Dorman v. Clinton, Township of
Plaintiff: Michael Dorman and River of Life Ministries, INT
Defendant: Clinton, Township of
Case Number: 2:2015cv12552
Filed: July 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Macomb
Presiding Judge: Paul D. Borman
Presiding Judge: Mona K. Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER (1) Denying Plaintiffs' 110 Motion to Reopen Discovery and (2) Requiring Parties to Attend In-Person Settlement Conference. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER (1) Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' 100 Second Motion for Interim Attorney Fees and (2) Terminating Plaintiffs' 106 Motion Requesting Ruling as Moot. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 OPINION AND ORDER (1) Granting Plaintiff River of Life's 81 Motion for Summary Judgment on Its Equal Terms Claim, (2) Denying Plaintiff Michael Dorman's 81 Motion for Summary Judgment on His Equal Terms Claim, and (3) Granting Summary Judgment in Favor of Defendant on Plaintiff Michael Dorman's Equal Terms Claim. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Directing the Parties to Submit Supplemental Briefs. (Supplemental Briefs due by 7/1/2019.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER on Motion Hearing. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 63 Motion to Disqualify Defendant's Co-Counsel. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Setting Discovery and Summary Judgment Schedule. (Fact Discovery due by 12/17/2018, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/31/2019.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' 43 Motion for Interim Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER to Attend Settlement Conference and Requirements for Submission of Settlement Statement. (Settlement Conference set for 9/7/2018 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER on Motion Hearing. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER on Motion Hearing. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorman v. Clinton, Township of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton, Township of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dorman
Represented By: Susan K. Friedlaender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: River of Life Ministries, INT
Represented By: Susan K. Friedlaender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?