Consolidated Rail Corporation v. West Jefferson Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Consolidated Rail Corporation
Defendant: West Jefferson Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv12828
Filed: August 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Anthony P. Patti
Presiding Judge: Victoria A. Roberts
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER entered 31 Motion for Summary Judgment; modifying in part and adopting in part 71 Report and Recommendation ; entered 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. See order for details. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Extending the Deadline for the Parties' Joint Statement of Material Facts and Notice on Converting the Motions to a Trial on the Briefs. (Joint Statement and Notice due by 6/2/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (HMon)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 22 Motion for extension.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consolidated Rail Corporation v. West Jefferson Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consolidated Rail Corporation
Represented By: Matthew J. Lund
Represented By: Laurence Z. Shiekman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Jefferson Railroad Company
Represented By: Douglas C. Bernstein
Represented By: H. Adam Cohen
Represented By: Patrick C. Lannen
Represented By: Jason C. Long
Represented By: Jerome P. Pesick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?