Concerned Pastors for Social Action et al v. Khouri et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Concerned Pastors for Social Action, Melissa Mays, American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan and Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Defendant: Nick A. Khouri, Frederick Headen, Michael A. Townsend, David McGhee, Michael A. Finney, Beverly Walker-Griffea, Natasha Henderson and Flint, City of
Case Number: 2:2016cv10277
Filed: January 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Genesee
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Goldsmith
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2016 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael A. Finney, Frederick Headen, Nick A. Khouri, David McGhee, Michael A. Townsend, Beverly Walker-Griffea. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4) (Murphy, Michael)
March 7, 2016 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pre-Answer by Flint, City of, Natasha Henderson. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B) (Kim, William)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting City Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Dkt. 20 ). Responsive Pleadings due by 3/7/2016. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
February 26, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Flint, City of, Natasha Henderson. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A: Grisi Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit B: Kammer Affidavit) (Kim, William)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Striking Document (Dkt. 18 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting State Defenadnts' Motion for an Extension of time to File Responsive Peadings (Dkt. 12 ) Michael A. Finney answer due 3/7/2016; Frederick Headen answer due 3/7/2016; Nick A. Khouri answer due 3/7/2016; David McGhee answer due 3/7/2016; Michael A. Townsend answer due 3/7/2016; Beverly Walker-Griffea answer due 3/7/2016. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
February 18, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE by Michael A. Finney, Frederick Headen, Nick A. Khouri, David McGhee, Michael A. Townsend, Beverly Walker-Griffea (Murphy, Michael)[NOTICE OF SCREENING DEVICE] Modified on 2/18/2016 (DPer).
February 18, 2016 Filing 15 REPLY to Response re 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Michael A. Finney, Frederick Headen, Nick A. Khouri, David McGhee, Michael A. Townsend, Beverly Walker-Griffea. (Murphy, Michael)
February 18, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua O. Booth on behalf of Michael A. Finney, Frederick Headen, Nick A. Khouri, David McGhee, Michael A. Townsend, Beverly Walker-Griffea. (Booth, Joshua)
February 17, 2016 Filing 13 RESPONSE to 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chaudhary, Dimple)
February 17, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Michael A. Finney, Frederick Headen, Nick A. Khouri, David McGhee, Michael A. Townsend, Beverly Walker-Griffea. (Murphy, Michael)
February 11, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Murphy on behalf of Michael A. Finney, Frederick Headen, Nick A. Khouri, David McGhee, Michael A. Townsend, Beverly Walker-Griffea. (Murphy, Michael)
February 9, 2016 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Summons for Nick A. Khouri and U.S. Certified Mail Receipt, # 3 Exhibit B - Summons for Frederick Headen and U.S. Certified Mail Receipt, # 4 Exhibit C - Summons for Michael A. Townsend and U.S. Certified Mail Receipt, # 5 Exhibit D - Summons for David McGhee and U.S. Certified Mail Receipt, # 6 Exhibit E - Summons for Michael A. Finney and U.S. Certified Mail Receipt, # 7 Exhibit F - Summons for Beverly Walker-Griffea and U.S. Certified Mail Receipt, # 8 Exhibit G - Summons for Natasha Henderson and U.S. Certified Mail Receipt, # 9 Exhibit H - Summons for City of Flint and U.S. Certified Mail Receipt) (Tallman, Sarah)
January 29, 2016 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Glenn M. Simmington appearing on behalf of Melissa Mays (Simmington, Glenn)
January 28, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke A. Merriweather-Tucker on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Merriweather-Tucker, Brooke)
January 28, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah C. Tallman on behalf of Concerned Pastors for Social Action, Melissa Mays, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Tallman, Sarah)
January 27, 2016 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Steinberg, Michael)
January 27, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Steinberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Steinberg, Michael)
January 27, 2016 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
January 27, 2016 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Michael A. Finney, Flint, City of, Frederick Headen, Natasha Henderson, Nick A. Khouri, David McGhee, Michael A. Townsend, Beverly Walker-Griffea* (DAll)
January 27, 2016 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. (Chaudhary, Dimple)
January 27, 2016 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Concerned Pastors for Social Action (Chaudhary, Dimple)
January 27, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan, Melissa Mays, Concerned Pastors for Social Action, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-5524333 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - November 16, 2015 Notice Letter) (Chaudhary, Dimple)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Concerned Pastors for Social Action et al v. Khouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concerned Pastors for Social Action
Represented By: Dimple Chaudhary
Represented By: Brooke A. Merriweather-Tucker
Represented By: Michael J. Steinberg
Represented By: Sarah C. Tallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Mays
Represented By: Dimple Chaudhary
Represented By: Brooke A. Merriweather-Tucker
Represented By: Glenn M. Simmington
Represented By: Michael J. Steinberg
Represented By: Sarah C. Tallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan
Represented By: Brooke A. Merriweather-Tucker
Represented By: Michael J. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By: Dimple Chaudhary
Represented By: Brooke A. Merriweather-Tucker
Represented By: Michael J. Steinberg
Represented By: Sarah C. Tallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick A. Khouri
Represented By: Joshua O. Booth
Represented By: Michael F. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Headen
Represented By: Joshua O. Booth
Represented By: Michael F. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Townsend
Represented By: Joshua O. Booth
Represented By: Michael F. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McGhee
Represented By: Joshua O. Booth
Represented By: Michael F. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Finney
Represented By: Joshua O. Booth
Represented By: Michael F. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Walker-Griffea
Represented By: Joshua O. Booth
Represented By: Michael F. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha Henderson
Represented By: William Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint, City of
Represented By: William Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?