Yaldo v. Wayne State University et al
Plaintiff: Firas (Jason) Yaldo
Defendant: Wayne State University, Wayne State University School of Medicine, Matt Jackson, Maryjean Schenk, Mathur Ambika, Kathleen Conners, Lisa Maclean, Jason Booza and Patrick Bridge
Case Number: 2:2015cv13388
Filed: September 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A. Drain
Presiding Judge: Anthony P. Patti
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 AMENDED OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendant's 70 MOTION to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment and Denying Plaintiff's 72 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (SBur)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendant's 70 MOTION to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment and Denying Plaintiff's 72 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (SBur)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING in PART and DENYING in part 58 Motion to Compel--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 3 AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST THAT THE COURT ORDER DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (DPar)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yaldo v. Wayne State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne State University
Represented By: Brett J. Miller
Represented By: Daniel B. Tukel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne State University School of Medicine
Represented By: Brett J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Jackson
Represented By: Brett J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryjean Schenk
Represented By: Brett J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathur Ambika
Represented By: Brett J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Conners
Represented By: Brett J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Maclean
Represented By: Brett J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Booza
Represented By: Brett J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Bridge
Represented By: Brett J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firas (Jason) Yaldo
Represented By: Hugh M. Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?