re Exemplary Damages under DTSA (Zuidema, Samuel)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 986 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 10-B held on 10/18/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 28) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 985 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 9-B held on 10/17/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 125) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 984 ORDER Granting Versata's #982 Ex Parte Motion to File Its Trial Brief Regarding Ford's Claimed Implementation of Design Arounds and Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 983 TRIAL BRIEF re Anticipated Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Versata Software, Inc. (Zuidema, Samuel)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 10/18/2022 re ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Ford Motor Company. Disposition: Motion Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HRya)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 10/18/2022. CONTINUED Jury Trial set for 10/19/2022 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith and Linda Cavanagh) (HRya) Modified on 10/18/2022 (HRya).
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 982 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Trial Brief Regarding Ford's Claimed Implementation of Design-Arounds and Exhibits by Versata Software, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 981 SEALED Trial Brief re Ford's Claimed Implementation of Design-Arounds by Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Ford Supp. Resp. to ROG 37 (sic 38), #3 Exhibit B - 2022.10.1 Lewry Email, #4 Exhibit C - 2021.11.24 Myers Report Experts) (Zuidema, Samuel)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 980 RESPONSE to #976 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Testimony by Paul Seiler filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt of 6-1-17 Seiler Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of DX-0166 at VRS01477935) (Lewry, Thomas)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 979 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 9-A held on 10/17/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 63) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/7/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 978 ERRATA Sheet re: #975 Transcript, Corrections were made to the Table of Contents, pages 3 and 4. Corrections are as follows: PX 4813, PX 0168 and DX 0080 added to the list of exhibits, DX 0497 was a typographical error and corrected to accurately reflect DX 0437. (Smith, R.)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 977 ERRATA Sheet re: #969 Transcript, Corrections to pages 4 and 17 of the transcript. Correction to page 4: DX 0114 corrected to accurately reflect DX 0144. Correction to page 17: PX 1791 on line 13 corrected to accurately reflect PX 1792. (Smith, R.)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 976 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Testimony by Paul Seiler by Versata Development Group, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 10/17/2022. CONTINUED Jury Trial set for 10/18/2022 at 8:15 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith and Linda Cavanagh) (HRya)
October 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 975 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 8-A held on 10/14/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 173) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/7/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
October 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 974 SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 7-A held on 10/13/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 145) Attorneys of record may purchase a copy of the transcript from the Court Reporter/Transcriber. (Smith, R.)
October 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 973 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 8-B held on 10/14/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 80) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/7/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/15/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 972 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 7-B held on 10/13/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 136) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/4/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 10/14/2022. CONTINUED Jury Trial set for 10/17/2022 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith and Linda Cavanagh) (HRya)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 971 ERRATA Sheet re: #961 Transcript of Jury Trial: Volume 4-A. Corrections were made to the Table of Contents, page 4. Corrections are as follows: DX 0657 was a typographical error and has been corrected to accurately reflect DX 0651; and PX 2294 was included in the index of exhibits. (Smith, R.)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 970 ERRATA Sheet re: #956 Transcript of Jury Trial: Volume 3-A. Corrections were made to the Table of Contents, page 3. Corrections are as follows: PX 0102 was a typographical error and has been corrected to accurately reflect PX 0128; and PX 0153, PX 0154, PX 0166, PX 0576, PX 1017, PX 4914 and PX 4915 were included in the index of exhibits. (Smith, R.)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 969 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 6-A held on 10/12/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 180) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/3/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 968 SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 5-A held on 10/11/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 161) Attorneys of record may purchase a copy of the transcript from the Court Reporter/Transcriber. (Smith, R.)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 967 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 6-B held on 10/12/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 122) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/3/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 10/13/2022. CONTINUED Jury Trial set for 10/14/2022 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith and Linda Cavanagh) (HRya)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 966 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 5-B held on 10/11/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 125) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/2/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 965 REVISED Version of #960 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 3-B held on 10/06/2022. Revision made: Revised Exhibit Page (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) ( Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2023.) (Cavanagh, Linda) Modified on 10/14/2022: Corrected docket entry. (JPur)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 964 TRIAL BRIEF on Ultimate Legal Question by Ford Motor Company (Lewry, Thomas)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 10/12/2022. CONTINUED Jury Trial set for 10/13/2022 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith and Linda Cavanagh) (HRya)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 963 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Trade Secret Disclosure by Versata Development Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bladeroom Verdict Form, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cajun Services Verdict Form, #3 Exhibit 3 - Comet Technologies v. XP Power, #4 Exhibit 4 - Expeditors Intl Verdict Form, #5 Exhibit 5 - Florida Beauty Flora v. Pro Intermodal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Loco Brands v. Butler America, #7 Exhibit 7 - MSC Verdict Form, #8 Exhibit 8 - ResMan Verdict Form, #9 Exhibit 9 - Trench Tech v. Tech Con Trenching, #10 Exhibit 10 - Workplace Technologies v. Project Management Institute, #11 Exhibit 11 - XTEC Verdict Form, #12 Exhibit 12 - Zest Labs v. Wal-Mart, #13 Exhibit 13 - Coda Developers) (Carter, Matthew)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 10/11/2022. CONTINUED Jury Trial set for 10/12/2022 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith and Linda Cavanagh) (HRya)
October 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 962 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 4-B held on 10/07/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 83) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/31/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
October 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 961 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 4-A held on 10/07/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 161) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/31/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 960 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 3-B held on 10/06/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 165) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/28/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 959 REDACTED VERSION of #940 Sealed Document - Other by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. (Zuidema, Samuel)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 958 REDACTED VERSION of #941 Sealed Document - Other by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. (Zuidema, Samuel)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 957 REDACTED VERSION of #949 Sealed Document - Other,, by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. (Zuidema, Samuel)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 956 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial - Volume 3-A held on 10/06/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 159) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/28/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 10/7/2022. CONTINUED Jury Trial set for 10/11/2022 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith and Linda Cavanagh) (HRya)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 955 NOTICE by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. re Bench Brief Regarding the Disclosure of Exhibits for the Cross Examination of Adverse Withesses (Carter, Matthew)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 954 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial: Volume 2-B held on 10/05/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 145) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/27/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 953 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial (Volume 2-A) held on 10/05/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 164) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/27/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Jury Trial Held and Continued on 10/6/2022. CONTINUED Jury Trial set for 10/7/2022 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith and Linda Cavanagh)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 952 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Bench Brief on Adverse Witnesses as Part of Versata's Case-in-Chief (LeRoy, John)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 951 ORDER (1) Granting Versata's #942 Motion to Seal the Courtroom and (2) Terminating Versata's #920 Motion for Clarification. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 950 ORDER Granting Versata's #948 Motion (1) to File with Redactions Its Offer of Proof and Supporting Memorandum Regarding PX-3896 (and Exhibits Like It), and (2) to File Under Seal Exhibits in Support. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Jury Trial Begun and Continued on 10/5/2022. CONTINUED Jury Trial set for 10/6/2022 at 8:15 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Court Reporters: Rob Smith and Linda Cavanagh) (HRya)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 949 SEALED Versata's Offer of Proof and Supporting Memorandum Regarding PX-3896 (and Exhibits Like It) by Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Dkt. 947, Trial Transcript Day 1, #3 Exhibit PX-0128, #4 Exhibit PX-0433, #5 Exhibit Yakov Fradkin Deposition Transcript - Excerpts, #6 Exhibit PX-0440, #7 Exhibit PX-4114, #8 Exhibit Jiri Culik Deposition Transcript - Excerpts, #9 Exhibit PX-3896, #10 Exhibit PX-3895, #11 Exhibit PX-0608, #12 Exhibit PX-0609, #13 Exhibit PX-4863, #14 Exhibit PX-4864, #15 Exhibit PX-0100) (Zuidema, Samuel)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 948 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Offer of Proof and Supporting Memorandum Under Seal by Versata Software, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 947 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial - Volume 1 held on 10/04/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith - ph. 313.234.2612) (Number of Pages: 51) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/25/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Voir Dire Begun and Concluded and Jury Impaneled on 10/4/2022. CONTINUED Jury Trial set for 10/5/2022 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HRya)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 945 ORDER of Dismissal Regarding Patent Claims. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 944 RESPONSE to #920 MOTION for Clarification of the Order Granting Ford's Motion in Limine to Exclude McMahon's "New" "Lost Profits" Contract Damages Opinions re #916 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Sealed Motion,, Order on Motion fo filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt from Elson 11-13-18 dep transcript) (Lewry, Thomas)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #935 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Its Responses to Ford's Objections to (1) Versata's Separate Proposed Jury Instructions, and (2) Certain of the Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Versata Software, Inc., #936 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Ford's Responses to Objections to its (1) Separate Proposed Jury Instructions, (2) Certain of the Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions, and (3) Proposed Verdict Form filed by Ford Motor Company, #929 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Its Letter Brief With Redactions and the Accompanying Exhibits Under Seal filed by Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
October 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 943 STIPULATION of Dismissal Patent Infringement Claims by Ford Motor Company, Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. (Mitby, Steven)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 942 MOTION to Seal Courtroom and Trial Records for Limited Portions of Trial Pertaining to Trade Secrets by Versata Software, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 941 SEALED Responses to Ford's Objections to Certain of the Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions (ECF 922) by Versata Software, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 940 SEALED Responses to Ford's Objections to Versata's Separate Proposed Jury Instructions (ECF 921) by Versata Software, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 939 SEALED Ford's Response to Versata's Objections to Ford's Additions to Revised Proposed Agreed Jury Instructions re #925 Sealed Document - Other by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 938 SEALED Ford's Response to Versata's Objections to Ford Proposed Jury Instructions re #924 Sealed Document - Other by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 937 SEALED Ford's Response to Versata Objections to Ford Proposed Verdict Form re #926 Sealed Document - Other by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 936 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Ford's Responses to Objections to its (1) Separate Proposed Jury Instructions, (2) Certain of the Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions, and (3) Proposed Verdict Form by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 935 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Its Responses to Ford's Objections to (1) Versata's Separate Proposed Jury Instructions, and (2) Certain of the Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions by Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 934 SEALED Letter Brief to Judge Leitman by Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 8/26/2015 Declaration of Michael Sullivan (Sealed), #3 Exhibit B - 12/31/2015 Ford's Responses to Defendants' First Interrogatories (Sealed), #4 Exhibit C - 9/7/2016 Declaration of Frederick Wilkinson (Sealed), #5 Exhibit D - 9/7/2016 Declaration of Yakov Fradkin (Sealed)) (Carter, Matthew)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 933 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Letter Brief to Judge Leitman with attached Ex. A - Subpoenas (Lewry, Thomas)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 932 OBJECTION to Ford's Proposed Additions to the Revised Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions (REDACTED) by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 931 OBJECTION to Ford's Proposed Jury Instructions (REDACTED) by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 930 NOTICE by Versata Software, Inc. of Letter Brief to Judge Leitman (Public Redacted) (Carter, Matthew)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 929 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Its Letter Brief With Redactions and the Accompanying Exhibits Under Seal by Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 928 OBJECTION to Ford's Proposed Verdict Form (REDACTED) by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 927 MOTION to Seal #921 Objection, #922 Objection by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #923 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Versata's Objections to Ford's Proposed Jury Instructions, Additions to Revised Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions, and Verdict Form filed by Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #927 MOTION to Seal #921 Objection, #922 Objection filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 926 SEALED Versata's Objections to Ford's Proposed Verdict Form by Versata Software, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 925 SEALED Versata's Objections to Ford's Additions to Revised Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions by Versata Software, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 924 SEALED Versata's Objections to Ford's Proposed Jury Instructions by Versata Software, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 923 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Versata's Objections to Ford's Proposed Jury Instructions, Additions to Revised Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions, and Verdict Form by Versata Software, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 922 *SEALED* OBJECTION to Disputed Portions of the Revised Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas) Modified on 9/23/2022 (HRya).
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 921 *SEALED* OBJECTION to Versata's Revised Proposed Jury Instructions by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas) Modified on 9/23/2022 (HRya).
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 920 MOTION for Clarification of the Order Granting Ford's Motion in Limine to Exclude McMahon's "New" "Lost Profits" Contract Damages Opinions re #916 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Sealed Motion,, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability, Order on Motion - Free, Order on Motion to Strike, #860 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendants' New Damages Expert's "Lost Profits" Contract Damages Opinions Introduced in "Reply" Expert Report by Ford Motor Company. by Versata Development Group, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 919 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearings held on 09/12/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 122) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/6/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2022. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 918 REDACTED VERSION of #902 Sealed Document - Other,, by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 8/4/2022 Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit B - 12/20/2017 Deposition Transcript of Dr. Sam Malek, #4 Exhibit C - 4/24/2018 Hearing Transcript, #5 Exhibit D - 12/11/2019 Hearing Transcript, #6 Exhibit E - 9/28/2021 Hearing Transcript) (Webb, Dan)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 917 REDACTED VERSION of #901 Sealed Response to Motion, by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 12/8/2017 Deposition of Dr. Craig T. Elson, #3 Exhibit B - 12/20/2017 Deposition of Dr. Sam Malek) (Webb, Dan)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 916 ORDER Resolving #820 , #833 , #860 , #875 , #878 , #881 and #914 Pretrial Motions. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2022 re #820 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata Changing Its Trade Secret Theory and to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc., #881 MOTION to (Conditionally) Withdraw its Consent to a "Combination" Trade Secret Theory and Reinstate the Damages Exclusion Order (ECF No. 678) filed by Ford Motor Company, #875 MOTION for Reconsideration re #866 Order on Sealed Motion Versata's Motion in Limine to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments filed by Versata Software, Inc., #860 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendants' New Damages Expert's "Lost Profits" Contract Damages Opinions Introduced in "Reply" Expert Report by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company, #833 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc., #878 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability for Orders (Dkts. 866, 507 & 724) filed by Versata Development Group, Inc. and Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/12/2022. Disposition: Order to Follow. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HRya)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 915 Joint Stipulated Order to Revise Case Caption. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (SSch)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 914 MOTION to Strike #903 Supplemental Brief by Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion Hearings Transcript) (Zuidema, Samuel)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 913 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company re #875 MOTION for Reconsideration re #866 Order on Sealed Motion Versata's Motion in Limine to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments, #878 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability for Orders (Dkts. 866, 507 & 724) SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ValentineJohnson v Roche, #2 Exhibit B - Murray v Silberstein, #3 Exhibit C - 18 Moore Federal Practice - Civil - judicial estoppel) (Lewry, Thomas)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 912 NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on #833 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.., #875 MOTION for Reconsideration re #866 Order on Sealed Motion Versata's Motion in Limine to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments, #878 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability for Orders (Dkts. 866, 507 & 724), #881 MOTION to (Conditionally) Withdraw its Consent to a "Combination" Trade Secret Theory and Reinstate the Damages Exclusion Order (ECF No. 678) , #820 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata Changing Its Trade Secret Theory and to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments, #860 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendants' New Damages Expert's "Lost Profits" Contract Damages Opinions Introduced in "Reply" Expert Report by Ford Motor Company. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2022 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 911 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company re #860 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendants' New Damages Expert's "Lost Profits" Contract Damages Opinions Introduced in "Reply" Expert Report by Ford Motor Company. Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Children's Broadcasting Corp. v. Walt Disney Co) (Lewry, Thomas)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 910 SEALED EXHIBIT Index and Exhibits to ECF 909 by Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Zuidema, Samuel)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 909 REPLY to Response re #875 MOTION for Reconsideration re #866 Order on Sealed Motion Versata's Motion in Limine to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments filed by Versata Software, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 908 REPLY to Response re #878 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability for Orders (Dkts. 866, 507 & 724) filed by Versata Software, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 907 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 (Shamos Report) re #906 Reply to Response to Motion, by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 906 REPLY to Response re #881 MOTION to (Conditionally) Withdraw its Consent to a "Combination" Trade Secret Theory and Reinstate the Damages Exclusion Order (ECF No. 678) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CONFIDENTIAL Shamos Report) (Lewry, Thomas)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 905 MOTION to Seal UNOPPOSED to Seal Exhibit to Reply Brief in Support of Motion ECF No. 678 by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #905 MOTION to Seal UNOPPOSED to Seal Exhibit to Reply Brief in Support of Motion ECF No. 678 filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 904 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Reply in Support of Versata's Motion for Reconsideration (Unopposed) by Versata Software, Inc.. (Zuidema, Samuel)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 903 [STRICKEN] SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #902 Sealed Document - Other,, Supplemental Reply of Ford to Versata Supplemental Response re its MIL Part I filed by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas) Modified on 9/13/2022 (HRya).
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #904 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Reply in Support of Versata's Motion for Reconsideration (Unopposed) filed by Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 902 SEALED Supplemental Response Brief In Support of Part I of Versata's Motion in Limine To Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata "Changing" Its Trade Secret Theory and to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments re #880 Sealed Document - Other, by Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 8/4/2022 Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit B - 12/20/2017 Deposition Transcript of Dr. Sam Malek, #4 Exhibit C - 4/24/2018 Hearing Transcript, #5 Exhibit D - 12/11/2019 Hearing Transcript, #6 Exhibit E - 9/28/2021 Hearing Transcript) (Drosick, John)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 901 SEALED RESPONSE re #881 Motion to (Conditionally) Withdraw Its "Consent" to a Combination Trade Secret Theory and to Reinstate the Damages Exclusion Order by Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 12/8/2017 Deposition of Dr. Craig T. Elson, #3 Exhibit B - 12/20/2017 Deposition of Dr. Sam Malek) (Drosick, John)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 900 SEALED EXHIBIT B - Motion Hearing Transcript re #892 MOTION to Redact Transcript (Unopposed) by Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 899 RESPONSE to #875 MOTION for Reconsideration re #866 Order on Sealed Motion Versata's Motion in Limine to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments filed by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 898 RESPONSE to #878 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability for Orders (Dkts. 866, 507 & 724) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 897 MOTION to File Its Supplemental Brief in Support of Part I of Its Motion In Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata "Changing" Its Trade Secret Theory and To Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments and Certain Exhibits Under Seal by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #896 Ex Parte MOTION to File Its Opposition to Ford's Motion to (Conditionally) Withdraw Its "Consent" to a Combination Trade Secret Theory and to Reinstate the Damages Exclusion Order Under Seal filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #897 MOTION to File Its Supplemental Brief in Support of Part I of Its Motion In Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata "Changing" Its Trade Secret Theory and To Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments and Certain Exhibits Under Seal filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 896 Ex Parte MOTION to File Its Opposition to Ford's Motion to (Conditionally) Withdraw Its "Consent" to a Combination Trade Secret Theory and to Reinstate the Damages Exclusion Order Under Seal by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 895 ORDER Granting Versata's #892 Motion to Redact Transcript. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 894 ORDER Granting Ford's Unopposed #891 Motion for Leave to Take De Bene Esse Deposition of Mr. Martin Pipoly. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #893 Ex Parte MOTION to File Exhibit B to Motion to Redact Transcript Under Seal filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 893 Ex Parte MOTION to File Exhibit B to Motion to Redact Transcript Under Seal by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 892 MOTION to Redact Transcript (Unopposed) by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Carter, Matthew)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 891 MOTION For Leave to Take de bene esse Deposition of Mr. Martin Pipoly UNOPPOSED by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 890 [STRICKEN] SEALED MOTION In Limine by Versata Development Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Versata's Witness List, #2 Exhibit Ford's Witness List, #3 Exhibit Versata's Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit Ford's Exhibit List, #5 Exhibit Excerpts from the Joint Supplemental Reply Expert Report of Renee McMahon and Christopher Bokhart detailing Versatas trade secret misappropriation damages calculations, #6 Exhibit Excerpts from the Joint Supplemental Reply Expert Report of Renee McMahon and Christopher Bokhart detailing Versatas breach of contract damages calculations, #7 Index of Exhibits) (Carter, Matthew) Modified on 8/30/2022 (HRya).
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Striking #890 SEALED MOTION In Limine by Versata Development Group, Inc.. filed by Versata Development Group, Inc., and Terminating as Moot #889 MOTION for Leave to File Joint Final Pretrial Order with Redactions and Certain Exhibits Under Seal filed by Versata Development Group, Inc. **THE JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER MUST BE SUBMITTED AS A PROPOSED ORDER THROUGH THE PROPOSED ORDER UTILITY IN CM/ECF** Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 889 MOTION for Leave to File Joint Final Pretrial Order with Redactions and Certain Exhibits Under Seal by Versata Development Group, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 888 SEALED Joint Stipulation regarding certain Motions in Limine by Versata Software, Inc.. (Krajewski, Sarah)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 887 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Joint Stipulation Regarding Certain Motions in Limine Under Seal by Versata Software, Inc.. (Krajewski, Sarah)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #887 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Joint Stipulation Regarding Certain Motions in Limine Under Seal filed by Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 886 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyung Kim on behalf of Versata Software, Inc.. (Kim, Kyung)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 885 REDACTED VERSION of #880 Sealed Document - Other, Ford's Supplemental Response to Versata Motion in Limine (ECF 820, Part 1) by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Versata Response to Ford First Interrogatories) (Lewry, Thomas)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 884 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynn Ellsworth on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Ellsworth, Jessica)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 883 REDACTED VERSION of #877 Sealed Exhibit, B - Sample Correct Jury Instruction by Versata Software, Inc. (Drosick, John)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 882 REDACTED VERSION of #876 Sealed Exhibit, A - Sample Incorrect Jury Instruction by Versata Software, Inc. (Drosick, John)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 881 MOTION to (Conditionally) Withdraw its Consent to a "Combination" Trade Secret Theory and Reinstate the Damages Exclusion Order (ECF No. 678) by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 880 SEALED Supplemental Response to Versata Motion in Limine ECF 820, Part 1 re #820 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata Changing Its Trade Secret Theory and to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts to Versata Responses to Ford's 1st Interrogatories) (Lewry, Thomas)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 879 ORDER Directing Ford Motor Company to Respond to (1) Versata's #875 Motion for Reconsideration and (2) Versata's #878 Motion to Certify Orders for Interlocutory Appeal. Response due by 9/2/2022, Reply due by 9/7/2022. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 878 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability for Orders (Dkts. 866, 507 & 724) by Versata Development Group, Inc.. (Drosick, John)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 877 SEALED EXHIBIT B - Sample Correct Jury Instruction re #875 MOTION for Reconsideration re #866 Order on Sealed Motion Versata's Motion in Limine to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments by Versata Software, Inc.. (Drosick, John)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 876 SEALED EXHIBIT A - Sample Incorrect Jury Instruction re #875 MOTION for Reconsideration re #866 Order on Sealed Motion Versata's Motion in Limine to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments by Versata Software, Inc.. (Drosick, John)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 875 MOTION for Reconsideration re #866 Order on Sealed Motion Versata's Motion in Limine to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments by Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits) (Drosick, John)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 874 REPLY to Response re #860 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendants' New Damages Expert's "Lost Profits" Contract Damages Opinions Introduced in "Reply" Expert Report by Ford Motor Company. REDACTED filed by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 873 SEALED REPLY to Response re #860 Sealed Motion,, by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 872 MOTION to File Exhibits to Motion for Reconsideration Under Seal (UNOPPOSED) by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #872 MOTION to File Exhibits to Motion for Reconsideration Under Seal (UNOPPOSED) filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 871 REDACTED VERSION of #869 Sealed Response to Motion,, Versata's Opposition to Ford's Motion in Limine to Exclude Defendants' New Damages Expert's "Lost Profits" Contract Damages Opinions Introduced in "Reply" Expert Report by Versata Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Excerpt of Davis Suppl Rebuttal Expert Report, #3 Exhibit 5-26-2022 Email Chain, #4 Exhibit 4-8-2022 Hearing Transcript (Excerpt), #5 Exhibit PX-0822, #6 Exhibit PX-0815) (Drosick, John)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 870 MOTION to Seal #866 Order on Sealed Motion Supplemental Brief Opposing Versata's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata Changing its Trade Secret Theory and to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments (ECF 820) by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #870 MOTION to Seal #866 Order on Sealed Motion Supplemental Brief Opposing Versata's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata Changing its Trade Secret Theory and to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments (ECF 820) filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 869 SEALED RESPONSE re #860 Sealed Motion,, Versata's Opposition to Ford's Motion in Limine to Exclude Defendants' New Damages Expert's "Lost Profits" Contract Damages Opinions Introduced in "Reply" Expert Report by Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Excerpt of Davis Suppl Rebuttal Expert Report, #3 Exhibit 5-26-2022 Email Chain, #4 Exhibit 4-8-2022 Hearing Transcript (Excerpt), #5 Exhibit PX-0822, #6 Exhibit PX-0815) (Drosick, John)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 868 Ex Parte MOTION to File Its Opposition to Ford's Motion In Limine Regarding Expert Contract Damages Opinions With Redactions and Certain Exhibits Under Seal by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #868 Ex Parte MOTION to File Its Opposition to Ford's Motion In Limine Regarding Expert Contract Damages Opinions With Redactions and Certain Exhibits Under Seal filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 867 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearings held on 08/04/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 193) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 8/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2022. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 866 ORDER on #820 , #833 and #834 Motions in Limine. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 8/4/2022 re #820 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata Changing Its Trade Secret Theory and to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc., #834 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company, #833 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. Disposition: Order to Follow. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HRya)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 865 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company re #835 Sealed Response to Motion, #844 Sealed Response to Motion,, Supplemental Authority in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - TSMC N. Am. v. SMIC Ams.) (Lewry, Thomas)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 864 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Monica Teresa Kociolek appearing on behalf of Versata Software, Inc. (Kociolek, Monica)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 863 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brian J. Nisbet appearing on behalf of Versata Software, Inc. (Nisbet, Brian)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 862 NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on #833 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.., #834 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Ford Motor Company., #820 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata Changing Its Trade Secret Theory and to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2022 at 9:00 AM (**TIME CHANGE ONLY**) before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 861 REDACTED VERSION of #860 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendants' New Damages Expert's "Lost Profits" Contract Damages Opinions Introduced in "Reply" Expert Report by Ford Motor Company. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - [CONF] ONLY UNDER SEAL - 2022-07-06 Joint Suppl Expert Reply Report of McMahon-Bokhart, #3 Exhibit 2 - 2022-06-10 Email Mitby to Lewry re Versata reply expert reports and motions in limine, #4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt from Mike Richards Dep Tr 2-8-17) (LeRoy, John)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #859 MOTION to Seal Ford's Motion in Limine to Exclude New Damages Expert's "Lost Profits" Contract Damages Opinions filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 860 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendants' New Damages Expert's "Lost Profits" Contract Damages Opinions Introduced in "Reply" Expert Report by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - [CONF] 2022-07-06 Joint Suppl Expert Reply Report of McMahon-Bokhart, #3 Exhibit 2 - 2022-06-10 Email Mitby to Lewry re Versata reply expert reports and motions in limine, #4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt from Mike Richards Dep Tr 2-8-17) (LeRoy, John)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 859 MOTION to Seal Ford's Motion in Limine to Exclude New Damages Expert's "Lost Profits" Contract Damages Opinions by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 858 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Samuel Zuidema appearing on behalf of Versata Software, Inc. (Zuidema, Samuel)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 857 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John E. Drosick appearing on behalf of Versata Software, Inc. (Drosick, John)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 856 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Krajewski on behalf of Versata Software, Inc.. (Krajewski, Sarah)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 855 NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on #833 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.., #834 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Ford Motor Company., #820 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata Changing Its Trade Secret Theory and to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2022 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 854 REPLY to Response re #833 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (REDACTED) filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 853 SEALED REPLY to Response re #833 Sealed Motion, Second Amended Omnibus Motions in Limine by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A (PX-1147), #3 Exhibit B (Myers Report Excerpts), #4 Exhibit C (Davis Report Excerpts), #5 Exhibit D (MSSA)) (Carter, Matthew)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 852 REDACTED VERSION of #851 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, in Limine by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - [CONF] Culik 6-2-17 deposition transcript excerpt, #3 Exhibit 2 - [CONF] Nichols 2-28-17 deposition transcript excerpt, #4 Exhibit 3 - Kim 8-2-19 email with attached Notice of Joint Stipulation, #5 Exhibit 4 - Krajewski 3-11-20 email with attached Notice of Joint Stipulation) (LeRoy, John)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 851 SEALED REPLY to Response re #834 Sealed Motion in Limine by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - [CONF] Culik 6-2-17 deposition transcript excerpt, #3 Exhibit 2 - [CONF] Nichols 2-28-17 deposition transcript excerpt, #4 Exhibit 3 - Kim 8-2-19 email with attached Notice of Joint Stipulation, #5 Exhibit 4 - Krajewski 3-11-20 email with attached Notice of Joint Stipulation) (LeRoy, John)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 850 JOINT STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Page Limit for Replies in Support of Motions in Limine. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 849 ORDER Granting #847 Joint Motion for Leave to File Replies in Support of Motions in Limine Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 848 RESPONSE to #834 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Ford Motor Company. (REDACTED) filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 847 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Replies in Support of Motions In Limine Under Seal by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 846 REDACTED VERSION of #844 Sealed Response to Motion,, by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - CONF & ONLY UNDER SEAL - Excerpt from Sullivan 5-25-17 Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit 2 - CONF & ONLY UNDER SEAL - Excerpt from Malek 12-20-17 Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit 3 - CONF & ONLY UNDER SEAL - Excerpt from 3-12-19 Versata Supplemental ROG responses, #5 Exhibit 4 - Fractus Decision, #6 Exhibit 5 - Fractus MIL, #7 Exhibit 6 - CONF & ONLY UNDER SEAL - Excerpt from 11-24-21 Myers Rebuttal Expert Report, #8 Exhibit 7 - CONF & ONLY UNDER SEAL - Excerpt from 11-24-21 Davis Supplemental Expert Report, #9 Exhibit 8 - CONF & ONLY UNDER SEAL - VRS145696-145703, #10 Exhibit 9 - CONF & ONLY UNDER SEAL - VRS00312498) (LeRoy, John)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #843 Joint MOTION to Seal Responses to Motions in Limine filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 845 SEALED RESPONSE re #834 Sealed Motion by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P) (Carter, Matthew)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 844 SEALED RESPONSE re #833 Sealed Motion, Versata's 2nd Omnibus Motions in Limine, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - CONF - Excerpt from Sullivan 5-25-17 Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit 2 - CONF - Excerpt from Malek 12-20-17 Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit 3 - CONF - Excerpt from 3-12-19 Versata Supplemental ROG responses, #5 Exhibit 4 - Fractus Decision, #6 Exhibit 5 - Fractus MIL, #7 Exhibit 6 - CONF - Excerpt from 11-24-21 Myers Rebuttal Expert Report, #8 Exhibit 7 - CONF - Excerpt from 11-24-21 Davis Supplemental Expert Report, #9 Exhibit 8 - CONF - VRS145696-145703, #10 Exhibit 9 - CONF - VRS00312498) (LeRoy, John)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 843 Joint MOTION to Seal Responses to Motions in Limine by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 842 REPLY to Response re #820 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata Changing Its Trade Secret Theory and to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments filed by Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #841 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 841 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 840 JOINT STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Deadline and Page Limit for Versata's Reply in Support of Its #820 MOTION in Limine Regarding Trade Secret Law and Theories. Reply due by 6/30/2022. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 839 REDACTED VERSION of #837 Sealed Document - Other,, Opposition to Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata Changing Its Trade Secret Theory and to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments #820 by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Confidential - Only Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit B - Confidential - Only Filed Under Seal) (LeRoy, John)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 838 REDACTED VERSION of #833 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit E) (Carter, Matthew)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 837 SEALED CORRECTED Response to Replace #835 Response re #820 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata Changing Its Trade Secret Theory and to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments, #835 Sealed Response to Motion, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - [CONF] Excerpt of Versata 2015-12-31 Resp to Ford ROG 3 with Ex A to ROGs, #3 Exhibit B - [CONF] Versata 2016-07-18 Supp Rsp to Ford ROG 3 including Krauss Declaration) (LeRoy, John)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 836 REDACTED VERSION of #834 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Ford Motor Company. by Ford Motor Company (LeRoy, John)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 835 SEALED RESPONSE re #820 Motion in Limine, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - [CONF] Excerpt of Versata 2015-12-31 Resp to Ford ROG 3 with Ex. A to ROG, #3 Exhibit B - [CONF] Versata 2016-07-18 Supp Rsp to Ford ROG 3 including Krauss Declaration) (LeRoy, John)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 834 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 833 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L) (Carter, Matthew)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 832 MOTION to Seal (UNOPPOSED) its Opposition to Versata's Motion in Limine ECF No. 820 by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #832 MOTION to Seal (UNOPPOSED) its Opposition to Versata's Motion in Limine ECF No. 820 filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ORDER Granting Ford's #829 Unopposed Motion to Seal Under Seal Its Motions In Limine. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 830 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Motions in Limine Under Seal (Unopposed) by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 829 MOTION to Seal (UNOPPOSED) its Motions in Limine by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #830 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Motions in Limine Under Seal (Unopposed) filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 828 STIPULATION Regarding Pretrial and Trial Procedures (JOINT) by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. (Carter, Matthew)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 827 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's #818 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 826 RESPONSE to #818 MOTION for Reconsideration re #817 Order on Motion in Limine filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Carter, Matthew)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 825 JOINT STIPULATED ORDER to Exceed Page Limit for In Limine Motions. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 824 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #820 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata Changing Its Trade Secret Theory and to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments -- UNOPPOSED by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Grsnting #824 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #820 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata Changing Its Trade Secret Theory and to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments -- UNOPPOSED filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 823 WITNESS LIST by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. (Carter, Matthew)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 822 Exhibit List by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 821 Rule 26(a)(3) Initial Exhibit List and WITNESS LIST by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ford Initial Exhibit List) (LeRoy, John)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 820 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument About Versata Changing Its Trade Secret Theory and to Prohibit Incorrect Legal Arguments by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Carter, Matthew)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 819 ORDER Requiring Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's #818 Motion for Reconsideration. Response due by 6/9/2022. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 818 MOTION for Reconsideration re #817 Order on Motion in Limine by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 817 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's #803 Motion in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Relying on Contract Damages Theories. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 816 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company re #803 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Relying on Contract Damages Theories and Calculations not Disclosed in Discovery Notice of Supplemental Record Citations (LeRoy, John)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 815 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 04/08/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 71) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 5/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2022. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 814 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS AND TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2022 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman, Jury Trial set for 10/4/2022 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (HRya)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 4/8/2022 re #803 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Relying on Contract Damages Theories and Calculations not Disclosed in Discovery filed by Ford Motor Company. Disposition: Motion Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HRya)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 813 ORDER Granting #812 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw the Appearance of Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Mensing, P.C. as Counsel. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 812 MOTION to Withdraw Unopposed Motion by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Robinson, Jane)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 811 NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on #803 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Relying on Contract Damages Theories and Calculations not Disclosed in Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1603870450?pwd=VC9sQWZLZlZ4SHhDNGs1aFFGOUJaQT09 Passcode: 540552 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1603870450# or +16692161590,,1603870450#| (HRya)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 810 REPLY to Response re #803 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Relying on Contract Damages Theories and Calculations not Disclosed in Discovery filed by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 809 SEALED RESPONSE re #803 Motion in Limine,,,,, by Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11) (Mitby, Steven)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 808 RESPONSE to #803 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Relying on Contract Damages Theories and Calculations not Disclosed in Discovery filed by Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11) (Mitby, Steven)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 807 Ex Parte MOTION to File Its Response to Ford's Motion in Limine with Redactions and Several Exhibits Under Seal by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #807 Ex Parte MOTION to File Its Response to Ford's Motion in Limine with Redactions and Several Exhibits Under Seal filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 806 ORDER Amending #786 Order Resolving Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Identity of Asserted Combination Trade Secrets. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #804 MOTION to Seal #803 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Relying on Contract Damages Theories and Calculations not Disclosed in Discovery EXHIBITS J & K ONLY filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 805 SEALED EXHIBIT J and EXHIBIT K re #803 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Relying on Contract Damages Theories and Calculations not Disclosed in Discovery by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J - [CONFIDENTIAL] 2017-08-17 Expert Report of Craig Elson, #2 Exhibit K - [CONFIDENTIAL] 2018-10-09 Versata Supp Joint Damages Report of Elson and Bokhart) (Lewry, Thomas)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 804 MOTION to Seal #803 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Relying on Contract Damages Theories and Calculations not Disclosed in Discovery EXHIBITS J & K ONLY by Ford Motor Company. (Lewry, Thomas)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 803 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Relying on Contract Damages Theories and Calculations not Disclosed in Discovery by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 2017-04-18 Versata 2nd [sic-1st] Supp Resp to Ford ROG (Nos 23,24,26,27), #3 Exhibit B - 2018-01-09 Versata Objections to Ford_s 30(b)(6) notice to Versata, #4 Exhibit C - 2015-12-21 Versata Initial Disclosures, #5 Exhibit D - 2017-12-18 Versata Amended Initial Disclosures, #6 Exhibit E - 2018-05-18 Versata 2nd Amended Initial Disclosures, #7 Exhibit F - 2018-11-02 Versata 3rd Amended Initial Disclosures, #8 Exhibit G - 2018-11-21 Versata 4th Amended Initial Disclosures, #9 Exhibit H - 2015-12-31 Versata Resp to Ford 1st RFP (Nos 1-63), #10 Exhibit I - 2017-03-10 Versata Resp to Ford ROG (Nos 22-23), #11 Exhibit J - [Redacted] 2017-08-17 Expert Report of Craig Elson, #12 Exhibit K - [Redacted] 2018-10-09 Versata Supp Joint Damages Report of Elson and Bokhart, #13 Exhibit L - 2017-12-08 Deposition Transcript of Craig Elson, #14 Exhibit M - 2017-05-22 Ford 30(b)(6) Notice to Versata Corp, #15 Exhibit N - 2019-03-12 Versata (Second) Supp Resp to Ford ROG No 23, #16 Exhibit O - 2022-01-07 Mitby letter to John LeRoy, #17 Exhibit P - 2017-02-08 Deposition Transcript of Mike Richards, #18 Exhibit Q - 2022-01-14 Tom Lewry letter to Mitby) (Lewry, Thomas)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 802 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held virtually using Zoom video conferencing on January 27, 2022. (Court Reporter: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 12) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 3/2/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2022. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 1/27/2022. Ford to file motion regarding disclosure of damages theory by no later than February 11, 2022. Versata to file response to motion by no later than March 4, 2022. Ford to file reply by no later than March 11, 2022. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HRya)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 801 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 1/27/2022 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 800 TRANSCRIPT of VIDEO STATUS CONFERENCE held on December 22, 2021. (Court Reporter: Peg L Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 18) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 1/24/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/3/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/4/2022. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ORDER Adjourning Trial Schedule and Addressing Future Trial Schedule. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Final Pretrial Conference on 2/4/2022 and Jury Trial on 3/2/2022 are Cancelled re #796 Order. (HRya)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 12/22/2021. Dates for Final Pretrial Conference, hearing on motions in limine, and March 2, 2022, trial date adjourned. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HRya)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 798 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 12/22/2021 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 797 ORDER for Mediation. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 796 ORDER Confirming Trial Schedule. (Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2022 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman, Jury Trial set for 3/2/2022 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 12/10/2021. Trial to commence on or about March 2, 2022. Final Pretrial Conference and hearing on motions in limine to be held on February 4, 2022. Motions in limine to be filed no later than January 5, 2022. Response to motions in limine to be filed no later than January 18, 2022. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 795 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 12/10/2021 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 794 REDACTED Version of #789 TRANSCRIPT of MOTION TO COMPEL held on September 28, 2021. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Peg L. Goodrich) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2022. (Goodrich, P)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 793 SEALED EXHIBIT B re #790 MOTION to Redact Transcript by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ORDER Granting Versata's #790 Motion to Redact Transcript. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #791 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Exhibit B filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 791 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Exhibit B by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 790 MOTION to Redact Transcript by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Carter, Matthew)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 789 TRANSCRIPT of MOTION TO COMPEL held on September 28, 2021. (Court Reporter: Peg L Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 42) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 12/3/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/13/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2022. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 788 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 787 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Elizabeth Pasquali on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Pasquali, Chelsea)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 786 ORDER Resolving Plaintiff's #775 Sealed Motion to Compel Identity of Asserted Combination Trade Secrets. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 9/28/2021 re #775 SEALED MOTION to Compel Identity of Asserted "Combination" Trade Secrets by Ford Motor Company. Disposition: Motion Resolved. Order to Follow. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 785 NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on #775 SEALED MOTION to Compel Identity of Asserted "Combination" Trade Secrets by Ford Motor Company. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2021 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1613516811?pwd=aEZtUHI1RnZabkFXWjZDWlpFZThRZz09 Passcode: 749438 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1613516811# or +16468287666,,1613516811#| (HMon)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 784 NOTICE of Appearance by Reza Roghani Esfahani on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Esfahani, Reza)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 783 REPLY to Response re #775 SEALED MOTION to Compel Identity of Asserted "Combination" Trade Secrets by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 782 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #775 SEALED MOTION to Compel Identity of Asserted "Combination" Trade Secrets by Ford Motor Company. UNOPPOSED by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #782 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #775 SEALED MOTION to Compel Identity of Asserted "Combination" Trade Secrets by Ford Motor Company. UNOPPOSED filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #781 MOTION to Seal #780 Sealed Response to Motion, 775 filed by Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 781 MOTION to Seal #780 Sealed Response to Motion, 775 by Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Documents for Sealing, #2 Exhibit Response to Motion to Compel Redacted, #3 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit, #4 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit, #5 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit) (Mitby, Steven)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 780 SEALED RESPONSE re #775 Sealed Motion,, Response to Motion to Compel Identity of Asserted Combination Trade Secrets by Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Documents for Sealing, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Mitby, Steven)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 779 ORDER Granting #778 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File a Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 778 MOTION TO EXTEND Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Ford's Motion to Compel Identification of Asserted Combination Trade Secrets by Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mitby, Steven)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #776 MOTION to Seal #775 SEALED MOTION to Compel Identity of Asserted "Combination" Trade Secrets by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 777 REDACTED VERSION of #775 SEALED MOTION to Compel Identity of Asserted "Combination" Trade Secrets by Ford Motor Company. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - CONFIDENTIAL ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL- Versatas March 12, 2019 Response to ROG 3, #3 Exhibit B - CONFIDENTIAL ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL - 2017-08-17 Malek Opening Trade Secret Report, #4 Exhibit C - CONFIDENTIAL ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL - 2017-11-17 Malek Trade Secret Reply Report, #5 Exhibit D - CONFIDENTIAL ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL - 2017-12-20 Dep Trans of Malek, #6 Exhibit E - CONFIDENTIAL ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL - 2019-6-10 2d Motion for Recon Hrg Transcript, #7 Exhibit F - CONFIDENTIAL ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL - 21-01-21 LeRoy letter to Mitby, #8 Exhibit G - Versata response to Ford 2021-01-21 letter) (LeRoy, John)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 776 MOTION to Seal #775 SEALED MOTION to Compel Identity of Asserted "Combination" Trade Secrets by Ford Motor Company. by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 775 SEALED MOTION to Compel Identity of Asserted "Combination" Trade Secrets by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - CONFIDENTIAL - Versatas March 12, 2019 Response to ROG 3, #3 Exhibit B - CONFIDENTIAL - 2017-08-17 Malek Opening Trade Secret Report, #4 Exhibit C - CONFIDENTIAL - 2017-11-17 Malek Trade Secret Reply Report, #5 Exhibit D - CONFIDENTIAL - 2017-12-20 Dep Trans of Malek, #6 Exhibit E - CONFIDENTIAL - 2019-6-10 2d Motion for Recon Hrg Transcript, #7 Exhibit F - CONFIDENTIAL - 21-01-21 LeRoy letter to Mitby, #8 Exhibit G - Versata response to Ford 2021-01-21 letter) (LeRoy, John)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 774 ORDER Terminating #732 and #735 Motions in Limine Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 773 ORDER Granting #772 Motion for Leave to Withdraw Alan J. Gocha as Counsel. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 772 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Alan J. Gocha by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 771 ORDER Granting Defendants' #760 Motion for Leave to Serve Amended Report. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 770 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven John Mitby on behalf of Versata Software, Inc.. (Mitby, Steven)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Video Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2020 re #760 MOTION for Leave to File Serve Amended Expert Report filed by Versata Development Group, Inc. Disposition: Motion Granted. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 769 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #760 MOTION for Leave to File Serve Amended Expert Report. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2020 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1606910141?pwd=eDhCeUZnQ2RxbTgrcTVKVEdvUktUZz09 Passcode: 102999 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1606910141# or +16468287666,,1606910141#| (HMon)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 768 REPLY to Response re #760 MOTION for Leave to File Serve Amended Expert Report, #765 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #763 Response to Motion filed by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Mitby, Steven)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 767 TRANSCRIPT of VIDEO STATUS CONFERENCE held on May 14, 2020. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 14) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 11/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2021. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 766 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #765 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #760 MOTION for Leave to File Serve Amended Expert Report Reply due by 10/23/2020. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (DTof)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 765 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #763 Response to Motion by Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Proposed Order) (Mitby, Steven)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 764 SEALED EXHIBIT A - Elson-Bokhart Joint Report at Ex. 3 re #763 Response to Motion by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 763 RESPONSE to #760 MOTION for Leave to File Serve Amended Expert Report filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidential Filed Under Seal - Elson-Bokhart Joint Report at Ex 3) (LeRoy, John)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 762 MOTION to Seal #761 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #760 MOTION for Leave to File Serve Amended Expert Report UNOPPOSED, #760 MOTION for Leave to File Serve Amended Expert Report UNOPPOSED Exhibit A to its Response by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #762 MOTION to Seal #761 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #760 MOTION for Leave to File Serve Amended Expert Report UNOPPOSED, #760 MOTION for Leave to File Serve Amended Expert Report UNOP filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 761 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #760 MOTION for Leave to File Serve Amended Expert Report UNOPPOSED by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #761 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #760 MOTION for Leave to File Serve Amended Expert Report UNOPPOSED filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 760 MOTION for Leave to File Serve Amended Expert Report by Versata Development Group, Inc.. (Mitby, Steven)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 759 TRANSCRIPT of OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION held on June 4, 2020. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 41) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 9/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2020. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 758 ORDER (1) Adjourning All Scheduled Dates in This Action and (2) Terminating as Moot Ford's #752 Motion to Adjourn Rebuttal Expert Reports and Subsequent Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ORDER (1) Sustaining Ford's #730 Objections to Special Master's #725 Report and Recommendation and (2) Adopting Ford's Proposed Constructions. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation Hearing held on 6/4/2020. Objections Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 756 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Objection to R&R Hearing set for 6/4/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **THE HEARING WILL TAKE PLACE VIA ZOOM. PLEASE USE THE LINK THAT WILL BE PROVIDED BY THE COURT TO JOIN THE HEARING** (HMon)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' #753 Motion for a Status Conference and for the Entry of a Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Attorney Patrick G. Seyferth is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: NO Longer Part of the Case. (Seyferth, Patrick)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Zoom Status Conference held on 5/14/2020. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 754 NOTICE TO APPEAR: ZOOM Status Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **THE CONFERENCE WILL TAKE PLACE VIA ZOOM. PLEASE USE THE LINK PROVIDED BY THE COURT TO JOIN THE CONFERENCE** (HMon)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 753 MOTION for Order for a Status Hearing and for the Entry of a Scheduling Order by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Webb, Dan)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 752 MOTION to Adjourn Rebuttal Expert Reports & Subsequent Case Deadlines by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 3-26-2020 email from LeRoy to Krajewski, #3 Exhibit B - 5-1-2020 email from Mitby to LeRoy) (LeRoy, John)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 751 REDACTED VERSION of #749 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 7/24/2018 Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing Excerpts, #3 Exhibit B - Versata Confidentiality Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - Two Way Medias Motion in Limine Excerpts: Granted MIL 23) (Carter, Matthew)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 750 REDACTED VERSION of #744 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,, by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 8/17/2017 Dr. Malek Trade Secret Report Excerpts, #3 Exhibit B - 10/26/2017 Myers Trade Secrets Rebuttal Report Excerpts, #4 Exhibit C - 7/24/2018 Summary Judgment Hearing Excerpts, #5 Exhibit D - 10/11/2010 Email from Paul Seiler to Michael Sullivan with Attached Slides re DAG, #6 Exhibit E - 5/3/2010 Email from Paul Seiler to Jim Beardslee and Martin Pipoly with Attached Slides re ACM, #7 Exhibit F - 3/11/2009 Email from Paul Seiler to Samantha Balinski re DAG, Trie, and Buildability, #8 Exhibit G - 4/2/2009 Email from Paul Seiler to Michael Sullivan with Attachments re PDO Updates for X-EPIC Alignment, #9 Exhibit H - 10/7/2014 Letter from Versata to Ford re Termination of the License Grants, #10 Exhibit I - 10/9/2014 Letter from Ford to Versata re Licensing Renewal Fees with Attached Check, #11 Exhibit J - 10/13/2014 Email from Mike Richards to Dave Baxter re Unauthorized Check with Attached Returned Check, #12 Exhibit K - 5/7/2015 Service of Process Notice to Versata, #13 Exhibit L - 2004 Master Services and Subscription Agreement Excerpts) (Carter, Matthew)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #746 MOTION to Seal Versata's Replies in Support of Amended Omnibus Motions in Limine (UNOPPOSED) filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 749 SEALED REPLY to Response re #735 Sealed Motion,,, by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits To Versata's Replies, #2 Exhibit A - 7/24/2018 Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing Excerpts, #3 Exhibit B - Versata's Confidentiality Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - Two Way Media's Motion in Limine Excerpts: Granted MIL23) (Carter, Matthew)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 748 REDACTED VERSION of #747 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, Amended Motions in Limine by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit K - CONFIDENTIAL & only filed under seal - Shamos Expert Report Excerpts, #3 Exhibit L - Huawei Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit M - CONFIDENTIAL & only filed under seal - 10.9.18 Elson-Bokhart Suppl. Report Excerpts, #5 Exhibit N - CONFIDENTIAL & only filed under seal - 2018-10-09 Declaration of Sam Malek, #6 Exhibit O - CONFIDENTIAL & only filed under seal - Bokhart 11.13.18 Dep. Trans. Excerpts) (LeRoy, John)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 747 SEALED REPLY to Response re #732 Sealed Motion,,, Amended Motions in Limine by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit K - CONFIDENTIAL - Shamos Expert Report Excerpts, #3 Exhibit L - Huawei Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit M - CONFIDENTIAL - 10.9.18 Elson-Bokhart Supp. Expertl Report Excerpts, #5 Exhibit N - CONFIDENTIAL - 2018-10-09 Declaration of Sam Malek, #6 Exhibit O - CONFIDENTIAL - Bokhart 11.13.18 Dep. Trans. Excerpts) (LeRoy, John)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 746 MOTION to Seal Versata's Replies in Support of Amended Omnibus Motions in Limine (UNOPPOSED) by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 745 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #745 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #738 MOTION to Seal Responses to Ford's Amended Motions in Limine filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc., #737 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Exhibits C & D to its Reply re Special Master's Report & Recommendation filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 744 SEALED RESPONSE re #732 Sealed Motion,,, by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 8/17/2017 Dr. Malek Trade Secret Report Excerpts, #3 Exhibit B - 10/26/2017 Myers Trade Secrets Rebuttal Report Excerpts, #4 Exhibit C - 7/24/2018 Summary Judgment Hearing Excerpts, #5 Exhibit D - 10/11/2010 Email from Paul Seiler to Michael Sullivan with Attached Slides re DAG, #6 Exhibit E - 5/3/2010 Email from Paul Seiler to Jim Beardslee and Martin Pipoly with Attached Slides re ACM, #7 Exhibit F - 3/11/2009 Email from Paul Seiler to Samantha Balinski re DAG, Trie, and Buildability, #8 Exhibit G - 4/2/2009 Email from Paul Seiler to Michael Sullivan with Attachments re PDO Updates for X-EPIC Alignment, #9 Exhibit H - 10/7/2014 Letter from Versata to Ford re Termination of the License Grants, #10 Exhibit I - 10/9/2014 Letter from Ford to Versata re Licensing Renewal Fees with Attached Check, #11 Exhibit J - 10/13/2014 Email from Mike Richards to Dave Baxter re Unauthorized Check with Attached Returned Check, #12 Exhibit K - 5/7/2015 Service of Process Notice to Versata, #13 Exhibit L - 2004 Master Services and Subscription Agreement Excerpts) (Carter, Matthew)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 743 REDACTED VERSION of #742 Sealed Response to Motion,,,, by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 2019-06-10 Hearing Tr. Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 2 - Confidential - ONLY filed under seal, #4 Exhibit 3 - USPN 6,405,308, #5 Exhibit 4 - Confidential - ONLY filed under seal, #6 Exhibit 5 - Confidential - ONLY filed under seal, #7 Exhibit 6 - Confidential - ONLY filed under seal, #8 Exhibit 7 - Confidential - ONLY filed under seal, #9 Exhibit 8 - Versata 2nd 30(b)(6) Notice 2018-06-12, #10 Exhibit 9 - Two-Way Media v AT&T ORDER re MILs TXWD 509cv476 (Dkt 501), #11 Exhibit 10 - Retractable Techs v Becton ORDER re MILs TXED 207cv250 (Dkt 262), #12 Exhibit 11 - Retractable Techs v Becton MIL Response TXED 207cv250 (Dkt 261), #13 Exhibit 12 - Confidential - ONLY filed under seal) (LeRoy, John)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 742 SEALED RESPONSE re #735 Sealed Motion,,, Amended Omnibus Motions In Limine by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 2019-06-10 Hearing Transcript Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 2 - CONFIDENTIAL - Myers Infringement Rebuttal Report Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 3 - USPN 6,405,308, #5 Exhibit 4 - CONFIDENTIAL - Ford-ConfigIt Production Document Examples, #6 Exhibit 5 - CONFIDENTIAL - Davis Damages Rebuttal Report Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 6 - CONFIDENTIAL - FORD_VERSATA129978-130001, #8 Exhibit 7 - CONFIDENTIAL - Sullivan 2017-05-25 Dep. Transcript Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 8 - Versata 2nd 30(b)(6) Notice 2018-06-12, #10 Exhibit 9 - Two-Way Media v AT&T ORDER re MILs TXWD 509cv476 (Dkt 501), #11 Exhibit 10 - Retractable Techs v Becton ORDER re MILs TXED 207cv250 (Dkt 262), #12 Exhibit 11 - Retractable Techs v Becton MIL Response TXED 207cv250 (Dkt 261), #13 Exhibit 12 - CONFIDENTIAL - Elson & Bokhart 2018-10-09 Damages Report Excerpts) (LeRoy, John)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 741 REDACTED VERSION of #735 SEALED MOTION for Amended Omnibus Motions in Limine by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 9/24/2018 Motion Hearing Excerpts, #3 Exhibit B - 4/12/2017 Ford Motor Companys Supplemental Responses to Defendants Interrogatories Nos. 17 and 36, #4 Exhibit C - 12/3/2018 Ford Motor Companys Response to Defendants Interrogatory No. 38, #5 Exhibit D - 12/5/2018 Letter from S. Mitby to J. Leroy re Fords Response to Versatas Interrogatory No. 37, #6 Exhibit E - 7/12/2019 Ford Motor Companys Supplemental Responses to Defendants Interrogatory Nos. 18 and 38, #7 Exhibit F - 10/17/2017 Dr. Malek Expert Report Excerpts) (Carter, Matthew)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 740 SEALED EXHIBIT Index of Exhibits & Sealed Exhibits C and D re #739 Memorandum, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - CONFIDENTIAL - Versata 3-1-2017 Inf. Contentions, #2 Exhibit D - CONFIDENTIAL - Malek 8-17-17 Report) (LeRoy, John)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 739 MEMORANDUM re #730 Objection Reply in Support of Objection to Report & Recommendation of Special Master by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 9-13-16 Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit B - Timeline, #4 Exhibit C - Confidential - ONLY filed under seal, #5 Exhibit D - Confidential - ONLY filed under seal) (LeRoy, John)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 738 MOTION to Seal Responses to Ford's Amended Motions in Limine by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 737 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Exhibits C & D to its Reply re Special Master's Report & Recommendation by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Terminating as Moot #684 MOTION in Limine filed by Ford Motor Company, #686 SEALED MOTION Versata's Omnibus Motions in Limine by All Defendants. filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc., #701 SEALED MOTION - Supplemental Motions in Limine by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 736 RESPONSE to #727 Objection Versata's Response to Ford's Obj to the Report & Recommendation of the Special Master Regarding Claim Construction (DKT. #725) by All Defendants. (Kim, Kyung)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 735 SEALED MOTION for Amended Omnibus Motions in Limine by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A. 9/24/2018 Motion Hearing Excerpts, #3 Exhibit B. 4/12/2017 Ford Motor Companys Supplemental Responses to Defendants Interrogatories Nos. 17 and 36, #4 Exhibit C. 12/3/2018 Ford Motor Companys Response to Defendants Interrogatory No. 38, #5 Exhibit D. 12/5/2018 Letter from S. Mitby to J. Leroy re Fords Response to Versatas Interrogatory No. 37, #6 Exhibit E. 7/12/2019 Ford Motor Companys Supplemental Responses to Defendants Interrogatory Nos. 18 and 38, #7 Exhibit F. 10/17/2017 Dr. Malek Expert Report Excerpts) (Carter, Matthew)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 734 REDACTED VERSION of #732 SEALED MOTION in Limine (Amended) by Ford Motor Company. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - CONFIDENTIAL Only Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit B - CONFIDENTIAL Only Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit C - CONFIDENTIAL Only Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit D - Court 2-19-2015 email re Case No. 15-10628, #6 Exhibit E - CONFIDENTIAL Only Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit F - CONFIDENTIAL Only Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit G - CONFIDENTIAL Only Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit H - CONFIDENTIAL Only Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit I - CONFIDENTIAL Only Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit J - CONFIDENTIAL Only Filed Under Seal) (LeRoy, John)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 733 MOTION to Seal Versata's Amended Omnibus Motions in Limine (Unopposed) by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Carter, Matthew)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 732 SEALED MOTION in Limine (Amended) by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Versatas 8/2/2004 Letter to Sullivan - CONFIDENTIAL, #3 Exhibit B - Seiler 12/12/2018 Deposition Transcript Excerpts - CONFIDENTIAL, #4 Exhibit C - Sullivan 8/27/15 Deposition Transcript Excerpts - CONFIDENTIAL, #5 Exhibit D - Court 2/19/2015 Email re Case No. 15-10628, #6 Exhibit E - Baxter 5/20/2016 Deposition Transcript Excerpts - CONFIDENTIAL, #7 Exhibit F - Alla 10/5/2016 Deposition Transcript Excerpts - CONFIDENTIAL, #8 Exhibit G - Kundoor 5/19/2016 Deposition Transcript Excerpts - CONFIDENTIAL, #9 Exhibit H - Padilla Article and Related Documents - CONFIDENTIAL, #10 Exhibit I - Excerpts from Bokhart Expert Report of 8/17/2017 - CONFIDENTIAL, #11 Exhibit J - Excerpts from Bokhart-Elson Supplemental Expert Report of 10/19/2018 - CONFIDENTIAL) (LeRoy, John)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 731 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Ford's Amended Motions in Limine by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #731 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Ford's Amended Motions in Limine filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #733 MOTION to Seal Versata's Amended Omnibus Motions in Limine (Unopposed) filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 730 OBJECTION to #725 Sealed Document - Other [Corrected] Objection to Special Master's Report & Recommendation by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER Granting #728 Joint Motion for Leave to Amend Briefing Schedule Regarding the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 728 Joint MOTION for Leave to Amend the Briefing Schedule Regarding the Report & Recommendation of the Special Master re #725 Sealed Document - Other by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ford's [Corrected 10-page] Objection to the Special Master's Report & Recommendation Regarding Claim Construction) (LeRoy, John)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 727 OBJECTION to #725 Sealed Document - Other Special Master's R&R on Claim Construction by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/27/2020. Amended Motions in Limine due in 14 days; responses due 14 days after filing of motions; replies due 14 days after responses. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (HMon)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 726 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 1:45 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE TO JOIN THE CALL** (HMon)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 725 SEALED Report and Recommendation of the Special Master Regarding Claim Construction. (HMon)
December 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 723 TRANSCRIPT of DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT held on December 11, 2019. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 123) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 1/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2020. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 12/11/2019 re #707 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Trade Secret and Contract Counterclaims (Counts 9 and 11-13) by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company, #709 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. Disposition: Motions Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 722 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Y. Chen on behalf of All Defendants. (Chen, Justin)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 721 REPLY to Response re #709 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Webb, Dan)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 720 REDACTED VERSION of #719 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, #707 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Trade Secret and Contract Counterclaims (Counts 9 and 11-13) by Ford Motor Company. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit F - Versatas initial disclosures, #3 Exhibit G - Versatas Obj to Fords Rule30b6 dep notice, #4 Exhibit H - CONFIDENTIAL & only filed under seal) (LeRoy, John)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 719 SEALED REPLY to Response re #707 Sealed Motion, for Summary Judgment on Trade Secret & Contract Counterclaims by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit F - Versata's Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit G - Versata's Obj. to Ford's Rule30(b)(6) Dep. Notice, #4 Exhibit H - CONFIDENTIAL - Ratton 1-18-2018 Dep. Transcript) (LeRoy, John)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 718 MEMORANDUM re #710 Markman Brief (Reply to Markman Brief) by Ford Motor Company (Smith, Christopher)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 717 NOTICE OF HEARING on #707 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Trade Secret and Contract Counterclaims (Counts 9 and 11-13) by Ford Motor Company, and #709 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2019 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #716 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #714 MOTION to Seal Unopposed Motion to File Versata's Responsive Claim Construction Brief Regarding the '080 Patent filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 716 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 715 SEALED Versata's Responsive Claim Construction Brief re the 080 Patent re #710 Markman Brief by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Kim, Kyung)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 714 MOTION to Seal Unopposed Motion to File Versata's Responsive Claim Construction Brief Regarding the '080 Patent by All Defendants. (Kim, Kyung)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #711 MOTION to Seal Versata's Response to Ford's Motion for Summary Judgement on Versata's Trade Secret and Contract Counterclaims filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 713 RESPONSE to #709 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 2018-07-11 Young Letter to Monda, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Versata 6-10-19 Hearing Slides on Krauss Motion) (LeRoy, John)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 712 SEALED RESPONSE re #707 Sealed Motion, Versata's Response to Ford's Motion for Summary Judgement on Versata's Trade Secret and Contract Counterclaims by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - MSC Software Jury Instructions Excerpt, #3 Exhibit B - Launch Tech Brief Excerpt, #4 Exhibit C - 10/26/2017 Expert Report of Julie Davis Excerpt, #5 Exhibit D - 12/23/2016 Ratton Declaration, #6 Exhibit E - 12/13/2016 Ratton Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #7 Exhibit F - 03/08/2018 Richards Declaration, #8 Exhibit G - 06/03/2015 Richards Declaration, #9 Exhibit H - 02/08/2017 Richards Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #10 Exhibit I - March 2003 Cost Savings Presentation, #11 Exhibit J - 03/12/2019 Ford Supplemental Interrogatory Responses Excerpt, #12 Exhibit K - 07/22/2019 Ford Supplemental Interrogatory Responses Excerpt, #13 Exhibit L - 08/28/2019 Ford Supplemental Interrogatory Responses Excerpt) (Webb, Dan)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 711 MOTION to Seal Versata's Response to Ford's Motion for Summary Judgement on Versata's Trade Secret and Contract Counterclaims by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Webb, Dan)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 710 MARKMAN BRIEF by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Order in Koninklijke Case, #3 Exhibit B - USPN 7739080, #4 Exhibit C - 9-13-18 Summary Judgment Hearing before Special Master) (Smith, Christopher)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 709 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 8/19/2019 Krauss Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - 11/17/2017 Malek Reply Trade Secrets Report Table of Contents & Excerpt, #4 Exhibit 3 - 8/17/2017 Elson Expert Report Table of Contents & Excerpt) (Webb, Dan)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 708 REDACTED VERSION of #707 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Trade Secret and Contract Counterclaims (Counts 9 and 11-13) by Ford Motor Company. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Confidential & only filed under seal, #3 Exhibit B - Confidential & only filed under seal, #4 Exhibit C - Confidential & only filed under seal, #5 Exhibit D - Confidential & only filed under seal, #6 Exhibit E - Confidential & only filed under seal) (LeRoy, John)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 707 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Trade Secret and Contract Counterclaims (Counts 9 and 11-13) by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - CONF - Versata Resp. to ROG 23, #3 Exhibit B - CONF - Elson 8-17-2017 Report Excerpt, #4 Exhibit C - CONF - Elson Dep. Tr. Excerpts, #5 Exhibit D - CONF - Elson 10-9-2018 Rept. Excerpts, #6 Exhibit E - CONF - Richards Dep. Tr. Excerpts) (LeRoy, John)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 706 ORDER (1) Granting Parties' #693 and #696 Motions for Leave to File Additional Motions, (2) Adjourning All Scheduled Dates, Including the Trial Date, and (3) Terminating the Parties' #688 Joint Motion to Modify Calendar Dates as Moot. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 705 RESPONSE to #696 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Motion to Reconsider re #695 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Motion for Leave to File and Exhibit A to Versata's Motion for Leave by All Defendants. filed by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 704 SEALED RESPONSE re #693 Motion for Leave to File, by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - MSC Jury Instructions, #3 Exhibit B - Expert Report of Julie L. Davis, #4 Exhibit C - 12-23-2016 Ratton Decl., #5 Exhibit D - 12-13-2016 Ratton Depo. Tr., #6 Exhibit E - 3-8-2018 Richards Decl., #7 Exhibit F - 6-3-2015 Richards Decl., #8 Exhibit G - 2-8-17 Richards Depo. Tr.) (Webb, Dan)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 703 MOTION to Seal Response to Ford's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgement by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Webb, Dan)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 702 REDACTED VERSION of #701 SEALED MOTION - Supplemental Motions in Limine by Ford Motor Company. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - July 2003 GPD Presentation Confidential and Only Being Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit B - March 2003 Value Presentation - Confidential and Only Being Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit C - Padilla Article and Related Documents - Confidential and Only Being Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit D -Excerpts from Bokhart Expert Report of 8/17/2017 - Confidential and Only Being Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit E - Excerpts from Bokhart-Elson Supplemental Expert Report of 10/19/2018 - Confidential and Only Being Filed Under Seal) (LeRoy, John)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #703 MOTION to Seal Response to Ford's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgement filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 701 SEALED MOTION - Supplemental Motions in Limine by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - CONF July 2003 GPD Presentation, #3 Exhibit B - CONF March 2003 Value Presentation, #4 Exhibit C - CONF Padilla Article, #5 Exhibit D - CONF Excerpts Bokhart Report of 8-17-17, #6 Exhibit E - CONF Excerpts Bokhart-Elson Suppl Report of 10-19-18) (LeRoy, John)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 700 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Ford's Supplemental Motions in Limine by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #700 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Ford's Supplemental Motions in Limine filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 699 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 08/08/2019. (Court Reporter: Carol Harrison) (Number of Pages: 28) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 9/13/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2019. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (CHar)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 698 ORDER Referring Claim Construction Dispute to Special Master Lawrence Graham. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 697 ORDER to File Certain Documents Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #692 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Exhibit 1 to Ford's Motion for Leave filed by Ford Motor Company, and Granting #695 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Motion for Leave to File and Exhibit A to Versata's Motion for Leave filed by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 696 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Motion to Reconsider re #695 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Motion for Leave to File and Exhibit A to Versata's Motion for Leave by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Index of Exhibits) (Webb, Dan)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 695 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Motion for Leave to File and Exhibit A to Versata's Motion for Leave by Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Webb, Dan)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 694 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 (Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhs. A-E) re #693 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Trade Secret and Contract Counterclaims (Counts 9 and 11-13) by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 693 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Trade Secret and Contract Counterclaims (Counts 9 and 11-13) by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Confidential - Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment) (LeRoy, John)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 692 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Exhibit 1 to Ford's Motion for Leave by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 691 JOINT STIPULATED ORDER Withdrawing Versata's Claims Against Ford's PDO "R2" Software and Related Motions. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 8/28/2019 is Cancelled re #676 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (HMon)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 690 Exhibit List by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Versata's Trial Witness List, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Versata's Initial Trial Deposition Designations, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Versata's Trial Exhibit List) (Kim, Kyung)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 689 STATEMENT of Pretrial Disclosures by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Ford's Deposition Designations, #3 Exhibit B - Ford's Exhibit List) (LeRoy, John)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 688 Joint MOTION to Modify Calendar Dates by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER Concerning Parties' Motions for Leave to File Additional Motions. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (AChu)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/8/2019. (Court Reporter: Carol Harrison) (HMon)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #682 MOTION to Seal Unopposed Motion to File Versata's Omnibus Motions in Limine Under Seal filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #683 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Exhibits to Ford's Motions in Limine filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 686 SEALED MOTION Versata's Omnibus Motions in Limine by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2018-07-24 MSJ Hearing, #2 Exhibit B - 2017-04-12 Ford supp rspns to Versata ROGs 17 36, #3 Exhibit C - 2018-12-03 Ford's Response to ROG No.38(37), #4 Exhibit D - 2018-12-05 SJM ltr to LeRoy re Ford Response to Interrogatory No 38, #5 Exhibit E - Ford Suppl ROG Responses (Nos. 18 and 38), #6 Exhibit F - 2017-08-17 Expert Report of Dr. Sam Malek Trade Secret, #7 Exhibit G - 2017-02-07 Ltr to Special Master re trade secrets) (Mitby, Steven)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 685 SEALED EXHIBIT A - E and G - I re #684 MOTION in Limine by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Versatas 3/12/2019 Response to Ford Interrogatory No. 23 CONFIDENTIAL, #2 Exhibit B - Versatas 11/21/2018 4th Amended Initial Disclosures - CONFIDENTIAL, #3 Exhibit C - Versatas 8/2/2004 Letter to Sullivan - CONFIDENTIAL, #4 Exhibit D - Seiler 12/12/2018 Deposition Transcript Excerpts - CONFIDENTIAL, #5 Exhibit E - Sullivan 8/27/15 Deposition Transcript Excerpts - CONFIDENTIAL, #6 Exhibit G - Baxter 5/20/2016 Deposition Transcript Excerpts - CONFIDENTIAL, #7 Exhibit H - Alla 10/5/2016 Deposition Transcript Excerpts - CONFIDENTIAL, #8 Index of Exhibits I - Kundoor 5/19/2016 Deposition Transcript Excerpts - CONFIDENTIAL) (LeRoy, John)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 684 MOTION in Limine by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Versatas 3/12/2019 Response to Ford Interrogatory No. 23 CONFIDENTIAL AND ONLY BEING FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit B - Versatas 11/21/2018 4th Amended Initial Disclosures - CONFIDENTIAL & ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit C - Versatas 8/2/2004 Letter to Sullivan - CONFIDENTIAL & ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit D - Seiler 12/12/2018 Deposition Transcript Excerpts - CONFIDENTIAL & ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit E - Sullivan 8/27/15 Deposition Transcript Excerpts - CONFIDENTIAL & ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit F - Court 2/19/2015 Email re Case No. 15-10628, #8 Exhibit G - Baxter 5/20/2016 Deposition Transcript Excerpts - CONFIDENTIAL & ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit H - Alla 10/5/2016 Deposition Transcript Excerpts - CONFIDENTIAL & ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit I - Kundoor 5/19/2016 Deposition Transcript Excerpts - CONFIDENTIAL & ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL) (LeRoy, John)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 683 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Exhibits to Ford's Motions in Limine by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 682 MOTION to Seal Unopposed Motion to File Versata's Omnibus Motions in Limine Under Seal by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 681 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE TO JOIN THE CALL** (HMon)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER Granting #679 Joint Motion to Modify Certain Calendar Dates. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 679 Joint MOTION Modify Calendar Dates by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 677 MARKMAN BRIEF by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - July 17, 2019 Letter to Judge Leitman from counsel for Versata regarding additional 080 Claim Construction Briefing, #3 Exhibit 2 - July 17, 2019 Letter to Judge Leitman from counsel for Ford regarding 080 Claim Construction, #4 Exhibit 3 - USPN 7739080, #5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt from Sept.13, 2018 Special Master SJ Hearing Transcript) (Smith, Christopher)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 676 NOTICE OF HEARING on #646 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Trade Secret Misappropriation Claims Against Ford's PDO "R2" Applications REDACTED VERSION, #649 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Dr. Sam Malek's Opinions Regarding Ford's PDO "R2" Applications by Ford Motor Company, #645 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Trade Secret Misappropriation Claims Against Ford's PDO "R2" Applications by Ford Motor Company, #650 MOTION to Exclude Dr. Sam Malek's Opinions Regarding Ford's PDO "R2" Applications re #649 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Dr. Sam Malek's Opinions Regarding Ford's PDO "R2" Applications, #651 SEALED MOTION Versata Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Opinions of Monty Myers by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2019 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 675 ORDER Granting #669 and #674 Joint Motion to Modify Certain Calendar Dates. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 674 Joint MOTION Modify Calendar Dates by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 673 SEALED Ford's Reply to Versata's Response to Ford's Post-Hearing Submission Regarding Krauss's Apportionment of Software Value re #668 Sealed Document - Other,,,, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M - Reed 8-21-2015 Email Designating Krauss as Expert) (LeRoy, John)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/1/2019. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (HMon)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 672 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 7/1/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE TO JOIN THE CALL** (HMon)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 671 SEALED Exhibits F & G to DKT 670 re #670 Sealed Document - Other,, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Exhibit F VRS00130949 Engineering Users Guide 4.20, #2 Document Continuation Exhibit G VRS00371726 VCAPS System Requirements Spec) (Mitby, Steven)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 670 SEALED Versata's Response to Ford's Submission Regarding Krauss's Apportionment of Software Value (DKT 668) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A 2018-10-24 Krauss Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Ford exhibits disclose trade secrets, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Incomplete Content Assigned as Non Asserted IP, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D Engineering Guide, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E VCAPS System Requirements Specification 1.19) (Mitby, Steven)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 669 Joint MOTION to Modify Calendar Dates by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 668 SEALED Ford's Post-Hearing Submission Regarding Krauss's Apportionment of Software Value re Motion Hearing,,,,,, #568 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" by Ford Motor Company. by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - [AEO] Examples of Improper-Incomplete Krauss Doc Citations, #3 Exhibit B - [AEO] 2017-08-17 Malek Trade Secret Report, #4 Exhibit C - [AEO] Marketing Intent v1.2, #5 Exhibit D - [AEO] ACM Marketing v3.5, #6 Exhibit E - [AEO] ACM Engineering v3.4, #7 Exhibit F - [AEO] ACM Engineering v3.5, #8 Exhibit G - [AEO] ACM Marketing v3.6 Functional Walkthrough V1.8, #9 Exhibit H - [AEO] Ford Production Definition Design Draft 13, #10 Exhibit I - [AEO] Ford Motor Company GPD Release 2.4, #11 Exhibit J - [AEO] Ford Motor Company GPD Release 2.3, #12 Exhibit K - [AEO] Ford GPD - Release 3.0 Launch Acceptance Functional Walkthrough, #13 Exhibit L - [AEO] Ford VCAPS System Requirements Specification) (LeRoy, John)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 667 TRANSCRIPT of MOTIONS HEARING held on June 10, 2019. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 167) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 7/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2019. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 6/10/2019 re #579 MOTION to Exclude the October 9, 2018 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek and Related Testimony REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION filed by Ford Motor Company, #574 MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION filed by Ford Motor Company, #569 MOTION to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION filed by Ford Motor Company, #573 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company, #594 SEALED MOTION Second Motion for Reconsideration of Order (Dkt. #534) Granting Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Fords Complaint by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company, #578 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the October 9, 2018 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek and Related Testimony by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company, #568 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company Disposition: Motions Taken Under Advisement. Ford to Submit Supplemental Submission With Respect to Seth Krauss Declaration by 6/17/2019. Versata to File Response by 6/24/2019. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER Resolving Discovery Dispute. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER Granting Non-Party Stacy Coopes' #632 Motion to Quash Defendant Versata Software, Inc.'s Subpoena to Testify at Deposition. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 664 REPLY to Response re #651 SEALED MOTION Versata Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Opinions of Monty Myers by All Defendants. Versata Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Expert Opinions of Monty Myers filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 2019.04.29 Email DK to LeRoy) (Mitby, Steven)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 663 SEALED REPLY to Response re #649 Sealed Motion,, to Exclude Dr. Sam Malek's Opinions Regarding Ford's PDO "R2" Applications by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit F - Seiler Deposition Excerpts (Confidential Only Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit G - Wilkinson Deposition Excerpts (Confidential Only Filed Under Seal)) (LeRoy, John)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 662 SEALED REPLY to Response re #645 Sealed Motion,,, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit I - Seiler 12/12/18 Deposition Transcript Excerpt ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit J -Wilkinson 12/12/18 Deposition Transcript Excerpt ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit K - Malek 3/26/19 Deposition Transcript Excerpt ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL) (LeRoy, John)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #660 MOTION to Seal #649 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Dr. Sam Malek's Opinions Regarding Ford's PDO "R2" Applications by Ford Motor Company. Unopposed Mtn to File Under Seal Versata Defs' Res filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 661 SEALED RESPONSE re #649 Sealed Motion,, Versata Defs' Response to Ford's Motion to Exclude Dr. Sam Malek's Opinions Regarding Ford's PDO R2 Applications by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 660 MOTION to Seal #649 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Dr. Sam Malek's Opinions Regarding Ford's PDO "R2" Applications by Ford Motor Company. Unopposed Mtn to File Under Seal Versata Defs' Resp to Ford's Mtn to Exclude Malek's Opinions re Ford's PDO R2 Apps by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 659 SEALED RESPONSE re #651 Sealed Motion,, to Strike Expert Opinions of Monty Myers by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Malek 3-26-2019 Deposition Transcript Excerpt ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit B - Malek 8-17-2017 Opening Report Excerpt ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit C - Myers 10-26-2017 Rebuttal Report Excerpt ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL) (LeRoy, John)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER Granting #657 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response due by 5/13/2019, Reply due by 5/27/2019. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 657 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 656 RESPONSE to #645 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Trade Secret Misappropriation Claims Against Ford's PDO "R2" Applications by Ford Motor Company. REDACTED Versata Defs' Response to Ford's Mtn for SJ on Versata's TS Misappropriation Claims Against PDO R2 filed by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 655 SEALED REPLY to Response re #645 Sealed Motion,,, Additional Exhibits to Versata's Resp (DKT 653 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Ex. H (CONFIDENTIAL) PDO- Learn How to Access, #2 Document Continuation Ex. I (CONFIDENTIAL) PDO-CM) (Mitby, Steven)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #652 MOTION to Seal #645 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Trade Secret Misappropriation Claims Against Ford's PDO "R2" Applications by Ford Motor Company. Unopposed Mtn to Fil filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 654 SEALED RESPONSE re #645 Sealed Motion,,, Additional Exhibits to Versata's Resp (DKT 653 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Ex. J (CONFIDENTIAL) Ford Developers, #2 Document Continuation Ex. K (CONFIDENTIAL) Expert Report of Craig T. Nelson, #3 Document Continuation Ex. L (CONFIDENTIAL) PDO Release 2, #4 Document Continuation Ex. S (CONFIDENTIAL) FSC) (Mitby, Steven)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 653 SEALED RESPONSE re #645 Sealed Motion,,, Versata's Resp. to Ford's MSJ on Defs' TS Misappropriation Claims Against Ford's PDO "R2" Applications by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A (CONFIDENTIAL) - 2018-12-10 Expert Report of Dr. Sam Malek Regarding Fords, #3 Exhibit B (CONFIDENTIAL) Excerpts from the Deposition of James Beardslee dated July 13,, #4 Exhibit C (CONFIDENTIAL) PDO FSV L2 Codification Governance Meeting, #5 Exhibit D (CONFIDENTIAL) PDO Services (Ford_Versata0050615-0050625), #6 Exhibit E (CONFIDENTIAL) PDO Release 2 PDO Companion Tool Launch eNews Bulletin, #7 Exhibit F (CONFIDENTIAL) Excerpts from the Deposition of Paul Seiler dated December 12,, #8 Exhibit G (CONFIDENTIAL) Excerpts from the Deposition of Frederick Wilkinson dated) (Mitby, Steven)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 652 MOTION to Seal #645 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Trade Secret Misappropriation Claims Against Ford's PDO "R2" Applications by Ford Motor Company. Unopposed Mtn to File Under Seal Versata's Resp to Ford's MSJ on Defs TS Misapprop Claims Against Ford's PDO R2 Apps by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #574 MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION, #579 MOTION to Exclude the October 9, 2018 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek and Related Testimony REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION, #594 SEALED MOTION Second Motion for Reconsideration of Order (Dkt. #534) Granting Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Fords Complaint by Ford Motor Company., #578 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the October 9, 2018 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek and Related Testimony by Ford Motor Company., #568 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" by Ford Motor Company., #569 MOTION to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION, #573 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson by Ford Motor Company.. Motion Hearing RESET for 6/10/2019 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 651 SEALED MOTION Versata Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Opinions of Monty Myers by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - 2019-02-27 Expert Report of Monty Myers Rebutting Malek's PDO R2 Trade Secret Report, #2 Exhibit Ex B - 2017-08-17 Expert Report of Dr. Sam Malek Trade Secret, #3 Exhibit Ex C - 2017-10-26 Myers Rebuttal Report - Trade Secrets and Copyrights, #4 Exhibit Ex D - 2018-12-10 Expert Report of Dr. Sam Malek re PDOR2, #5 Exhibit Ex E - 2019-03-26 Deposition of Sam Malek) (Mitby, Steven)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 650 MOTION to Exclude Dr. Sam Malek's Opinions Regarding Ford's PDO "R2" Applications re #649 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Dr. Sam Malek's Opinions Regarding Ford's PDO "R2" Applications by Ford Motor Company. (Redacted Version) by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit E - Cover Sheet) (LeRoy, John)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 649 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Dr. Sam Malek's Opinions Regarding Ford's PDO "R2" Applications by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Malek Expert Report (Confidential Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit B - Myers Expert Rebuttal Report (Confidential Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit C - Malek Expert Reply Report (Confidential Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit D - Elson Expert Report (Confidential Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit E - Malek Deposition Excerpts (Confidential Filed Under Seal)) (LeRoy, John)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 648 MOTION to Seal Unopposed Mtn To File Under Seal Versata's Mtn to Strike Expert Opinions of Monty Myers by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #647 MOTION to Seal Ford's Motion and Exhibits to Exclude Dr. Sam Malek's Opinions Regarding Ford's PDO "R2" Applications filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #648 MOTION to Seal Unopposed Mtn To File Under Seal Versata's Mtn to Strike Expert Opinions of Monty Myers filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 647 MOTION to Seal Ford's Motion and Exhibits to Exclude Dr. Sam Malek's Opinions Regarding Ford's PDO "R2" Applications by Ford Motor Company. (Smith, Christopher)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 646 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Trade Secret Misappropriation Claims Against Ford's PDO "R2" Applications REDACTED VERSION by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Confidential Cover - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit B - Confidential Cover - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit C - Confidential Cover - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit D - Confidential Cover - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit E - Confidential Cover - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit F - Confidential Cover - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit G - Confidential Cover - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit H - Confidential Cover - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL) (LeRoy, John)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 645 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Trade Secret Misappropriation Claims Against Ford's PDO "R2" Applications by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A [CONFIDENTIAL] MALEK 3-26-19 Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #3 Exhibit B [CONFIDENTIAL] 12-10-18 Malek PDO R2 Report, #4 Exhibit C [CONFIDENTIAL] Mix-Rates User Guide [FV135569-620], #5 Exhibit D [CONFIDENTIAL] Change Management User Guide [FV098480-523), #6 Exhibit E [CONFIDENTIAL] 12-10-18 Elson Damages Report, #7 Exhibit F [CONFIDENTIAL] Beardslee 2018 Declaration [333-4], #8 Exhibit G [CONFIDENTIAL] Beardslee 2017 Declaration [301-5], #9 Exhibit H [CONFIDENTIAL] 3-18-19 Malek PDO R2 Reply Report) (LeRoy, John)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #644 MOTION to Seal (UNOPPOSED) Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Trade Secret Misappropriation Claims Against Ford's PDO "R2" Applications filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 644 MOTION to Seal (UNOPPOSED) Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Trade Secret Misappropriation Claims Against Ford's PDO "R2" Applications by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ORDER Granting #642 Joint MOTION TO EXTEND Certain Calendar Dates. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 642 Joint MOTION TO EXTEND Certain Calendar Dates by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER (1) Adopting in Part Recommended Disposition of #551 Special Master's Report and Recommendation; (2) Sustaining in Part and Overruling in Part Defendants' #565 Objections to the Report and Recommendation; (3) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's #354 and #358 Motion for Summary Judgment; and (4) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' #379 and #380 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 640 SEALED REPLY to Response re #594 Sealed Motion,,,,,, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 43 - CONFIDENTIAL - MALEK 12-20-17 Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit 44 - CONFIDENTIAL - email from Trilogy to Ford dated 9-13-2000) (LeRoy, John)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 639 REPLY to Response re #632 MOTION to Quash Defendant Versata Software, Inc.'s Subpoena to Testify at Deposition Non Party Stacey Coopes' Reply in support of Motion to Quash Defendant Versata Software Inc.'s Subpoena to Testify at Deposition filed by Stacey Coopes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Seyferth, Patrick)[AND RESPONSE TO VERSATA SOFTWARE INC.'S MOITON TO COMPEL DEPOSITION] Modified on 3/21/2019 (DPer).
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 638 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - UNOPPOSED by Ford Motor Company. (Nikkila, Jonathan)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #638 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - UNOPPOSED filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER Requiring the Parties to Attend Mediation Sessions With the Honorable Gerald E. Rosen. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #636 MOTION to Seal #632 MOTION to Quash Defendant Versata Software, Inc.'s Subpoena to Testify at Deposition, #635 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Unopposed Motion to File Versata's Response in Opposition to Stacey Coopes' filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 636 MOTION to Seal #632 MOTION to Quash Defendant Versata Software, Inc.'s Subpoena to Testify at Deposition, #635 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Unopposed Motion to File Versata's Response in Opposition to Stacey Coopes' Motion to Quash & Counter-Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Under Seal by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #633 MOTION to Seal #625 Sealed Document - Other, Unopposed Mtn to File Versata's Resp to Ford's Supplemental Brief Regarding the "On Sale" Bar Under Seal filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 635 SEALED RESPONSE re #632 Motion to Quash,,, Versata's Response in Oppostiion to Stacey Coopes' Motion to Quash and Counter-Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - 2019-03-12 Declaration of M. Richards, #2 Exhibit Exh B - 11-30-2018 Excerpts from Balaj Depo, #3 Exhibit Exh C - 01-28-2019 Subpoena to Coopes, #4 Exhibit Exh D - 02-03-2019 Return of Service - Coopes, #5 Exhibit Exh E - 02-20-2019 Mitby Email to Seyferth, #6 Exhibit Exh F - 02-22-2019 Mitby Email to Seyferth, #7 Exhibit Exh G - 02-26-2019 Seyferth Ltr to Mitby dated 02-25-2019, #8 Exhibit Exh H - 02-27-2019 Mitby Ltr to Seyferth dated 02-26-2019, #9 Exhibit Exh I - 02-27-2019 Mitby Email to Seyferth attaching Ltr dated 02-26-2019, #10 Exhibit Exh J - 03-07-2019 Seyferth Email to Mitby) (Mitby, Steven)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 634 SEALED RESPONSE re #633 Motion to Seal Versata's Response to Ford's Supplemental Brief Regarding the "On Sale" Bar (Dkt. 625) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Declaration of Shawn Smith) (Mitby, Steven)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 633 MOTION to Seal #625 Sealed Document - Other, Unopposed Mtn to File Versata's Resp to Ford's Supplemental Brief Regarding the "On Sale" Bar Under Seal by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 632 MOTION to Quash Defendant Versata Software, Inc.'s Subpoena to Testify at Deposition by Stacey Coopes. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- Letter from P. Seyferth to S. Mitby (dated 2-25-19, received on 2-26-19), #3 Exhibit B- Letter from S. Mitby to P. Seyferth (dated 2-26-19, received on 3-4-19), #4 Exhibit C- Affidavit of Stacey Coopes, #5 Exhibit D- Emails between P. Seyferth to S. Mitby re: call to discuss subpoena, #6 Exhibit E- Emails from P. Seyferth to S. Mitby re: rescheduling call and confirmation from S. Mitby to reschedule, #7 Exhibit F- Email dated 2-26-19 from P. Seyferth to S. Mitby attaching correspondence, #8 Exhibit G- Emails dated 3-3-19 between S. Mitby to P. Seyferth requesting letter referenced in voicemail, #9 Exhibit H- Email dated 3-4-19 from S. Mitby to P. Seyferth attaching letter dated 2-26-19) (Seyferth, Patrick)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 631 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman **HEARING ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE TO ALSO TAKE PLACE ON THIS DATE**; Jury Trial set for 11/5/2019 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 630 NOTICE OF HEARING on #574 MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION, #579 MOTION to Exclude the October 9, 2018 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek and Related Testimony REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION, #594 SEALED MOTION Second Motion for Reconsideration of Order (Dkt. #534) Granting Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Fords Complaint by Ford Motor Company., #578 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the October 9, 2018 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek and Related Testimony by Ford Motor Company., #568 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" by Ford Motor Company., #569 MOTION to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION, #573 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson by Ford Motor Company.. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2019 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 629 RESPONSE to #594 SEALED MOTION Second Motion for Reconsideration of Order (Dkt. #534) Granting Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Fords Complaint by Ford Motor Company. Versata's REDACTED Response to Ford's Second Motion for Reconsideration of Order (Dkt. 534) Granting Versata's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 628) filed by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #627 MOTION to Seal #594 SEALED MOTION Second Motion for Reconsideration of Order (Dkt. #534) Granting Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Fords Complaint by Ford Motor Company. Unopp filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 628 SEALED RESPONSE re #594 Sealed Motion,,,,,, Versata's Response to Ford's 2nd Motion for Reconsideration of Order (Dkt. 534) Granting Versata's Motion for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Expert Report of Dr. Sam Malek Trade Secret, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Versata Expert Report of C. Elson, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Declaration of S. Krauss, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Versata Supplemental Joint Damages Report and Exhibits, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Email exchange between Ford and Versata) (Mitby, Steven)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 627 MOTION to Seal #594 SEALED MOTION Second Motion for Reconsideration of Order (Dkt. #534) Granting Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Fords Complaint by Ford Motor Company. Unopposed Mtn to File Versata's Resp. To Ford's 2nd Mtn For Reconsideration of Order (Dkt. 534) Granting Versata's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER Granting Defendants' #624 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Appearance. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 625 SEALED Ford's Supplemental Brief Regarding the "On Sale" Bar re Miscellaneous Hearing,, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 83 - Timeline, #3 Exhibit 84 - Atlanta Attachment Co. v. Leggett & Platt, Inc.) (LeRoy, John)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 624 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Appearance Iftikhar Ahmed by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 623 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 2/26/2019. (Court Reporter: Andrea Wabeke) (Number of Pages: 142) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 3/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2019. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter (313.234.2603/www.transcriptorders.com) before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Wabeke, A)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #622 Joint MOTION TO EXTEND Deadline re #594 SEALED MOTION Second Motion for Reconsideration of Order (Dkt. #534) Granting Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Fords Complaint by Ford Motor filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 622 Joint MOTION TO EXTEND Deadline re #594 SEALED MOTION Second Motion for Reconsideration of Order (Dkt. #534) Granting Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Fords Complaint by Ford Motor Company. Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines Regarding Ford's Second Motion for Reconsideration (DKT. NO. 594) by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 2/27/2019 Re: #565 Sealed Document - Other, filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. Disposition: Taken Under Advisement. Ford to file 5 page supplemental brief by March 5, 2019 and Versata to file 5 page supplemental brief by March 12, 2019. (Court Reporter: Andrea Wabeke) (HMon) Modified on 2/27/2019 (HMon).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 621 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #611 Sealed Document - Other, Versata's Objections to the Report & Recommendation of the Special Master to Grant in Part Ford's Motion to Compel Production of Emails Withheld as Irrelevant (Dkt. 611) filed by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 620 REPLY to Response re #574 MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION CORRECTED VERSION filed by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 619 SEALED REPLY to Response re #573 Sealed Motion,, CORRECTED VERSION to Exclude Bokhart and Elson by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 618 REPLY to Response re #579 MOTION to Exclude the October 9, 2018 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek and Related Testimony REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION filed by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 617 SEALED REPLY to Response re #578 Sealed Motion,, to Exclude Malek by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 616 REPLY to Response re #574 MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION filed by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 615 SEALED REPLY to Response re #573 Sealed Motion,, to Exclude Bokhart and Elson by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 614 REPLY to Response re #569 MOTION to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit W - CONFIDENTIAL - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL - Marketing Guide- Earliest, Product Constraint Rules, #3 Exhibit X - CONFIDENTIAL - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL - Marketing Guide - Latest, Product Constraint Rules, #4 Exhibit Y - CONFIDENTIAL - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL - ACM 3.2) (LeRoy, John)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 613 SEALED REPLY to Response re #568 Sealed Motion,,,,,,,, to Exclude Krauss by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit W - CONFIDENTIAL - Marketing Guide- Earliest, Product Constraint Rules, #3 Exhibit X - CONFIDENTIAL - Marketing Guide - Latest, Product Constraint Rules, #4 Exhibit Y - CONFIDENTIAL - ACM 3.2) (LeRoy, John)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 612 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - UNOPPOSED by Ford Motor Company. (Smith, Christopher)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #612 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - UNOPPOSED filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 611 SEALED Report and Recommendation of the Special Master to Grant in Part Ford's Motion to Compel Production of Emails Withheld as Irrelevant by Larry Graham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (HMon)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER Granting #609 Joint Motion to Extend Certain Briefing and Expert Report Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 609 Joint MOTION TO EXTEND Certain Briefing and Expert Report Deadlines by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #588 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #602 MOTION to Seal #573 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson by Ford Motor Company., #578 SEALED MOTION to E filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 608 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #605 Sealed Response to Motion,, Versata's REDACTED Response to Ford's Motion to Exclude the Declaration of S. Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value (Dkt. 568) filed by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 607 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #604 Sealed Response to Motion, Versata's REDACTED Response to Ford's Motion to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions & Testimony of Christopher Bokhart & Craig Elson (Dkt. 573) filed by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 606 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #603 Sealed Response to Motion,, Versata's REDACTED Response to Ford's Motion to Exclude the October 9, 2018 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek (Dkt. 578) filed by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 605 SEALED RESPONSE re #568 Sealed Motion,,,,,,,, Versata Response to Ford's Motion to Exclude the Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - 02-01-2019 Krauss Declaration ISO Versata's Daubert Response, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Deposition of Seth Krauss, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Uniram v. Taiwan, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Myers Rebuttal Report - Patents - 10-26-17, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Deposition of Craig Elson, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Deposition of Christopher Bokhart, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Krauss Correction and Signature page) (Mitby, Steven)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 604 SEALED RESPONSE re #573 Sealed Motion,, Versata's Response to Ford's Motion to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Christopher Bokhart and Craig Elson by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Deposition of Christopher Bokhart, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Expert Report of Julie L. Davis, #3 Exhibit Ex. A - Deposition of Christopher Bokhart) (Mitby, Steven)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 603 SEALED RESPONSE re #578 Sealed Motion,, Versata's Response to Ford's Motion to Exclude the October 9, 2018 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Screenshot of Ford line count on Versata software, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Malek 11-9-18 Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - 2017-04-12 Ford supp rspns to Versata ROGs 17 36, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - 2018-12-03 Ford's Response to ROG No.38(37), #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Expert Report and Attachments of Julie L. Davis, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - 2018-10-09 Versata Supplemental Joint Damages Report and Exhibits, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Malek Dec Ex. A) (Mitby, Steven)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 602 MOTION to Seal #573 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson by Ford Motor Company., #578 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the October 9, 2018 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek and Related Testimony by Ford Motor Company., #568 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" by Ford Motor Company. Versata's Unopposed Motion to Seal Responses to DKT Nos. 568, 573 & 578 by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 601 OPINION AND ORDER Granting Plaintiff Ford Motor Company's #526 and #532 Motion for Summary Judgment on (1) Ford's Claim for Declaratory Judgment of No Copyright Infringement and (2) Defendant's Copyright Infringement Claim. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #599 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #573 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson by Ford Motor Company., [56 filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 600 NOTICE by Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. re #565 Sealed Document - Other, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Mitby, Steven)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 599 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #573 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson by Ford Motor Company., #568 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" by Ford Motor Company. by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mitby, Steven)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 598 REDACTED VERSION of #597 Sealed Document - Other by Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. (Mitby, Steven)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #596 MOTION to Seal #551 Sealed Document - Other Unopposed Motion to File Versata's Reply in Support of Its Objections to the Spec. Mstr. R & R DKT 551 Under Seal filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 597 SEALED Versatas Defs Reply on Objections to Special Master's Report & Recommendation on Patent Summary Judgment DKT#551 re #565 Sealed Document - Other, by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 596 MOTION to Seal #551 Sealed Document - Other Unopposed Motion to File Versata's Reply in Support of Its Objections to the Spec. Mstr. R & R DKT 551 Under Seal by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 595 SEALED Exhibits 20-42 to Ford's Second Motion for Reconsideration re #594 SEALED MOTION Second Motion for Reconsideration of Order (Dkt. #534) Granting Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Fords Complaint by Ford Motor Company. by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20 - Release Plan: Auto Config Maint 3.2 v. 1 FILED UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit 21 - October 2000 E-mail and Attachment, Select Workspace Screen FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 22 - Software Subscription Amendment 3 and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 23 - July 2000 E-mail, New IDs for 6/22 drop FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 24 - January 2000 E-mail String, Master Dictionary Details FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 25 - January 2000 E-mail, Master Dictionary Details: Descriptions FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 26 - September 12, 2000 Usability Report FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 27 - June 2000 E-mail, Usability Session Notes FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 28 - 2002 ACM Feature Requests FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 29 - April 2003 E-mail String, ACM Questions FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit 30 - Myers TS Rebuttal Report FILED UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit 31 - USPN 7739080, #13 Exhibit 32 - September 2000 User Session Notes FILED UNDER SEAL, #14 Exhibit 33 - Implementing Trilogy as Master of N.A. Engineering Vehicle Lines FILED UNDER SEAL, #15 Exhibit 34 - April 2001, Business causes for timing FILED UNDER SEAL, #16 Exhibit 35 - November 2000, Handling Restriction Rules FILED UNDER SEAL, #17 Exhibit 36 - VOLMOD Algorithm FILED UNDER SEAL, #18 Exhibit 37 - December 1999 E-mail, Data Loading FILED UNDER SEAL, #19 Exhibit 38 - MDD Primitives FILED UNDER SEAL, #20 Exhibit 39 - August 1999 E-mail with Attachment, Files We Discussed FILED UNDER SEAL, #21 Exhibit 40 - April 2000 E-mail and Attachment, PDC Use Cases FILED UNDER SEAL, #22 Exhibit 41 - March 2002 E-mail and Attachment, Draft Versions of Use Cases FILED UNDER SEAL, #23 Exhibit 42 - Ford PROOF Delivery Milestones FILED UNDER SEAL) (LeRoy, John)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 594 SEALED MOTION Second Motion for Reconsideration of Order (Dkt. #534) Granting Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Fords Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - ACM Presentation FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 2 - ACM Paper (portion) FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 3 - MSSA FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 4 - Malek TS Report FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 5 - Versatas 12/31/2015 TS Contentions FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 6 - Versatas 2/1/2016 TS Contentions FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 7 - Versatas 2/28/2017 TS Contentions FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 8 - Versatas 6/20/2017 TS Contentions FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 9 - 1997 Mustang Brochure FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit 10 - Release 3.6 Content Ideas FILED UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit 11 - USPN 7953779, #13 Exhibit 12 - Appendix II: Workspace Overview FILED UNDER SEAL, #14 Exhibit 13 - Proposal for Ford GPD 2/21 Delivery FILED UNDER SEAL, #15 Exhibit 14 - October 2000 E-mails, Vehicle Line Summary Codes FILED UNDER SEAL, #16 Exhibit 15 - August 2002 Ford of Europe GPD User Testing FILED UNDER SEAL, #17 Exhibit 16 - August 2000 Customer Team Meeting FILED UNDER SEAL, #18 Exhibit 17 -September 24, 2000 Usability Report FILED UNDER SEAL, #19 Exhibit 18 -September 2000 E-mail and Attachment, GPD Tracking Spreadsheet FILED UNDER SEAL, #20 Exhibit 19 - Severity 5 Issues FILED UNDER SEAL) (LeRoy, John)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 593 SEALED Declaration of Frederick Wilkinson in Support of Ford's Second Motion for Reconsideration by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 6/14/2000 Email FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit B - Ford Specifications from 2001 FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit C - August 2000 Ford Future State Diagrams FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit D -Ford Vehicle Order Simulation System Document FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit E - 7/31/2001 Email and Attachments FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit F - 8/21/2004 Email and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit G - 4/29/2005 Email and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit H - 8/1/2003 Email Chain FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit I - 9/19/2001 Email Chain and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit J - 2/28/2005 Email and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL) (LeRoy, John)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 592 SEALED Declaration of Martin Pipoly in Support of Fords Second Motion for Reconsideration by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 8/23/1996 Business Profile FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit B - 8/23/1996 Business Requirements FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit C - Ford Historical Document FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit D - August 2000 Email and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit E - 9/3/1999 Email and Attachments FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit F - 4/26/2001 Email and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit G - November 1999 Letter with Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit H -April 2000 Email FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit I - October 2000 Email Chain FILED UNDER SEAL) (LeRoy, John)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 591 SEALED Declaration of John Mutter in Support of Ford's Second Motion for Reconsideration by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 8/23/1996 Business Profile FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit B - 8/23/1996 Business Requirements FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit C - 9/3/1999 Email and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit D - August 2000 Email and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit E - October 2000 Email Chain FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit F - September 2000 Email Chain FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit G - February 2000 Email FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit H - August 2000 Email Chain FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit I - Excerpts of PFDB Guide dated Feb. 1997 FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit J - Release Plan ACM-Engineering v3.5 dated 6/18/2002 FILED UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit K - Ford Workflow Chart FILED UNDER SEAL) (LeRoy, John)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 590 SEALED Declaration of Robert Czech in Support of Ford's Second Motion for Reconsideration by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - November 13, 2000 Email and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit B - May 25, 2001 Email and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit C - June 2001 Email Chain FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit D - August 2001 Email Chain FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit E - February 2001 Email and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit F - August 2, 2000 Email and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit G - August 20, 2000 Email and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL) (LeRoy, John)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 589 SEALED Declaration of Darlene Coomer in Support of Fords Second Motion for Reconsideration by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - June 2001 Email from Trilogy to Ford FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit B - 4/26/2001 Email and Attachment from Ford to Trilogy FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit C - August 2000 Email and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit D - 3/2/2001 email to Trilogy FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit E - August 2000 Ford Email FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit F - 3/15/2002 Ford Email and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit G - Storyboard Document FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit I - August 2002 Email and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit J - April 2001 Email and Attachment FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit K - October 2000 Email FILED UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit L - ACM Walkthrough Document FILED UNDER SEAL) (LeRoy, John)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 588 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Mitby email 1-21-19, #3 Exhibit B - Kim email 10-22-18, #4 Exhibit C - Kim email 11-14-18, #5 Exhibit D - Kim email 11-15-18, #6 Exhibit E - Kim email 1-22-19, #7 Exhibit F - Kim email 1-22-19) (LeRoy, John)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 587 MOTION to Seal Ford's Second Motion for Reconsideration, Supporting Declarations & Exhibits (UNOPPOSED) by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #587 MOTION to Seal Ford's Second Motion for Reconsideration, Supporting Declarations & Exhibits (UNOPPOSED) filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #586 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #575 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion - Free, #584 Order,, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,, Terminate Motions, #578 SEALED MOTION to Exc filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 586 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #575 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion - Free, #584 Order,, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,, Terminate Motions, #578 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the October 9, 2018 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek and Related Testimony by Ford Motor Company. Joint Motion to Extend Certain Briefing & Expert Report Deadlines by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 585 TRANSCRIPT of MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION, TO REALIGN PARTIES AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: COPYRIGHT held on December 19, 2018. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 99) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 2/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2019. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part the Parties' #482 and #571 Joint MOTIONS to Set Calendar Dates. (Discovery due by 3/12/2019.) **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES** Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #581 MOTION to Seal (UNOPPOSED) Ford's Response to Defendants' Objection to the Special Master's R&R Regarding Patent Claims on Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 583 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #565 Sealed Document - Other, Fords Response to Defendants Objections to the Special Masters R&R Regarding Patent Claims on Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John) Modified on 1/8/2019 (SOso). [REDACTED VERSION]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 582 SEALED Ford's Response to Defendants' Objection to the Special Master's R&R Regarding Patent Claims on Motions for Summary Judgment by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 581 MOTION to Seal (UNOPPOSED) Ford's Response to Defendants' Objection to the Special Master's R&R Regarding Patent Claims on Motions for Summary Judgment by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 580 NOTICE OF HEARING on #574 MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION, #579 MOTION to Exclude the October 9, 2018 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek and Related Testimony REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION, #578 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the October 9, 2018 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek and Related Testimony by Ford Motor Company., #568 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" by Ford Motor Company., #569 MOTION to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION, #573 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson by Ford Motor Company.. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2019 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #577 MOTION to Seal (UNOPPOSED) Ford's Motion to Exclude the 10-9-18 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek and Exhibits filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 579 MOTION to Exclude the October 9, 2018 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek and Related Testimony REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - CONFIDENTIAL ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL Malek Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - CONFIDENTIAL ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL Malek Deposition Transcript dated 11/9/2018, #4 Exhibit C - CONFIDENTIAL ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL Versatas Second Supplemental Response to Interrogatories 1, 2, 3 and 17) (LeRoy, John)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 578 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the October 9, 2018 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek and Related Testimony by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - CONFIDENTIAL ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL Malek Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - CONFIDENTIAL ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL Malek Deposition Transcript dated 11/9/2018, #4 Exhibit C -CONFIDENTIAL ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL Versatas Second Supplemental Response to Interrogatories 1, 2, 3 and 17) (LeRoy, John)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 577 MOTION to Seal (UNOPPOSED) Ford's Motion to Exclude the 10-9-18 Declaration of Dr. Sam Malek and Exhibits by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 576 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #573 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson by Ford Motor Company., #568 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" by Ford Motor Company. by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Mitby, Steven)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #576 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #573 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson by Ford Motor Company., [56 filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER on Motion Hearing. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 12/19/2018 re #538 MOTION for Reconsideration re #534 Order, Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Ford's Complaint (Trade Secret Ownership) filed by Ford Motor Company, #526 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ford's Claim for Declaratory Judgment of No Copyright Infringement, and on Defendants' Copyright Infringement Claim filed by Ford Motor Company, #546 MOTION to Realign Parties filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. Disposition: #526 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ford's Claim for Declaratory Judgment of No Copyright Infringement, and on Defendants' Copyright Infringement Claim TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; #538 MOTION for Reconsideration DENIED; #546 MOTION to Realign Parties GRANTED. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon) Modified on 12/19/2018 (HMon). Modified on 12/20/2018 (HMon).
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #572 MOTION to Seal (UNOPPOSED) Ford's Motion and Exhibits to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Christopher Bokhart and Craig Elson filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 574 MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - CONFIDENTIAL FILED ONLY UNDER SEAL Supplemental Joint Damages Report of Elson and Bokhart dated 10/9/2018, #3 Exhibit 2 - CONFIDENTIAL FILED ONLY UNDER SEAL Excerpts of Bokhart Deposition Transcript dated 11/13/2018, #4 Exhibit 3 - CONFIDENTIAL FILED ONLY UNDER SEAL Excerpts of Elson Deposition Transcript dated 11/13/2018, #5 Exhibit 4 - CONFIDENTIAL FILED ONLY UNDER SEAL Excerpts of Elson Expert Report Related to PDOR2 Damages dated 12/10/2018) (LeRoy, John)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 573 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Bokhart and Elson by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL Supplemental Joint Damages Report of Elson and Bokhart dated 10/9/2018, #3 Exhibit 2 - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL Excerpts of Bokhart Deposition Transcript dated 11/13/2018, #4 Exhibit 3 - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL Excerpts of Elson Deposition Transcript dated 11/13/2018, #5 Exhibit 4 - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL Excerpts of Elson Expert Report Related to PDOR2 Damages dated 12/10/2018) (LeRoy, John)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 572 MOTION to Seal (UNOPPOSED) Ford's Motion and Exhibits to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions and Testimony of Versata's Damages Experts Christopher Bokhart and Craig Elson by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #570 Joint MOTION TO EXTEND Time to File Response & Reply to Objections to R&R of Special Master re #565 Sealed Document - Other, filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 571 Joint MOTION to Set Calendar Dates by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 570 Joint MOTION TO EXTEND Time to File Response & Reply to Objections to R&R of Special Master re #565 Sealed Document - Other, by Ford Motor Company. (Smith, Christopher)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #567 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Certain Exhibits & Motion to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 569 MOTION to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Krauss 10/9/18 Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Spreadsheet attached to Krauss 10/9/18 Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Krauss 10/24/18 Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #5 Exhibit D -CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Malek 12/20/17 Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #6 Exhibit E -CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Internal Audit Results, #7 Exhibit F - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Release Notes, #8 Exhibit G - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Versatas Supplemental Amended Trade Secret Contentions, #9 Exhibit H - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Malek Trade Secret Rpt. Table of Contents & Excerpts, #10 Exhibit I - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL Excerpts of Joint Supplement Damages Report of Elson & Bokhart, #11 Exhibit J -CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Elson Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #12 Exhibit K - U.S. Patent No. 7,200,582, #13 Exhibit L - U.S. Patent No. 7,464,064, #14 Exhibit M - U.S. Patent No. 7,739,080, #15 Exhibit N - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Versatas October 2014 letter including Annexure B, #16 Exhibit O - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - April 12, 2000 E-mail and attached Ford Design Doc, #17 Exhibit P - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - ACM - Marketing v3.5 Functional Walkthrough, #18 Exhibit Q - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Myers 12/12/18 Declaration, #19 Exhibit R - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - April 5, 2000 E-mail and attached Appendix V: Consistency Checking, #20 Exhibit S - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Appendix VII: Promotion/Release Scenario, #21 Exhibit T - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL Bokhart Deposition Transcripts Excerpts, #22 Exhibit U - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Marketing Intent Scoping Functional Walkthrough, Version 1.2, #23 Exhibit V - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - MCA SRS 0.5 v. 1.19) (LeRoy, John)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 568 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Krauss 10/9/18 Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Spreadsheet attached to Krauss 10/9/18 Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Krauss 10/24/18 Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #5 Exhibit D - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Malek 12/20/17 Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #6 Exhibit E - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Internal Audit Results, #7 Exhibit F - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Release Notes, #8 Exhibit G -CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Versatas Supplemental Amended Trade Secret Contentions, #9 Exhibit H - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Malek Trade Secret Rpt. Table of Contents & Excerpts, #10 Exhibit I - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL Excerpts of Joint Supplement Damages Report of Elson & Bokhart, #11 Exhibit J - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Elson Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #12 Exhibit N - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Versatas October 2014 letter including Annexure B, #13 Exhibit O - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - April 12, 2000 E-mail and attached Ford Design Doc, #14 Exhibit P - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - ACM - Marketing v3.5 Functional Walkthrough, #15 Exhibit Q - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Myers 12/12/18 Declaration, #16 Exhibit R - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - April 5, 2000 E-mail and attached Appendix V: Consistency Checking, #17 Exhibit S - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Appendix VII: Promotion/Release Scenario, #18 Exhibit T - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL Bokhart Deposition Transcripts Excerpts, #19 Exhibit U - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - Marketing Intent Scoping Functional Walkthrough, Version 1.2, #20 Exhibit V - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL - MCA SRS 0.5 v. 1.19) (LeRoy, John)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 567 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Certain Exhibits & Motion to Exclude the "Declaration of Seth Krauss on Apportionment of Software Value" by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 566 REDACTED VERSION of #565 Sealed Document - Other, Versata Defendants' Objections to [Dkt. 551] by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Mitby, Steven)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 565 SEALED VERSATA DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER re #551 Sealed Document - Other by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Mitby, Steven)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 564 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Objections to the Special Master's Report and Recommendation by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #564 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Objections to the Special Master's Report and Recommendation filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #563 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #551 Sealed Document - Other Special Master's Report and Recommendation filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 563 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #551 Sealed Document - Other Special Master's Report and Recommendation by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 562 REPLY to Response re #546 MOTION to Realign Parties Versata Defs Reply in Support of Motion to Realign Parties filed by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
October 27, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #561 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #551 Sealed Document - Other filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 561 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #551 Sealed Document - Other by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Mitby, Steven)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 560 NOTICE OF HEARING on #538 MOTION for Reconsideration re #534 Order, Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Ford's Complaint (Trade Secret Ownership). Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2018 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #559 MOTION for Hearing re #538 MOTION for Reconsideration re #534 Order, Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Ford's Complaint (Trade Secret Ownership) (UNOPPOSED) filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #557 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (UNOPPOSED) filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 559 MOTION for Hearing re #538 MOTION for Reconsideration re #534 Order, Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Ford's Complaint (Trade Secret Ownership) (UNOPPOSED) by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 558 REPLY to Response re #538 MOTION for Reconsideration re #534 Order, Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Ford's Complaint (Trade Secret Ownership) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 84 Lumber Co v Thompson Thrift Constr., #3 Exhibit B - Rzadkowolski v Metamora Twp.) (LeRoy, John)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 557 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (UNOPPOSED) by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 556 NOTICE OF HEARING on #526 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ford's Claim for Declaratory Judgment of No Copyright Infringement, and on Defendants' Copyright Infringement Claim and #546 MOTION to Realign Parties. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2018 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #555 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #546 MOTION to Realign Parties filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 555 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #546 MOTION to Realign Parties by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/19/2018. (HMon)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 554 RESPONSE to #546 MOTION to Realign Parties filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Everlight Elecs Co v Nichia Corp, #3 Exhibit B - Radio Sys v Lalor) (LeRoy, John)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 553 RESPONSE to #538 MOTION for Reconsideration re #534 Order, Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Ford's Complaint (Trade Secret Ownership) filed by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 552 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 10/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE AND VIA E-MAIL** (HMon)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 551 SEALED Report and Recommendation of the Special Master Regarding Patent Claims on Motions for Summary Judgment by Larry Graham. (HMon)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #550 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #546 MOTION to Realign Parties UNOPPOSED filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 550 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #546 MOTION to Realign Parties UNOPPOSED by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/11/2018. (HMon)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 10/11/2018 at 1:45 PM (EST) before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED VIA E-MAIL** (HMon)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 549 REPLY to Response re #526 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ford's Claim for Declaratory Judgment of No Copyright Infringement, and on Defendants' Copyright Infringement Claim filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit F - U.S. Patent No. 7200582, #3 Exhibit G - 10-7-14 Termination Letter, #4 Exhibit H - Updated Termination Letter) (LeRoy, John)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #548 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - UNOPPOSED filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 548 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - UNOPPOSED by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 547 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #538 MOTION for Reconsideration re #534 Order, Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Ford's Complaint (Trade Secret Ownership) - Unopposed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Young, Rodger)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #547 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #538 MOTION for Reconsideration re #534 Order, Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Ford's Complaint (Trade Secret Ownership) - filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 546 MOTION to Realign Parties by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 545 TRANSCRIPT of Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment before Special Master Graham held on 09/13/2018. (Court Reporter: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 286) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/18/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2018. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 544 RESPONSE to #526 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ford's Claim for Declaratory Judgment of No Copyright Infringement, and on Defendants' Copyright Infringement Claim - REDACTED filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - cover page only, #3 Exhibit B - cover page only, #4 Exhibit C - cover page only, #5 Exhibit D - cover page only, #6 Exhibit E - cover page only, #7 Exhibit F - cover page only, #8 Exhibit G - cover page only, #9 Exhibit H - cover page only, #10 Exhibit I - cover page only, #11 Exhibit J - cover page only, #12 Exhibit K - cover page only) (Young, Rodger)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER Granting #541 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 542 SEALED RESPONSE re #526 Motion for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Krauss Declaration ISO DF Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit B - Krauss Declaration ISO DF Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit C - Krauss Declaration ISO DF Response to Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment on Copyright Claims, #5 Exhibit D - Y. Fradkin Deposition, #6 Exhibit E - N. Gupta Deposition, #7 Exhibit F - S. Krauss Deposition, #8 Exhibit G - V. Alla Deposition, #9 Exhibit H - S. Smith Deposition, #10 Exhibit I - Ford emails, #11 Exhibit J - P. Greenspun Depositon, #12 Exhibit K - Source Code) (Young, Rodger)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 541 MOTION to Seal (UNOPPOSED) Response, including exhibits, to Ford's Summary Judgment Motion on Copyright Claims by All Defendants. (Young, Rodger)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 540 Redacted Version of #519 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearings held on 07/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2018. (Smith, R.)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER Requiring Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's #538 Motion for Reconsideration. Response due by 10/9/2018, Reply due by 10/16/2018. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 538 MOTION for Reconsideration re #534 Order, Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 4 and 5 of Ford's Complaint (Trade Secret Ownership) by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER Granting Defendants' Transcript Redaction Request. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 536 NOTICE of Appearance by Demetrios Anaipakos on behalf of All Defendants. (Anaipakos, Demetrios)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER (1) Denying in Part Plaintiff's #354 and #358 MOTION for Summary Judgment, (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' #379 and #380 MOTION for Summary Judgment, and (3) Granting Defendants' Request to File Supplemental Expert Reports. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew R. Carter appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Carter, Matthew)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 532 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #526 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ford's Claim for Declaratory Judgment of No Copyright Infringement, and on Defendants' Copyright Infringement Claim CORRECTED filed by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER Granting Ford Motor Company's #527 Motion to File Confidential Exhibits to Its #526 Motion for Summary Judgment of No Copyright Infringement, and on Defendants' Copyright Infringement Claim Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER Granting Defendants' #529 Motion to Extend Time to File Response re #526 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ford's Claim for Declaratory Judgment of No Copyright Infringement, and on Defendants' Copyright Infringement Claim. Response due by 9/25/2018. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 529 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #526 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ford's Claim for Declaratory Judgment of No Copyright Infringement, and on Defendants' Copyright Infringement Claim by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 528 SEALED EXHIBIT A - Dr. Malek's Opening Expert Report and Exhibits B-E re #527 MOTION to Seal #526 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ford's Claim for Declaratory Judgment of No Copyright Infringement, and on Defendants' Copyright Infringement Claim Exhibits A-E, #526 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ford's Claim for Declaratory Judgment of No Copyright Infringement, and on Defendants' Copyright Infringement Claim by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Dr. Malek's Reply Expert Report, #2 Exhibit C - Myers Rebuttal Expert Report, #3 Exhibit D - Versata's Fourth Supp. Response to Ford Interrogatory No. 5, #4 Exhibit E - Dr. Malek's 12-20-17 Dep. Transcript. Excerpts) (LeRoy, John)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 527 MOTION to Seal #526 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ford's Claim for Declaratory Judgment of No Copyright Infringement, and on Defendants' Copyright Infringement Claim Exhibits A-E by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits) (LeRoy, John)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 526 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ford's Claim for Declaratory Judgment of No Copyright Infringement, and on Defendants' Copyright Infringement Claim by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits) (LeRoy, John)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 525 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #358 MOTION for Summary Judgment (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Declaration of John S. LeRoy, #3 Exhibit 80 - FILED ONLY UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 81 - FILED ONLY UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 82 - FILED ONLY UNDER SEAL) (LeRoy, John)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 524 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #354 SEALED MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Ford Motor Company. on SJ Issues On Sale Bar filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Mitby, Steven)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 523 SEALED Supplemental Brief Regarding the "On-Sale" Bar ('582 and '064 Patents) re #354 SEALED MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Ford Motor Company. by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Declaration of John LeRoy, #3 Exhibit 80 - [CONF] Smith Dep. Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 81 - [CONF] Smith email of 2-11-2002, #5 Exhibit 82 - [CONF] Ford GPD Release 3.2 Launch Acceptance) (LeRoy, John)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Dan K. Webb appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Webb, Dan)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Striking #521 Notice of Appearance filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. **DANIEL WEBB MUST FILE THE APPEARANCE ON HIS OWN BEHALF USING HIS OWN CM/ECF LOGIN AND PASSWORD** Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 521 [STRICKEN] NOTICE of Appearance by Steven John Mitby on behalf of All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven) Modified on 8/14/2018 (HMon).
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 520 JOINT STIPULATED ORDER Dismissing Certain Claims Against Versata. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Striking #518 Stipulation filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. **PLEASE SEE R11 OF THE ECF POLICIES AND PROCEDURES MANUAL FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS** Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 519 SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearings held on July 24, 2018. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 184) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 8/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/6/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2018. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.) Modified on 9/25/2018: Sealed per #537 order. (JPur)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 518 [STRICKEN] STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Dismissing Certain Claims Against Versata by All Defendants (Mitby, Steven) Modified on 8/7/2018 (HMon).
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 517 TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on June 27, 2018. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 25) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 8/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2018. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER on Summary Judgment Hearing and #503 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 7/24/2018 re #364 SEALED MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc., #379 SEALED MOTION re #364 SEALED MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. by All Defendants. filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc., #358 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company, #354 SEALED MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company, #380 MOTION for Summary Judgment - REDACTED filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HMon)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 515 NOTICE by All Defendants Versatas Reply Letter Brief regarding its request for leave for Supplemental Expert Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Prism Technologies v Sprint Spectrum, #2 Exhibit B. Apple v Samsung) (Mitby, Steven)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 514 NOTICE by All Defendants Versatas Letter Brief Requesting Leave for Supplemental Expert Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Skyhook Wireless v Google, #2 Exhibit B. Enovsys v AT&T, #3 Exhibit C. Golden Bridge Tech v Apple Order, #4 Exhibit D. Golden Bridge Tech v Apple Order, #5 Exhibit E. GPNE Corp v Apple, #6 Exhibit F. NetAirus Technologies) (Mitby, Steven)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 513 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Letter to Judge in Response to Versata's Request for Supplemental Expert Reports (LeRoy, John)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 512 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven John Mitby on behalf of All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 511 SEALED MOTION (UNOPPOSED) for Leave for Ford to Supplement its Record on Summary Judgment re #354 SEALED MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Ford Motor Company. by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - CONFIDENTIAL - Versatas 8/28/2002 Email regarding GM Presentation, #3 Exhibit B - CONFIDENTIAL - Ratton 1/17/2018 Deposition Transcript Excerpt, #4 Exhibit C - CONFIDENTIAL - Versatas 8/28/2002 BLANK Email regarding GM Presentation) (LeRoy, John)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference on 7/17/2018 is Cancelled re #510 Notice to Appear. (HMon)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 510 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 7/17/2018 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE TO JOIN THE CALL** (HMon)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER Referring Patent Portions of Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment to Special Master Lawrence Graham. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #509 Order on Larry Graham at 701 Fifth Ave., Suite 4800, Seattle, WA 98104. (HMon)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 535 [REDACTED] OPINION AND ORDER (1) Granting Plaintiff's #348 MOTIONS to Exclude the Expert Testimony of James Martin, #346 and #351 the Expert Testimony of Christopher Bokhart, #347 and #349 the Trade Secret Damages Opinions of Craig Elson, and #344 the Copyright Infringement Opinions of Dr. Samuel Malek, and (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' #352 Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Monty Myers. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 508 RESPONSE to #503 MOTION for Reconsideration re #499 Order on Motion - Free to Modify Case Caption Response in Opposition to Ford's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Modify Case Caption filed by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/9/2018. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HMon)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 506 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 7/9/2018 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE AND VIA EMAIL** (HMon)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 505 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 6/27/2018 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE AND VIA EMAIL TO JOIN THE CALL** (HMon)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/27/2018. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER Requiring Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's #503 Motion for Reconsideration. Response due by 7/9/2018. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 503 MOTION for Reconsideration re #499 Order on Motion - Free to Modify Case Caption by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Process Server Notice of Non-Service re Trilogy Dev, #3 Exhibit B - Process Server email re TX entity search for Trilogy Dev, #4 Exhibit C - Nikkila return email to process server dated 5-11-2015, #5 Exhibit D - Ford supplemental 30(b)(6) notice-6-16-2017) (LeRoy, John)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 502 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #501 Supplemental Brief, Versata Defs' Response to Ford's Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Strike Dr. Malek's Opinions Regarding Copyright Infringement filed by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 501 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #344 MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. SAM MALEK'S OPINIONS REGARDING COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT , #475 Supplemental Brief, filed by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)[DOCUMENT IS TITLED A RESPONSE] Modified on 6/11/2018 (NAhm).
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 500 TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on May 24, 2018. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 12) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 7/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/10/2018. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER granting #338 Motion to modify caption. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (DPer)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 498 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/30/2016. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheri Ward, www.transcriptorders.com) (Number of Pages: 29) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 6/25/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/4/2018. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Ward, S)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 497 NOTICE OF HEARING on #380 MOTION for Summary Judgment - REDACTED, #358 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #354 SEALED MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #379 SEALED MOTION re #364 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2018 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 496 Redacted Version of #472 TRANSCRIPT of DAUBERT MOTIONS held on 04/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2018. (Goodrich, P)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 495 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. McBride on behalf of All Defendants. (McBride, Michael)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 494 NOTICE of Appearance by Masood Anjom on behalf of All Defendants. (Anjom, Masood)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 493 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott W. Clark on behalf of All Defendants. (Clark, Scott)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER Granting Defendants' #490 Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER Granting Defendants' #488 Motion to Seal Portions of Hearing Transcript (DKT. #472). Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 490 MOTION Withdrawal of Counsel Unopposed by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 489 SEALED EXHIBIT re #488 MOTION to Seal #472 Transcript,, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Hearing Transcript Redacted) (Mitby, Steven)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 488 MOTION to Seal #472 Transcript,, by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/24/2018. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 487 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 5/24/2018 at 1:30 PM EST before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE TO JOIN THE CALL** (HMon)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 486 NOTICE of Appearance by Amir H. Alavi on behalf of All Defendants. (Alavi, Amir)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 484 MOTION re #472 Transcript,, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redaction Request) (Mitby, Steven)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 483 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company re #354 SEALED MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Ford Motor Company. Citation of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SAP v. InvestPic) (LeRoy, John)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 482 Joint MOTION to Set Calendar Dates by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #481 MOTION for Leave to File VERSATA DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO FORDS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE DR. MALEKS OPINIONS REGARDING COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 481 MOTION for Leave to File VERSATA DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO FORDS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE DR. MALEKS OPINIONS REGARDING COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Supp Brief on Malek) (Mitby, Steven)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #478 MOTION for Leave to File UNOPPOSED to File Response to Versata's Supplemental Brief filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 480 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyung T. Kim on behalf of All Defendants. (Kim, Kyung)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 479 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of withdrawal of #477 MOTION for Leave to File Ford's Response to Versata's Supplemental Brief Opposing Ford's Motion to Strike Dr. Malek's Copyright Infringement Opinions . (LeRoy, John)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 478 MOTION for Leave to File UNOPPOSED to File Response to Versata's Supplemental Brief by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ford's Response to Versata's Supplemental Brief, #2 Proposed Order) (LeRoy, John)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 477 MOTION for Leave to File Ford's Response to Versata's Supplemental Brief Opposing Ford's Motion to Strike Dr. Malek's Copyright Infringement Opinions by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ford's Response to Versata's Supplemental Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (LeRoy, John)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 476 SEALED EXHIBIT C re #475 Supplemental Brief, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Depo of Malek Excerpts) (Mitby, Steven)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 475 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #344 MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. SAM MALEK'S OPINIONS REGARDING COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibit A - Source Code Object Code Illustrations, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Sam Malek, #4 Exhibit C - SEALED Malek Depo Excerpts) (Mitby, Steven)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 474 SEALED EXHIBIT 7 - Excerpts of Malek Deposition Transcript re #473 Supplemental Brief, by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 473 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #344 MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. SAM MALEK'S OPINIONS REGARDING COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 7 - Confidential Marker - Filed Only Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 8 - Versata Hearing Demonstrative) (LeRoy, John)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 472 SEALED TRANSCRIPT of DAUBERT MOTIONS held on April 24, 2018. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 215) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 5/21/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2018. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P) Modified on 5/25/2018: Sealed per #491 order. (JPur)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 4/24/2018 re #344 MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. SAM MALEK'S OPINIONS REGARDING COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed by Ford Motor Company, #347 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Craig Elson by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company, #352 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Monty Myers filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc., #349 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Craig Elson filed by Ford Motor Company, #346 SEALED MOTION EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF VERSATA EXPERT CHRISTOPHER BOKHART by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company, #348 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF VERSATA EXPERT JAMES MARTIN filed by Ford Motor Company, #351 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF VERSATA EXPERT CHRISTOPHER BOKHART re #346 SEALED MOTION EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF VERSATA EXPERT CHRISTOPHER BOKHART by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company Disposition: Motions Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 471 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #338 MOTION Modify the Caption , #470 Supplemental Brief filed by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 470 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #338 MOTION Modify the Caption filed by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 469 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #466 Supplemental Brief, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Dkt. #307 in Versata Software v. Sun Microsystems, Case No. 2:06-cv-00358, #3 Exhibit 2 - Texas Secretary of State website search of Trilogy Development Group Inc., #4 Exhibit 3 - California Secretary of State website search of Trilogy Development Group, Inc., #5 Exhibit 4 - Delaware Secretary of State website search of Trilogy Development Group) (LeRoy, John)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 468 Corrected Version of #467 TRANSCRIPT of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer held on 09/25/2015. Correction as to the date on the title page to reflect the correct date of 9/25/2015 and not 9/25/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2018. (Smith, R.)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 467 TRANSCRIPT of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer held on 09/25/2015. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 84) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 5/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2018. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 466 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #338 MOTION Modify the Caption filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Comparison Chart, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint - TX Action, #4 Exhibit C - Motion to Dismiss - TX Action) (Young, Rodger)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Attorney Stephen W. King is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: no longer in case. (King, Stephen)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 465 REPLY to Response re #379 SEALED MOTION re #364 SEALED MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. by All Defendants. filed by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 464 SEALED REPLY to Response re #358 Motion for Summary Judgment,,, #354 Sealed Motion,, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Leshan, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 68 - [CONF] Nikkila 2nd Decl_2018-03-28, #4 Exhibit 69 - [CONF] Malek Trade Secret Expert Report, #5 Exhibit 70 - [CONF] Malek Dep. Tr. Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 71 - [CONF] ACM User Guide from Web, #7 Exhibit 72 - [CONF] Supp. Rep. Monty Myers, #8 Exhibit 73 - [CONF] Dep. Tr. Excerpt Michael Sullivan, #9 Exhibit 74 - [CONF] Myers Rebuttal Trade Secret Report, #10 Exhibit 75 - [CONF] Ford Source Code, #11 Exhibit 76 - [CONF] Malek Patent Expert Report, #12 Exhibit 77 - [CONF] Myers Rebuttal Report Excerpts, #13 Exhibit 78 - [CONF] Wilson Dep. Tr. Excerpt, #14 Exhibit 79 - [CONF] Bates #FV128772) (LeRoy, John)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 463 REPLY to Response re #358 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #354 SEALED MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Leshan, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 68 - conf marker page - filed only under seal, #4 Exhibit 69 - conf marker page - filed only under seal, #5 Exhibit 70 - conf marker page - filed only under seal, #6 Exhibit 71 - conf marker page - filed only under seal, #7 Exhibit 72 - conf marker page - filed only under seal, #8 Exhibit 73 - conf marker page - filed only under seal, #9 Exhibit 74 - conf marker page - filed only under seal, #10 Exhibit 75 - conf marker page - filed only under seal, #11 Exhibit 76 - conf marker page - filed only under seal, #12 Exhibit 77 - conf marker page - filed only under seal, #13 Exhibit 78 - conf marker page - filed only under seal, #14 Exhibit 79 - conf marker page - filed only under seal) (LeRoy, John)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 462 EXHIBIT re #457 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 19, #8 Exhibit 20) (Mitby, Steven)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 461 SEALED EXHIBIT 0, 13, 16 & 17 re #457 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 16, #4 Exhibit 17) (Mitby, Steven)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 460 SEALED REPLY to Response re #347 Sealed Motion,,,,,, #349 Motion,,,,,,,,, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 29 - [CONF] Excerpts from Malek Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit 30 - [CONF] Excerpts from Elson 12-8-17 Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit 31 - [CONF] Excerpt from Elson Expert Reply Report, #5 Exhibit 32 - [CONF] Excerpts from Rebuttal Expert Report of Davis) (LeRoy, John)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 459 REPLY to Response re #347 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Craig Elson by Ford Motor Company., #349 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Craig Elson filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 29 - conf marker page - only filed under seal, #3 Exhibit 30 - conf marker page - only filed under seal, #4 Exhibit 31 - conf marker page - only filed under seal, #5 Exhibit 32 - conf marker page - only filed under seal) (LeRoy, John)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 458 SEALED EXHIBIT 10 & 11 re #457 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 11) (Mitby, Steven)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 457 SEALED REPLY to Response re #379 Sealed Motion, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibits Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 9) (Mitby, Steven)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 456 SEALED REPLY to Response re #346 Sealed Motion,,,,, #351 Motion,,,,,,,, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 29 [CONF] Excerpts of Myers Patent Inf. Rebuttal Report, #3 Exhibit 30 [CONF] Versata Response to Ford 1st Int. No 16) (LeRoy, John)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 455 REPLY to Response re #346 SEALED MOTION EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF VERSATA EXPERT CHRISTOPHER BOKHART by Ford Motor Company., #351 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF VERSATA EXPERT CHRISTOPHER BOKHART re #346 SEALED MOTION EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF VERSATA EXPERT CHRISTOPHER BOKHART by Ford Motor Company. filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 29 - conf marker page - only filed under seal, #3 Exhibit 30 - conf marker page - only filed under seal) (LeRoy, John)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 454 SEALED EXHIBIT Index re #453 Reply to Response to Motion, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - [CONF] FMC_VSI_Updated Termination Letter, #2 Exhibit 6 - [CONF] 10-7-14 Termination Letter) (LeRoy, John)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 453 REPLY to Response re #344 MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. SAM MALEK'S OPINIONS REGARDING COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 5 - Confidential marker page - only filed under seal, #3 Exhibit 6 - Confidential marker page - only filed under seal) (LeRoy, John)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 452 REPLY to Response re #348 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF VERSATA EXPERT JAMES MARTIN filed by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 451 REPLY to Response re #352 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Monty Myers filed by All Defendants. (Young, Rodger)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (LeRoy, John)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/28/2018. Versata to file supplemental brief by no later than April 6, 2018. Ford to file a supplemental brief by no later than April 16, 2018. Briefs not to exceed 10 pages each. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #450 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 449 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of withdrawal of #341 MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. MICHAEL SHAMOS'S TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS REGARDING VALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 5,825,651; 6,405,308; 6,675,294; 7,200,582; 7,464,064; 7,739,080; 8,805,825 AND 7,882,057 , #342 MOTION to Exclude Dr. David Wilson's Testimony Regarding Validity of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,825,651; 6,405,308; 6,675,294; 7,200,582; 7,464,064; 7,739,080, 8,805,825; and 7,882,057 . (LeRoy, John)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 448 NOTICE OF HEARING on #341 MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. MICHAEL SHAMOS'S TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS REGARDING VALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 5,825,651; 6,405,308; 6,675,294; 7,200,582; 7,464,064; 7,739,080; 8,805,825 AND 7,882,057, #348 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF VERSATA EXPERT JAMES MARTIN, #346 SEALED MOTION EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF VERSATA EXPERT CHRISTOPHER BOKHART by Ford Motor Company, #347 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Craig Elson by Ford Motor Company, #349 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Craig Elson, #342 MOTION to Exclude Dr. David Wilson's Testimony Regarding Validity of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,825,651; 6,405,308; 6,675,294; 7,200,582; 7,464,064; 7,739,080, 8,805,825; and 7,882,057, #351 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF VERSATA EXPERT CHRISTOPHER BOKHART re #346 SEALED MOTION EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF VERSATA EXPERT CHRISTOPHER BOKHART by Ford Motor Company, #344 MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. SAM MALEK'S OPINIONS REGARDING COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, #352 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Monty Myers. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2018 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 447 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 3/28/2018 at 10:30 AM EST before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED VIA EMAIL AND IN THIS NOTICE** (HMon)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 446 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #338 MOTION Modify the Caption with Exhibit A attached filed by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 445 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #338 MOTION Modify the Caption filed by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 444 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing on Report & Recommendation, et al held on 3/9/2018. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: David B. Yarbrough) (Number of Pages: 129) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 4/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2018. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Yarbrough, David)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 443 EXHIBIT G re #419 Response to Motion,, by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G - McGuinness Report) (Young, Rodger)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 442 SEALED EXHIBIT 35, 36, 52, and 55 re #429 Sealed Response to Motion by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 35 - PIAs - Part 1 - FUS, #2 Exhibit 35 - PIAs - Part 2 - FUS, #3 Exhibit 36 - GDev-Gteam Agreements - Part 1 - FUS, #4 Exhibit 36 - GDev-Gteam Agreements - Part 2 - FUS, #5 Exhibit 52 - ACM Engineering Version 4.20 - Part 1 - FUS, #6 Exhibit 52 - ACM Engineering Version 4.20 - Part 2 - FUS, #7 Exhibit 55 - Sullivan Deposition Excerpts - FUS) (Young, Rodger)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER on Motion Hearing. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 440 RESPONSE to #354 SEALED MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Ford Motor Company. filed by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 439 EXHIBIT re #429 Sealed Response to Motion by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 34, #2 Exhibit 45, #3 Exhibit 46, #4 Exhibit 53, #5 Exhibit 61, #6 Exhibit 78, #7 Exhibit 92) (Mitby, Steven)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 438 SEALED EXHIBIT 44, 47-51 re #429 Sealed Response to Motion by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 44, #2 Exhibit 47, #3 Exhibit 48, #4 Exhibit 49, #5 Exhibit 50, #6 Exhibit 51) (Mitby, Steven)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 437 SEALED EXHIBIT 53-54, 56-60 re #429 Sealed Response to Motion by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 53, #2 Exhibit 54, #3 Exhibit 56, #4 Exhibit 57, #5 Exhibit 58, #6 Exhibit 59, #7 Exhibit 60) (Caldwell, Matthew)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 436 SEALED EXHIBIT 37-43 re #429 Sealed Response to Motion by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 37, #2 Exhibit 38, #3 Exhibit 39, #4 Exhibit 40, #5 Exhibit 41, #6 Exhibit 42, #7 Exhibit 43) (Mitby, Steven)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 435 SEALED EXHIBIT 62-71 re #429 Sealed Response to Motion by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 71, #2 Exhibit 70, #3 Exhibit 69, #4 Exhibit 68, #5 Exhibit 67, #6 Exhibit 66, #7 Exhibit 65, #8 Exhibit 64, #9 Exhibit 63, #10 Exhibit 62) (Caldwell, Matthew)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 434 SEALED EXHIBIT 72-82 re #429 Sealed Response to Motion by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 82, #2 Exhibit 81, #3 Exhibit 80, #4 Exhibit 79, #5 Exhibit 77, #6 Exhibit 76, #7 Exhibit 75, #8 Exhibit 74, #9 Exhibit 73, #10 Exhibit 72) (Caldwell, Matthew)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 433 SEALED EXHIBIT 31-33 re #429 Sealed Response to Motion by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31, #2 Exhibit 32, #3 Exhibit 33) (Mitby, Steven)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 432 SEALED Exhibits 1-30 re #429 Sealed Response to Motion by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Versata Expert Report of C. Elson, #2 Exhibit 2 - Fortune Magazine Article, #3 Exhibit 3 - Versata Success Call Presentation, #4 Exhibit 4 - 10/26/2011 Email from M. Sullivan to S. Tuma, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2015 Renewal Fees Letter and Check, #6 Exhibit 6 - Baxter Deposition Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 7 - 10/24/2012 email from M. Roza to J. Lang, #8 Exhibit 8 - 10/14/2011 email from M. Sullivan to J. Sisolak, #9 Exhibit 9 - 1/5/2009 email from M. Sullivan to M. Pipoly, #10 Exhibit 10 - EPIC PDO Update Presentation, #11 Exhibit 11 - EPIC-PDO Future State Presentation, #12 Exhibit 12 - PDO Phasing/Deployment Drivers, #13 Exhibit 13 - PDO Plans Presentation, #14 Exhibit 14 - Fords Supplemental Response to Interrogatory No. 2, #15 Exhibit 15 - Seiler Ex. 25 - Seiler R1, #16 Exhibit 16 - Alla Deposition Excerpts, #17 Exhibit 17 - Deposition of Bryan Goodman 06-15-2017, #18 Exhibit 18 - Goodman Deposition Exhibit 8, #19 Exhibit 19 - Seiler Deposition Exhibit 12, #20 Exhibit 20 - Seiler Deposition Exhibit 13, #21 Exhibit 21 - Seiler Deposition Exhibit 14, #22 Exhibit 22 - PDO Test Strategy, #23 Exhibit 23 - Sprague Deposition Excerpts, #24 Exhibit 24 - PDO Release 1 Functionality Presentation, #25 Exhibit 25 - PDO Release 1 UAT Analysis, #26 Exhibit 26 - Myers Deposition Excerpts Vol. 2, #27 Exhibit 27 - 2018-03-08 Declaration of Andy Price ISO MSJ Response, #28 Exhibit 28 - 2018-03-08 Declaration of Kenneth Ratton ISO MSJ Response, #29 Exhibit 29 - 2018-03-08 Declaration of Mike Richards, #30 Exhibit 30 - Malek - combined manual confidentiality) (Young, Rodger)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 431 SEALED EXHIBIT 83-92 re #429 Sealed Response to Motion by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 92, #2 Exhibit 91, #3 Exhibit 90, #4 Exhibit 89, #5 Exhibit 88, #6 Exhibit 87, #7 Exhibit 86, #8 Exhibit 85, #9 Exhibit 84, #10 Exhibit 83) (Caldwell, Matthew)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 3/9/2018 re #376 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master, #338 MOTION Modify the Caption filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc., #375 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master re #328 MOTION to Strike Reply Reports of Drs. Malek and Shamos filed by Ford Motor Company. (Court Reporter: David Yarbrough) (HMon)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 430 SEALED EXHIBIT 1-4 and 7 re #428 Response to Motion,, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Myers Rebuttal Trade Secret Report - FUS, #2 Exhibit 2 - Decommissioning Email - FUS, #3 Exhibit 3 - Malek Trade Secret Report - FUS, #4 Exhibit 4 - Malek Trade Secret Reply Report - FUS, #5 Exhibit 7 - Malek Deposition - FUS) (Young, Rodger)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 429 SEALED RESPONSE re #354 Sealed Motion,, by All Defendants. (Mitby, Steven)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 428 RESPONSE to #344 MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. SAM MALEK'S OPINIONS REGARDING COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Myers Rebuttal Trade Secret Report - FUS, #3 Exhibit 2 - Decommissioning Email - FUS, #4 Exhibit 3 - Malek Trade Secret Report - FUS, #5 Exhibit 4 - Malek Trade Secret Reply Report - FUS, #6 Exhibit 5 - Malek Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 - Certificates of Registration, #8 Exhibit 7 - Malek deposition - FUS, #9 Exhibit 8 - Malek CV) (Young, Rodger)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 427 EXHIBIT 30 Filed Under Seal (Confidential marker page only) re #423 Response to Motion,,, by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31 - 582 Patent, #2 Exhibit 32 - McGuinness 651 Report, #3 Exhibit 33 - McGuinness 582 & 064 Report, #4 Exhibit 34 - Smith Dep Trans Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 35 - Little Dep Trans Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 36 - Wilson Dep Trans Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 37 - McGuinness 080 Report, #8 Exhibit 38 - McGuinness 057 Report, #9 Exhibit 39 - Surati Expert Report, #10 Exhibit 40 - Surati Dep Trans Excerpts, #11 Exhibit 41 - Stahl Reference FORD_VERSATA0069650-62, #12 Exhibit 42 - 057 Patent, #13 Exhibit 43 - 3-18-2009 Office Action Response, #14 Exhibit 44 - Greenspun Reply Report, #15 Exhibit 45 - Greenspun Opening Report excerpt, #16 Exhibit 46 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #17 Exhibit 47 - Surati Declaration, #18 Exhibit 48 - Declaration of Mike Sullivan, #19 Exhibit 49 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #20 Exhibit 50 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only) (LeRoy, John)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 426 EXHIBIT 12 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only re #423 Response to Motion,,, by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #2 Exhibit 14 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #3 Exhibit 15 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #4 Exhibit 16 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #5 Exhibit 17 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #6 Exhibit 18 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #7 Exhibit 19 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #8 Exhibit 20 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #9 Exhibit 21 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #10 Exhibit 22 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #11 Exhibit 23 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #12 Exhibit 24 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #13 Exhibit 25 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #14 Exhibit 26 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #15 Exhibit 27 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #16 Exhibit 28 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #17 Exhibit 29 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only) (LeRoy, John)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 425 SEALED EXHIBIT A, G, H, I and J re #424 Response to Motion,, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Malek Infringement Report - FUS, #2 Exhibit G - Myers deposition - FUS, #3 Exhibit H - Shamos deposition - FUS, #4 Exhibit I - Shamos Rebuttal Report - FUS, #5 Exhibit J - Surati deposition - FUS) (Young, Rodger)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 424 RESPONSE to #341 MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. MICHAEL SHAMOS'S TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS REGARDING VALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 5,825,651; 6,405,308; 6,675,294; 7,200,582; 7,464,064; 7,739,080; 8,805,825 AND 7,882,057 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Malek Infringement Report - FUS, #3 Exhibit B - US Patent 7,200,582, #4 Exhibit C - US Patent 7,882,057, #5 Exhibit D - US Patent 7,739,080, #6 Exhibit E - Shamos CV, #7 Exhibit F - Shamos Declaration, #8 Exhibit G - Myers deposition - FUS, #9 Exhibit H - Shamos deposition - FUS, #10 Exhibit I - Shamos Rebuttal Report - FUS, #11 Exhibit J - Surati deposition - FUS) (Young, Rodger)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 423 RESPONSE to #364 SEALED MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Leshan re Exhibits, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #4 Exhibit 2 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #5 Exhibit 3 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #6 Exhibit 4 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #7 Exhibit 5 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #8 Exhibit 6 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #9 Exhibit 7 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #10 Exhibit 8 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #11 Exhibit 9 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #12 Exhibit 10 Filed Under Seal - Confidential marker page only, #13 Exhibit 11 - Ford Patents_375, 854, 748, 429) (LeRoy, John)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 422 SEALED EXHIBIT 25 - [CONF] Malek Dep. Trans. Excerpts re #418 Sealed Response to Motion,,, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26 - [CONF] Sullivan 5-25-17 Dep Trans Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 27 - [CONF] VRS00005018-23, #3 Exhibit 28 - [CONF] FORD_VERSATA128774-79, #4 Exhibit 29 - [CONF] FORD-SOURCECODE_000865-66, #5 Exhibit 30 - [CONF] Myers Patent Report, #6 Exhibit 46 - [CONF] SSA #1 VRS00004947-64, #7 Exhibit 49 - [CONF] Overtime Cost Spreadsheet FORD_VERSATA111216, #8 Exhibit 50 - [CONF] Myers 1-9-2018 Dep Trans Excerpt) (LeRoy, John)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 421 SEALED EXHIBIT 13 - [CONF] Baxter Dep. Trans. Excerpts re #418 Sealed Response to Motion,,, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14 - [CONF] 1-9-2011 Addendum 1 to Subscription Schedule 4, #2 Exhibit 15 - [CONF] 2000 PROOF Project Plan, #3 Exhibit 16 - [CONF] VRS00073853 Proof Design Document, #4 Exhibit 17 - [CONF] VRS73851 Early GPD Design Spec, #5 Exhibit 18 - [CONF] Ford-Trilogy PROOF Design Document, #6 Exhibit 19 - [CONF] Elson Report, #7 Exhibit 20 - [CONF] PROOF Included AutoConfigMaint, #8 Exhibit 21 - [CONF] Malek Trade Secret Expert Report, #9 Exhibit 22 - [CONF] Second Supp. Trade Secret Contentions, #10 Exhibit 23 - [CONF] Nikkila Declaration 02-01-2018, #11 Exhibit 24 - [CONF] Versata 4th supp rsp to Ford 1st ROG (5)) (LeRoy, John)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 420 SEALED EXHIBIT A, D and F to Versata's Response to Ford's Motion to Exclude Dr. David Wilson's Testimony and Opinions re: Patent Validity re #419 Response to Motion,, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of S. Malek - FUS, #2 Exhibit D - Rebuttal Report of Dr. Wilson - FUS, #3 Exhibit F - Wilson Deposition - FUS) (Young, Rodger)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 419 RESPONSE to #342 MOTION to Exclude Dr. David Wilson's Testimony Regarding Validity of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,825,651; 6,405,308; 6,675,294; 7,200,582; 7,464,064; 7,739,080, 8,805,825; and 7,882,057 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex.A - Expert Report of S. Malek - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - US Patent 7,200,582, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Wilson CV, #5 Exhibit Ex. D - Rebuttal Report of Dr. Wilson - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit Ex. E - Dr. Wilson declaration, #7 Exhibit Ex. F - Wilson deposition - Filed Under Seal) (Young, Rodger)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 418 SEALED RESPONSE re #364 Sealed Motion, for Summary Judgment by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Leshan re Exhibits, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1 - [CONF] 2-11-11 EOL Presentation, #4 Exhibit 2 - [CONF] E-mail re references to PROOF, #5 Exhibit 3 - [CONF] 1998 CSA, #6 Exhibit 4 - [CONF] Assignment Order 15, #7 Exhibit 5 - [CONF] VRS Document Compilation, #8 Exhibit 6 - [CONF] Subscription Schedule No. 4, #9 Exhibit 7 - [CONF] F_V Document Compilation, #10 Exhibit 8 - [CONF] Myers Trade Secret Report, #11 Exhibit 9 - [CONF] Cabinaw Dep Trans Excerpts, #12 Exhibit 10 - [CONF] Pipoly Dep Trans Excerpts, #13 Exhibit 12 - [CONF] 2004 MSSA) (LeRoy, John)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 417 RESPONSE to #349 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Craig Elson REDACTED filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of C. Elson, excerpts - FuS, #3 Exhibit 2 - Cabinaw deposition, excerpts - FUS, #4 Exhibit 3 - Ford_Versata 0045334-361 - FUS, #5 Exhibit 4 - Expert Report of M. Myers, excerpts - FUS, #6 Exhibit 5 - VRS 00848235-236 - FUS, #7 Exhibit 6 - Davis deposition, excerpts - FUS, #8 Exhibit 7 - VRS 00850767-768 - FUS, #9 Exhibit 8 - Ford_Versata 0099233-249 - FUS, #10 Exhibit 9 - Richards Declaration - FUS, #11 Exhibit 10 - Expert Report of S. Malek, excerpts - FUS, #12 Exhibit 11 - Sood Declaration - FUS, #13 Exhibit 12 - Reply Report of C. Elson, excerpts - FUS, #14 Exhibit 13 - Elson deposition, excerpts - FUS) (Young, Rodger)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 416 SEALED RESPONSE re #349 Motion,,,,,,,,, Versata Defendants' Response to Ford's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Craig Elson by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of C. Elson, excerpts - FuS, #3 Exhibit 2 - Cabinaw deposition, excerpts - FUS, #4 Exhibit 3 - Ford_Versata 0045334-361 - FUS, #5 Exhibit 4 - Expert Report of M. Myers, excerpts - FUS, #6 Exhibit 5 - VRS 00848235-236 - FUS, #7 Exhibit 6 - David deposition, excerpts - FUS, #8 Exhibit 7 - VRS 00850767-768 - FUS, #9 Exhibit 8 - Ford_Versata 0099233-249 - FUS, #10 Exhibit 9 - Richards Declaration - FUS, #11 Exhibit 10 - Expert Report of S. Malek, excerpts - FUS, #12 Exhibit 11 - Sood Declaration - FUS, #13 Exhibit 12 - Reply Report of C. Elson, excerpts - FUS, #14 Exhibit 13 - Elson deposition, excerpts - FUS) (Young, Rodger)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 415 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 - CONFIDENTIAL Myers Patent Rebuttal Report Excerpts re #414 Response to Motion,, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - CONFIDENTIAL Malek Patent Report, #2 Exhibit 3 - CONFIDENTIAL Malek Trade Secret Report, #3 Exhibit 4 - CONFIDENTIAL Malek Trade Secret Reply Report, #4 Exhibit 6 - CONFIDENTIAL Myers Dep Trans Excerpt, #5 Exhibit 7 - CONFIDENTIAL Myers Trade Secret Rebuttal Report) (LeRoy, John)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 414 RESPONSE to #352 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Monty Myers filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal - Confidential Marker Page Only, #3 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal - Confidential Marker Page Only, #4 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal - Confidential Marker Page Only, #5 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal - Confidential Marker Page Only, #6 Exhibit 5 - Wilson Rebuttal Report, #7 Exhibit 6 - Filed Under Seal - Confidential Marker Page Only, #8 Exhibit 7 - Filed Under Seal - Confidential Marker Page Only) (LeRoy, John)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 413 RESPONSE to #351 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF VERSATA EXPERT CHRISTOPHER BOKHART re #346 SEALED MOTION EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF VERSATA EXPERT CHRISTOPHER BOKHART by Ford Motor Company. REDACTED filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of C. Bokhart, excerpts - FUS, #3 Exhibit 2 - Ford-Versata 0059542 - FUS, #4 Exhibit 3 - Pipoly deposition, excerpts - FUS, #5 Exhibit 4 - Sullivan deposition, excerpts - FUS, #6 Exhibit 5 - Ford-Versata 0059590 - FUS, #7 Exhibit 6 - Expert Report of S. Malek, excerpts - FUS, #8 Exhibit 7 - Seiler deposition, excerpts - FUS, #9 Exhibit 8 - VRS 00850954 - FUS) (Young, Rodger)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 412 SEALED RESPONSE re #351 Motion,,,,,,,, Versata Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Versata Expert Christopher Bokhart by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of C. Bokhart, excerpts, #3 Exhibit 2 - Ford-Versata 0059542, #4 Exhibit 3 - Pipoly deposition, excerpts, #5 Exhibit 4 - Sullivan deposition, excerpts, #6 Exhibit 5 - Ford-Versata 0059590, #7 Exhibit 6 - Expert Report of S. Malek, excerpts, #8 Exhibit 7 - Seiler deposition, excerpts, #9 Exhibit 8 - VRS 00850954) (Young, Rodger)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 411 SEALED EXHIBIT 4 re #410 Response to Motion, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 - VRS 00850954 - Filed Under Seal) (Young, Rodger)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 410 RESPONSE to #348 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF VERSATA EXPERT JAMES MARTIN filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Expert Report of James Martin, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Martin deposition, excerpts, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Seiler deposition, excerpts, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 - VRS 00850954 - FILED UNDER SEAL) (Young, Rodger)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 409 Joint MOTION to Seal Certain Documents by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (LeRoy, John)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #409 Joint MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #375 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master re #328 MOTION to Strike Reply Reports of Drs. Malek and Shamos filed by Ford Motor Company, #376 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master, and #338 MOTION Modify the Caption. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2018 at 9:30 AM (**IN DETROIT - COURTROOM 716**) before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 408 REPLY to Response re #376 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER DENYING FORD'S MOTION TO PREVENT THE DEPOSITION OF ELENA FORD filed by Ford Motor Company. (Feeney, James)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER Granting Ford Motor's Company's #406 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Its Objections to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master Denying Ford's Motion to Prevent the Deposition of Elena Ford. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 406 MOTION for Leave to File FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER DENYING FORD'S MOTION TO PREVENT THE DEPOSITION OF ELENA FORD by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply Brief) (Feeney, James)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 405 SEALED EXHIBIT 58 (Corrected to Fix Dkt. 359-4) Expert Report of Deborah McGuinness re #354 SEALED MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Ford Motor Company., #359 Sealed Exhibit,, by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 404 REPLY to Response re #375 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master re #328 MOTION to Strike Reply Reports of Drs. Malek and Shamos filed by Ford Motor Company filed by Ford Motor Company. (LeRoy, John)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 403 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages -UNOPPOSED-re Ford's Response to Dkt. 385 by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (LeRoy, John)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER Granting #398 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #403 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages -UNOPPOSED-re Ford's Response to Dkt. 385 filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 401 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibits A-I re #400 Response (Free),, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Sullivan dep, excerpts - FUS, #3 Exhibit B - EPIC Board Meeting Minutes - FUS, #4 Exhibit C - Email re: PDO...- FUS, #5 Exhibit D - Email re: Priorities... - FUS, #6 Exhibit E - Email re: PDO Status... - FUS, #7 Exhibit F - EPIC Meeting Presentation - FUS, #8 Exhibit G - Richards Dep - FUS, #9 Exhibit H - Meeting minutes - FUS, #10 Exhibit I - Email re: PDO part... - FUS) (Young, Rodger)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 400 RESPONSE to #390 Objection to Report and Recommendation,,, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Sullivan dep, excerpts - FUS, #3 Exhibit B - EPIC Board Meeting Minutes - FUS, #4 Exhibit C - Email re: PDO...- FUS, #5 Exhibit D - Email re: Priorities... - FUS, #6 Exhibit E - Email re: PDO Status... - FUS, #7 Exhibit F - EPIC Meeting Presentation - FUS, #8 Exhibit G - Richards Dep - FUS, #9 Exhibit H - Meeting minutes - FUS, #10 Exhibit I - Email re: PDO part... - FUS) (Young, Rodger)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 399 NOTICE by All Defendants re #379 SEALED MOTION re #364 SEALED MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. by All Defendants. of Withdrawal of Portions of Motion for Summary Judgment (Young, Rodger)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 398 MOTION for Leave to File Certain Documents Under Seal - Unopposed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Young, Rodger)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #375 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master re #328 MOTION to Strike Reply Reports of Drs. Malek and Shamos, #376 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master, and #338 MOTION Modify the Caption. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2018 at 9:30 AM (**IN DETROIT - COURTROOM 110**) before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 397 NOTICE OF HEARING on #338 MOTION to Modify the Caption. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2018 09:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman, **IN DETROIT, Courtroom TBD** (AChu)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #394 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply UNOPPOSED to Docket Number 385 filed by Ford Motor Company, and GRANTING #395 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - Unopposed filed by Trilogy, Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Versata Software, Inc. Issued by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (AChu)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 396 REPLY to Response re #338 MOTION Modify the Caption filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E) (Young, Rodger)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - Unopposed by Trilogy Development Group, Inc., Trilogy, Inc., Versata Software, Inc.. (Young, Rodger)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 394 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply UNOPPOSED to Docket Number 385 by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (LeRoy, John)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 393 NOTICE OF HEARING on #375 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #376 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2018 09:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman, **IN DETROIT, COURTROOM TBD** (AChu)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 392 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #390 -13 Objection to Report and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (AChu)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 391 EXHIBIT L (Substitute) re #390 Objection to Report and Recommendation,,, by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Substitute Exhibit L) (Feeney, James)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 390 OBJECTION to #375 Report and Recommendation Ford Motor Company's Objections to the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master Denying ford's Motion to Prevent the Deposition of Elena Ford by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Sullivan Deposition, #3 Exhibit B - EPIC Termination Memo, #4 Exhibit C - Mitby E-mail, #5 Exhibit D - Elena Ford Bio, #6 Exhibit E - Objections to Preliminary Ruling, #7 Exhibit F - WSJ Ad, #8 Exhibit G - Facebook Ad, #9 Exhibit H - Twitter Feed (truthaboutford), #10 Exhibit I - Lanny David Announcement, #11 Exhibit J - 2/24/2017 Deposition Notice, #12 Exhibit K - 11/27/2017 Deposition Notice, #13 [SEALED per #392 ] Exhibit L - Beardslee Deposition Transcript - Excerpts) (Feeney, James) Modified on 2/21/2018 (AChu).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 389 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages -UNOPPOSED re Ford's Objections to R&R regarding Elena Ford by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (LeRoy, John)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER for Extension of Time for Versata to File its Reply. (Reply due by 2/21/2018) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (AChu)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #389 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Issued by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (AChu)
February 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 387 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #377 Response to Motion,,,,, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Proposed Order) (Mitby, Steven)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER Granting Defendants Versata Software, Inc., f/k/a Trilogy Software Inc., Trilogy Development Group, Inc., and Trilogy, Inc.'s #384 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 385 OBJECTION to #375 Report and Recommendation by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Ford rspns to Versata 6th ROGs (33-36), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Kinder DKT 144) (Mitby, Steven)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 384 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Proposed Order) (Mitby, Steven)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order