Raub et al v. Moon Lake Property Owners' Association et al
Plaintiff: David Raub and William Raub
Defendant: Moon Lake Property Owners' Association, Greenwood Township, Oscoda County of, Thomas McCauley, Linda Argue, James Hervilla, Fred Lindsey, Larry Mathias and Tim Whiting
Case Number: 2:2015cv13480
Filed: October 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Sean F. Cox
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Stafford
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 152 Motion for Relief Under Rule 59. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Overruling 143 Objections, Adopting 142 Report and Recommendation, Granting Defendants' 112 , 117 Motions for Attorney Fees and Costs and Denying Plaintiff's 124 Motion. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Overruling 105 Objections, Adopting 104 Report and Recommendation, Granting Defendants' 75 80 Motions for Judgment, Granting Defendant's 76 Motion to Dismiss, and Dismissing all Claims with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Rejecting 60 David Raub's Notice of Disclaimer, Granting Defendants' 58 MOTION to Allow for Payment of Judgment, and Directing Plaintiffs to Furnish Counsel for Defendants Oscoda County and Tim Whiting with Completed W-9 Forms. (W-9 Forms due by 12/9/2016.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Overruling in Part and Sustaining In Part 48 Objections and Correcting Clerical Error. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raub et al v. Moon Lake Property Owners' Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Raub
Represented By: Tonie M. Franzese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Raub
Represented By: Tonie M. Franzese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moon Lake Property Owners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwood Township
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscoda County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Argue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hervilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mathias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?