Byrd v. Bauman
Petitioner: Curtis Jerome Byrd
Respondent: Catherine S Bauman
Case Number: 2:2015cv13528
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Hluchaniuk
Presiding Judge: Laurie J. Michelson
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OPINION and ORDER Denying 17 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (TMcg)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING an Evidentiary Hearing on Habeas Petitioner's Claim of Ineffective Assistance of Trial Counsel. (Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/19/2017 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson). Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (KJac)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION and ORDER Denying 6 MOTION TO EXTEND Enlargement of Time to State Habeas - Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. Bauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Curtis Jerome Byrd
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Catherine S Bauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?