Bills et al v. Klee

Plaintiff: Rickey Bills
Defendant: Daniel Heyns and Paul Klee
Case Number: 2:2015cv11414
Filed: April 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Muskegon
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Leitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 68 Motion for Discovery. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER (1) Terminating Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel for Plaintiff Rickey Bills, (2) Allowing Plaintiff to File a Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, and (3) Terminating Plaintiff's 57 MOTION to Respond as Moot. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER (1) Withdrawing Reference to Magistrate Judge, (2) Conditionally Appointing Counsel for Plaintiff, (3) Terminating Defendants' 28 , 32 and 41 MOTIONS to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Objection to 52 Report and Recommendation Without Prejudice, and (4) Staying Action Pending Appointment of Counsel. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER (1) Treating Plaintiff's 53 MOTION for Reconsideration as Objections to the Magistrate Judge's 52 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and (2) Requiring Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's Objections. (Response due by 2/17/2017.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 17 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Daniel Heyns. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying as Moot (1) 13 Motion Requesting Jury Trial, and (2) 14 Motion to Amend First Complaint and Further Extending Time for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (1) Denying 3 and 7 Motions for Appointment of Counsel Without Prejudice; (2) Granting 8 Motion to Amend Complaint; (3) Denying 9 Motion to Compel Discovery Without Prejudice; and (4) Granting 10 Motion Requesting Jury Trial. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bills et al v. Klee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Bills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Heyns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Klee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?