Grammer Industries, Incorporated v. Beach Mold & Tool, Inc.
Plaintiff: Grammer Industries, Incorporated
Defendant: Beach Mold & Tool, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv12694
Filed: July 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Paul D. Borman
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 05:75
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER Adopting 179 Report and Recommendation Denying 91 Motion to Dismiss, filed by American Industrial Acquisition Corporation Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying 171 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER Adopting 168 Report and Recommendation GRANTING 102 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Beachmold Mexico, S. de R.L. de C.V., Plastic Injection Holding (PIH) Company of Mexico, LLC n/k/a iP3 North America, LLC, Plastic Injection Operating (PIO) Company of Mexico, LLC - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Adopting 158 Report and Recommendation GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 114 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, filed by Grammer Industries, Incorporated - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting 153 Motion to withdraw as counsel by American Industrial Acquisition Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DPer)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 110 Motion to Compel AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 125 Motion to Stay - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 62 Motion for Alternate Service - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grammer Industries, Incorporated v. Beach Mold & Tool, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grammer Industries, Incorporated
Represented By: Mark A. Aiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beach Mold & Tool, Inc.
Represented By: Richard T. Hewlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?