Green v. Southfield et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Green
Defendant: City of Southfield, Keith Birberick, Brian Bassett, Mark LaBrosse, Eric Hawkins, Jeffery Tinsman, Bryan Jarrell and GEICO INDEMINITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2015cv13479
Filed: October 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Sean F. Cox
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER Denying 221 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 OPINION AND ORDER Denying 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dawn Green. (Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2018 at 09:30 AM, IN ROOM 425, before District Judge Sean F. Cox) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 OPINION AND ORDER Granting 185 Motion for Summary Judgment; and Denying 186 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 167 Motion for Reconsideration re 161 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by Dawn Green - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT'S 151 Motion to Strike - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENIED IN PART DEFENDANTS' 145 Motion for Protective Order - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER re 147 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ORDER GRANTING SOUTHFIELD DEFENDANTS' SECOND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, MOTION SUSTAIN OBJECTIONS re 139 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by Dawn Green. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' 92 Motion to Compel - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S 86 Motion for Protective Order - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Setting Aside Second 53 Clerks Entry of Default as to Defendant Geico. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (KJac)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OPINION and ORDER Granting 14 MOTION to Strike. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Southfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Green
Represented By: D. Rick Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Southfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Birberick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Bassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark LaBrosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Tinsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INDEMINITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?