Perez v. Min & Kim, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez
Defendant: Min & Kim, Inc., Kounwoo Hur and Sung Hee Kim
Case Number: 2:2015cv14310
Filed: December 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Washtenaw
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Stafford
Presiding Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 113 Motion for Prejudgment Interest and Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 96 defendants' Motion to Stay Judgment Pending Appeal. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 55 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 52 plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting in part 76 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order and Continue Trial Dates filed by Thomas E. Perez. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying defendants' Motion for judgment on the pleadings 21 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Min & Kim, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez
Represented By: Brooke Worden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Min & Kim, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kounwoo Hur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sung Hee Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?