Wahlstrom v. Monk et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Wahlstrom
Defendant: Jason Monk, Edward Burley, Glenn Voorhess, Jeanine Walker and Mount Clemens Community Schools Board of Trustees
Case Number: 2:2015cv14113
Filed: November 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Macomb
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 49 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 59 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED ORDER 38 Denying Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 38 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 23 Motion to Amend/Correct AND RESOLVING PLAINTIFF'S 24 Motion to Compel Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production, Compel Depositions and to Extend the Dates for Discovery - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 17 Motion to Compel; AND FOR ATTORNEY FEES - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wahlstrom v. Monk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Wahlstrom
Represented By: Sarah Prescott
Represented By: Benjamin I. Shipper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Monk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Burley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Voorhess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanine Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Clemens Community Schools Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?