AFS/IBEX, a Division of MetaBank v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al
Plaintiff: AFS/IBEX, a Division of MetaBank
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Keith Larson, Karen Larson, Margaret Lauber and Janet Vogel
Cross_claimant: Janet Vogel
Cross_defendant: Karen Larson
Case Number: 2:2015cv11409
Filed: April 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A. Drain
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION [#186] WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT KAREN LARSON TO PROVIDE STATUS UPDATES REGARDING PROBATE PROCEEDINGS. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS LAUBERS AND VOGELS JOINT MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT [#131], DENYING DEFENDANTS KEITH AND KAREN LARSONS MOTION TO SET ASIDE MOTION FOR DEFENSE COUNSEL TO WITHDRAW AND TO SET ASIDE ALL PLEADINGS AND COURT FILINGS SINCE APRIL 3, 2017 [#145], DENYING DEFENDANTS KEITH AND KAREN LARSONS AMENDED MOTION FOR DEFENSE COUNSEL TO WITHDRAW AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE THE HEARING [#148] AND SCHEDULING DATES. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT VOGEL AND LAUBERS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT [#76]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AFS/IBEX, a Division of MetaBank v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFS/IBEX, a Division of MetaBank
Represented By: David M. Eisenberg
Represented By: Earle I. Erman
Represented By: Barbara A. Patek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Patrick C. Lannen
Represented By: David A. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick C. Lannen
Represented By: David A. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Patrick C. Lannen
Represented By: David A. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Represented By: Patrick C. Lannen
Represented By: David A. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Represented By: Patrick C. Lannen
Represented By: David A. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Patrick C. Lannen
Represented By: David A. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Lauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Vogel
Represented By: Mark P. Bucchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Janet Vogel
Represented By: Mark P. Bucchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Karen Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?