United States of America v. Approximately $7,041.73 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #375008753246 held in the name of Abyssinia Love Knot Physical Therapy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America and Steven T Brantley
Defendant: Approximately $7,041.73 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #375008753246 held in the name of Abyssinia Love Knot Physical Therapy, LLC, Approximately $10,732.49 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #006681356967 held in the name of Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah, Approximately $200,367.65 seized from Comerica Bank Business Savings Account #9414025842 held in the name of 1st Priority Physical Therapy, LLC, Approximately $2,066.12 seized from Fifth Third Bank Savings Account #9902488320 held by Gregory Allen, Yogina Shah, Approximately $68,903.21 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #375011433472 held in the name of Abyssinia Group, Inc, Approximately $19,825.86 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7911867682 held by Gregory Allen, Approximately $19,123.10 seized from DFCU Financial Insured Money Market Account #206924185 held by Ranjan K Shah, Approximately $8,833.35 seized from Talmer Bank Business Checking Account #8800001480 held in the name of Kartik H Shah d/b/a R K Jewelry, Approximately $10,433.14 seized from Comerica Bank Basic Business Checking Account #1852621893 held in the name of 1st Priority Physical Therapy, LLC, Approximately $98,936.10 seized from Bank of America Money Market Account #006093237565 held by Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah and Approximately $264,242.07 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7913494873 held by GA Med, PC
Claimant: Dr. Kartik H Shah, allen gregory, Atul C Shah and Ranjan K Shah
Case Number: 2:2016cv10314
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
2 Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Final pretrial conference on 1/4/2022 and Jury Trial on 1/18/2022 are adjourned without date pending the Settlement Conference set on 1/19/2022 with Magistrate Judge Patti. If the case does not settle, new dates will be selected at that time. (BSau)
November 5, 2021 Filing 155 DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Approximately $264,242.07 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7913494873 held by GA Med, PC. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
November 5, 2021 Filing 154 DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Approximately $19,825.86 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7911867682 held by Gregory Allen. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
November 5, 2021 Filing 153 DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Approximately $2,066.12 seized from Fifth Third Bank Savings Account #9902488320 held by Gregory Allen. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Granting #150 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
October 28, 2021 Filing 151 DECLARATION by MATTHEW GRISIER re #150 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Approximately $19,825.86 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7911867682 held by Gregory Allen, Approximately $2,066.12 seized from Fifth Third Bank Savings Account #9902488320 held by G filed by United States of America (Grisier, Matthew)
October 28, 2021 Filing 150 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Approximately $19,825.86 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7911867682 held by Gregory Allen, Approximately $2,066.12 seized from Fifth Third Bank Savings Account #9902488320 held by Gregory Allen, Approximately $264,242.07 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7913494873 held by GA Med, PC by United States of America. (Grisier, Matthew)
October 22, 2021 Filing 149 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Approximately $2,066.12 seized from Fifth Third Bank Savings Account #9902488320 held by Gregory Allen* (DPer)
October 22, 2021 Filing 148 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Approximately $19,825.86 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7911867682 held by Gregory Allen* (DPer)
October 22, 2021 Filing 147 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Approximately $264,242.07 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7913494873 held by GA Med, PC* (DPer)
October 22, 2021 Filing 146 DECLARATION by MATTHEW GRISIER re #145 Request for Clerks Entry of Default filed by United States of America (Grisier, Matthew)
October 22, 2021 Filing 145 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Approximately $2,066.12 seized from Fifth Third Bank Savings Account #9902488320 held by Gregory Allen by United States of America. (Grisier, Matthew)
October 22, 2021 Filing 144 DECLARATION by MATTHEW GRISIER re #143 Request for Clerks Entry of Default filed by United States of America (Grisier, Matthew)
October 22, 2021 Filing 143 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Approximately $19,825.86 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7911867682 held by Gregory Allen by United States of America. (Grisier, Matthew)
October 22, 2021 Filing 142 DECLARATION by MATTHEW GRISIER re #141 Request for Clerks Entry of Default filed by United States of America (Grisier, Matthew)
October 22, 2021 Filing 141 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Approximately $264,242.07 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7913494873 held by GA Med, PC by United States of America. (Grisier, Matthew)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Settlement. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
September 14, 2021 Filing 139 DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Approximately $10,732.49 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #006681356967 held in the name of Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah and Approximately $98,936.10 seized from Bank of America Money Market Account #006093237565 held by Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Granting #132 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
September 14, 2021 Filing 137 DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Approximately $19,123.10 seized from DFCU Financial Insured Money Market Account #206924185 held by Ranjan K Shah. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Granting #130 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
September 14, 2021 Filing 135 DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Approximately $8,833.35 seized from Talmer Bank Business Checking Account #8800001480 held in the name of Kartik H Shah d/b/a R K Jewelry. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Granting #128 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
September 13, 2021 Filing 133 DECLARATION by MATTHEW GRISIER re #132 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Approximately $10,732.49 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #006681356967 held in the name of Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah, Approximately $98,936.10 seized from Bank of America Money Market Acc filed by United States of America (Grisier, Matthew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 132 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Approximately $10,732.49 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #006681356967 held in the name of Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah, Approximately $98,936.10 seized from Bank of America Money Market Account #006093237565 held by Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah by United States of America. (Grisier, Matthew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 131 DECLARATION by MATTHEW GRISIER re #130 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Approximately $19,123.10 seized from DFCU Financial Insured Money Market Account #206924185 held by Ranjan K Shah filed by United States of America (Grisier, Matthew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 130 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Approximately $19,123.10 seized from DFCU Financial Insured Money Market Account #206924185 held by Ranjan K Shah by United States of America. (Grisier, Matthew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 129 DECLARATION by MATTHEW GRISIER re #128 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Approximately $8,833.35 seized from Talmer Bank Business Checking Account #8800001480 held in the name of Kartik H Shah d/b/a R K Jewelry filed by United States of America (Grisier, Matthew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 128 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Approximately $8,833.35 seized from Talmer Bank Business Checking Account #8800001480 held in the name of Kartik H Shah d/b/a R K Jewelry by United States of America. (Grisier, Matthew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 127 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Approximately $98,936.10 seized from Bank of America Money Market Account #006093237565 held by Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah* (DPer)
September 2, 2021 Filing 126 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Approximately $10,732.49 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #006681356967 held in the name of Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah* (DPer)
September 2, 2021 Filing 125 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Approximately $19,123.10 seized from DFCU Financial Insured Money Market Account #206924185 held by Ranjan K Shah* (DPer)
September 2, 2021 Filing 124 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Approximately $8,833.35 seized from Talmer Bank Business Checking Account #8800001480 held in the name of Kartik H Shah d/b/a R K Jewelry* (DPer)
September 2, 2021 Filing 123 DECLARATION by MATTHEW GRISIER re #122 Request for Clerks Entry of Default filed by United States of America (Grisier, Matthew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 122 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Approximately $98,936.10 seized from Bank of America Money Market Account #006093237565 held by Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah by United States of America. (Grisier, Matthew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 121 DECLARATION by MATTHEW GRISIER re #120 Request for Clerks Entry of Default filed by United States of America (Grisier, Matthew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 120 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Approximately $10,732.49 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #006681356967 held in the name of Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah by United States of America. (Grisier, Matthew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 119 DECLARATION by MATTHEW GRISIER re #118 Request for Clerks Entry of Default filed by United States of America (Grisier, Matthew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 118 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Approximately $19,123.10 seized from DFCU Financial Insured Money Market Account #206924185 held by Ranjan K Shah by United States of America. (Grisier, Matthew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 117 DECLARATION by MATTHEW GRISIER re #116 Request for Clerks Entry of Default filed by United States of America (Grisier, Matthew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 116 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Approximately $8,833.35 seized from Talmer Bank Business Checking Account #8800001480 held in the name of Kartik H Shah d/b/a R K Jewelry by United States of America. (Grisier, Matthew)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Withdrawal of Verified Claims and Answer by Ranjan Shah and Kartik Shah. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Withdrawal of Claim by Yogina Shah. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Settlement of Claimants Atul Shah and Yogina Shah. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
August 27, 2021 Filing 112 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, OF DECLARATION OF PUBLICATION (Grisier, Matthew)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting #110 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
August 25, 2021 Filing 110 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Kerry Blackburn by United States of America. (Blackburn, Kerry)
August 24, 2021 Filing 109 NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Settlement Conference set for 1/19/2022 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti (MWil)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Patti: Settlement Conference. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
August 18, 2021 Text-Only Order of reassignment from Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub to Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti pursuant to Administrative Order 19-AO-024. (SSch)
August 17, 2021 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Fernandez on behalf of Approximately $7,041.73 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #375008753246 held in the name of Abyssinia Love Knot Physical Therapy, LLC. (Fernandez, Kristin)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 8/20/2021; Dispositive Motion Cut-off reset for 9/20/2021; Final Pretrial Conference reset for 1/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh; and Jury Trial set for 1/18/2022 at 09:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (LHos)
May 16, 2021 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Rataj on behalf of Kartik H Shah, Ranjan K Shah. (Rataj, Michael)
February 18, 2021 Filing 104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #103 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Approximately $7,041.73 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #375008753246 held in the name of Abyssinia Love Knot Physical Therapy, LLC Dr. Kartik Shah, Absyssinia Group, Inc and 1st Priority Physical Therapy, LLC, and Ranjan Shah (Keel, Alvin)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting #98 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
January 21, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge George Caram Steeh: Motion Hearing held on 1/21/2021 re #98 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Alvin L. Keel Alvin L. Keel filed by Approximately $7,041.73 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #375008753246 held in the name of Abyssinia Love Knot Physical Therapy, LLC. Disposition: Motion granted. (Court Reporter: Sheri Ward) (BSau)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATED ORDER Amending Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/20/2021, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 6/21/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh, Jury Trial set for 10/19/2021 at 9:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
December 7, 2020 Filing 100 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #98 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Alvin L. Keel Alvin L. Keel by Approximately $7,041.73 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #375008753246 held in the name of Abyssinia Love Knot Physical Therapy, LLC Kartik H Shah (Keel, Alvin)
December 7, 2020 Filing 99 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #98 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Alvin L. Keel. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2021 at 10:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh. |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1610536272?pwd=cW9HREI2UFZCendncnQ1MU5Cd25mQT09 Passcode: 884106 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1610536272# or +16468287666,,1610536272#|. (BSau)
November 20, 2020 Filing 98 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Alvin L. Keel Alvin L. Keel by Approximately $7,041.73 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #375008753246 held in the name of Abyssinia Love Knot Physical Therapy, LLC. (Keel, Alvin)
October 20, 2020 Filing 97 WITNESS LIST by United States of America (Grisier, Matthew)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/20/2021, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/22/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh, Jury Trial set for 6/22/2021 at 9:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (Refer to image for additional dates) (BSau)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting #92 Motion for Leave to File Late Answer. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
July 17, 2020 Filing 94 ADDENDUM re #92 MOTION for Leave to File Late Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Forfeiture by allen gregory (Chapman, Ronald)
July 14, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 7/20/2020 is Cancelled. (BSau)
July 13, 2020 Filing 93 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Brantley, Steven)
July 13, 2020 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to File Late Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Forfeiture by allen gregory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Forfeiture) (Chapman, Ronald)
July 8, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Gerald Grisier on behalf of United States of America. (Grisier, Matthew)
June 22, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 3:00 PM before District Judge George Caram Steeh. *Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate conference call to 313-234-5175* ***Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/13/2020*** (BSau)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting Government's #88 MOTION to Lift Stay. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
June 19, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION Motion to Lift Stay by United States of America, Steven T Brantley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brantley, Steven)
June 3, 2020 Filing 87 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kerry Blackburn appearing on behalf of United States of America (Blackburn, Kerry)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting #85 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
June 1, 2020 Filing 85 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Annie Zanobini by All Plaintiffs. (Zanobini, Annie)
May 28, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Brantley on behalf of United States of America. (Brantley, Steven)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Continuing Stay of Civil Forfeiture Case until June 19, 2020. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
March 12, 2020 Filing 82 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs (Zanobini, Annie)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Continuing Stay of Civil Forfeiture Case until March 13, 2020. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
November 27, 2019 Filing 80 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs (Zanobini, Annie)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, Parker Tobin for USA. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
October 10, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Parker Tobin by All Plaintiffs. (Tobin, Parker)
October 7, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Annie Zanobini on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Zanobini, Annie)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Continuing Stay of Civil Forfeiture case until 11/29/19. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
August 16, 2019 Filing 75 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs (Tobin, Parker)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER continuing stay to 8/16/19. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
May 17, 2019 Filing 73 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs (Tobin, Parker)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER continuing Stay of civil forfeiture case until 5/17/19. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
February 15, 2019 Filing 71 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs (Tobin, Parker)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER continuing stay of civil forfeiture case until 2/15/19 re #69 Status Report filed by United States of America. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
August 31, 2018 Filing 69 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs (Tobin, Parker)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER continuing stay of civil forfeiture case until 8/31/18. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
March 30, 2018 Filing 67 Status REPORT by All Plaintiffs (Tobin, Parker)
March 16, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Marina C. Fernandez for on behalf of United States of America. (Fernandez, Marina)
October 19, 2017 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Parker Tobin on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Tobin, Parker)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER continuing stay of civil forfeiture case until March 31, 2018. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
October 2, 2017 Filing 63 OCTOBER 2, 2017 STATUS REPORT by United States of America (Fernandez, Marina)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER continuing stay of civil forfeiture case until 10/2/17. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
July 10, 2017 Filing 61 STATUS REPORT of July 10, 2017 by United States of America (Fernandez, Marina)
April 20, 2017 Filing 60 STATUS REPORT by United States of America (Fernandez, Marina)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #52 government's Motion to Stay civil forfeiture case until 4/23/17 and Striking documents #29 and #30 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
November 22, 2016 Filing 58 REPLY to Response re #52 MOTION to Stay filed by United States of America. (Fernandez, Marina)
November 16, 2016 Filing 57 RESPONSE to #52 MOTION to Stay filed by Atul C Shah. (Prasad, Anjali)
November 7, 2016 Filing 56 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #52 MOTION to Stay Response due by 11/21/2016 (MBea)
November 3, 2016 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald William Chapman on behalf of allen gregory. (Chapman, Ronald)
October 28, 2016 Filing 53 SEALED MOTION Motion to Seal Declaration of Special Agent Thomas Farrell re #52 MOTION to Stay by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to Motion to Stay) (Fernandez, Marina)
October 28, 2016 Filing 52 MOTION to Stay by United States of America. (Fernandez, Marina)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #49 Jorin G. Rubin's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for claimants Gregory Allen and GA MED. Per consent #50 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
October 24, 2016 Filing 50 CONSENT re #49 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Jorin G. Rubin by allen gregory (Rubin, Jorin)
October 6, 2016 Filing 49 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Jorin G. Rubin by allen gregory. (Rubin, Jorin)
October 6, 2016 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT REPORT by United States of America (Fernandez, Marina)
August 4, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Nicole M. Andrejko for on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Andrejko, Nicole)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER STAYING CASE for six months per stipulation #45 Status report due 10/6/16. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
April 6, 2016 Filing 45 STIPULATION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Case for Six Months by United States of America (Fernandez, Marina)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STRIKING as improvidently filed #44 MOTION (stipulation and proposed Order) to Stay for Six Months filed by United States of America. (Must be resubmitted via "Utilities" and "Proposed Orders" portal - See ECF Policies and Procedures R11(a)(1) Entered by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
April 5, 2016 Filing 44 *STRICKEN* MOTION to Stay for Six Months by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fernandez, Marina) [DOCKET ERROR - WRONG EVENT USED: DOCUMENT IS TITLED STIPULATION] Modified on 4/5/2016 (Ahmed, N). Modified on 4/6/2016 (MBea).
March 31, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Marina C. Fernandez on behalf of United States of America. (Fernandez, Marina)
March 21, 2016 Filing 42 Return of Service executed on 03/16/16 re return of property. (DPer)
March 9, 2016 Filing 41 CLAIM Seized Asset Verified Claim of Dr. Kartik Shah by Kartik H Shah. (Keel, Alvin)
March 9, 2016 Filing 40 CLAIM Seized Asset Amended Verified Claim by Ranjan K Shah. (Keel, Alvin)
March 9, 2016 NOTICE of Error directed to: Alvin L. Keel re #35 Claim, #36 Claim. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error and add the claimant. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DWor)
March 9, 2016 NOTICE of Error directed to: Jorin G. Rubin re #37 Claim, #39 Claim, #38 Claim. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error and add the claimant. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DWor)
March 8, 2016 Filing 39 CLAIM of Interest by Approximately $264,242.07 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7913494873 held by GA Med, PC. (Rubin, Jorin)
March 8, 2016 Filing 38 CLAIM of Interest by Approximately $2,066.12 seized from Fifth Third Bank Savings Account #9902488320 held by Gregory Allen. (Rubin, Jorin)
March 8, 2016 Filing 37 CLAIM of Interest by Approximately $19,825.86 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7911867682 held by Gregory Allen. (Rubin, Jorin)
March 8, 2016 Filing 36 CLAIM Seized Asset Amended Verified Claim by Approximately $19,123.10 seized from DFCU Financial Insured Money Market Account #206924185 held by Ranjan K Shah. (Keel, Alvin)
March 8, 2016 Filing 35 CLAIM Seized Asset Verified Claim of Dr. Kartik Shah by Approximately $8,833.35 seized from Talmer Bank Business Checking Account #8800001480 held in the name of Kartik H Shah d/b/a R K Jewelry. (Keel, Alvin)
March 8, 2016 NOTICE of Error directed to: Alvin L. Keel re #34 Memorandum. Parties listed on the Seized Asset Verified Claim Form were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error and add the claimant. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DWor)
March 7, 2016 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM Seized Asset Verified Claim Form by Approximately $19,123.10 seized from DFCU Financial Insured Money Market Account #206924185 held by Ranjan K Shah (Keel, Alvin)
March 4, 2016 Filing 33 CLAIM by Atul C Shah, Yogina Shah. (Prasad, Anjali) Modified on 3/4/2016 (DWor). [DOCUMENT ENTITLED "VERIFIED CLAIM OF ATUL SHAH"]
March 4, 2016 Filing 32 CLAIM by Atul C Shah, Yogina Shah. (Prasad, Anjali) Modified on 3/4/2016 (DWor). [DOCUMENT ENTITLED "VERIFIED CLAIM OF ATUL SHAH"]
March 3, 2016 Filing 31 CLAIM by Atul C Shah. (Prasad, Anjali) Modified on 3/3/2016 (DWor). [DOCUMENT ENTITLED "VERIFIED CLAIM OF YOGINA A. SHAH"]
March 3, 2016 Filing 30 *STRICKEN* CLAIM by Atul C Shah. (Prasad, Anjali) Modified on 3/3/2016 (DWor). [DOCUMENT ENTITLED "VERIFIED CLAIM OF YOGINA A. SHAH"] *Modified on 11/28/2016 (MBea).
March 3, 2016 Filing 29 *STRICKEN* CLAIM by Atul C Shah. (Prasad, Anjali) Modified on 3/3/2016 (DWor). [DOCUMENT ENTITLED "VERIFIED CLAIM OF YOGINA A. SHAH"] *Modified on 11/28/2016 (MBea).
March 3, 2016 Filing 28 CLAIM by Atul C Shah. (Prasad, Anjali) Modified on 3/3/2016 (DWor). [DOCUMENT ENTITLED "VERIFIED CLAIM OF YOGINA A. SHAH"]
March 3, 2016 Filing 27 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Approximately $200,367.65 seized from Comerica Bank Business Savings Account #9414025842 held in the name of 1st Priority Physical Therapy, LLC (Keel, Alvin)
March 3, 2016 Filing 26 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Approximately $68,903.21 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #375011433472 held in the name of Abyssinia Group, Inc (Keel, Alvin)
March 3, 2016 Filing 25 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Approximately $19,123.10 seized from DFCU Financial Insured Money Market Account #206924185 held by Ranjan K Shah (Keel, Alvin)
March 3, 2016 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint for Forfeiture by Approximately $200,367.65 seized from Comerica Bank Business Savings Account #9414025842 held in the name of 1st Priority Physical Therapy, LLC. (Keel, Alvin)
March 3, 2016 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint for Forfeiture by Approximately $68,903.21 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #375011433472 held in the name of Abyssinia Group, Inc. (Keel, Alvin)
March 2, 2016 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant $8,833.35 Seized From Talmer Bank, Kartik H. Shah and by Approximately $19,123.10 seized from DFCU Financial Insured Money Market Account #206924185 held by Ranjan K Shah. (Keel, Alvin)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Striking Verified Claims #17 #18 #19 #20 and ordering claimants' counsel to update her contact information. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
February 18, 2016 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Claimant Atul C Shah. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF (Prasad, Anjali)
February 17, 2016 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant Approximately $98,936.10 seized from Bank of America Money Market Account #006093237565 held by Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #19 Claim, #20 Claim, #18 Claim, #17 Claim (Prasad, Anjali)
February 16, 2016 NOTICE of Error directed to: Anjali Prasad re #19 Claim, #20 Claim, #18 Claim, #17 Claim. Parties listed on the Verified Claims were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DWor)
February 16, 2016 Filing 20 *STRICKEN* CLAIM verified claim by Approximately $98,936.10 seized from Bank of America Money Market Account #006093237565 held by Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah. (Prasad, Anjali) Modified on 2/29/2016 (MBea).
February 16, 2016 Filing 19 *STRICKEN* CLAIM verified claim by Approximately $98,936.10 seized from Bank of America Money Market Account #006093237565 held by Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah. (Prasad, Anjali) Modified on 2/29/2016 (MBea).
February 16, 2016 Filing 18 *STRICKEN* CLAIM verified claim by Approximately $98,936.10 seized from Bank of America Money Market Account #006093237565 held by Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah. (Prasad, Anjali) Modified on 2/29/2016 (MBea).
February 16, 2016 Filing 17 *STRICKEN* CLAIM verified claim by Approximately $98,936.10 seized from Bank of America Money Market Account #006093237565 held by Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah. (Prasad, Anjali) Modified on 2/29/2016 (MBea).
February 16, 2016 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Approximately $98,936.10 seized from Bank of America Money Market Account #006093237565 held by Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah. (Prasad, Anjali)
February 16, 2016 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Anjali Prasad appearing on behalf of Approximately $98,936.10 seized from Bank of America Money Market Account #006093237565 held by Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah (Prasad, Anjali)
February 16, 2016 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Anjali Prasad appearing on behalf of Approximately $10,732.49 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #006681356967 held in the name of Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah (Prasad, Anjali)
February 11, 2016 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Warrant Issued, #3 Warrant Issued, #11 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, #5 Warrant Issued, #2 Warrant Issued, #10 Warrant Issued, #7 Warrant Issued, #12 Warrant Issued, #4 Warrant Issued, #8 Warrant Issued, #9 Warrant Issued by United States of America (Andrejko, Nicole)
February 2, 2016 Filing 12 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DPer)
February 2, 2016 Filing 11 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DPer)
February 2, 2016 Filing 10 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DPer)
February 2, 2016 Filing 9 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DPer)
February 2, 2016 Filing 8 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DPer)
February 2, 2016 Filing 7 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DPer)
February 2, 2016 Filing 6 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DPer)
February 2, 2016 Filing 5 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DPer)
February 2, 2016 Filing 4 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DPer)
February 2, 2016 Filing 3 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DPer)
February 2, 2016 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DPer)
February 1, 2016 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
January 29, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem) filed by United States of America against Approximately $10,433.14 seized from Comerica Bank Basic Business Checking Account #1852621893 held in the name of 1st Priority Physical Therapy, LLC, Approximately $10,732.49 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #006681356967 held in the name of Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah, Approximately $19,123.10 seized from DFCU Financial Insured Money Market Account #206924185 held by Ranjan K Shah, Approximately $19,825.86 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7911867682 held by Gregory Allen, Approximately $2,066.12 seized from Fifth Third Bank Savings Account #9902488320 held by Gregory Allen, Approximately $200,367.65 seized from Comerica Bank Business Savings Account #9414025842 held in the name of 1st Priority Physical Therapy, LLC, Approximately $264,242.07 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7913494873 held by GA Med, PC, Approximately $68,903.21 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #375011433472 held in the name of Abyssinia Group, Inc, Approximately $7,041.73 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #375008753246 held in the name of Abyssinia Love Knot Physical Therapy, LLC, Approximately $8,833.35 seized from Talmer Bank Business Checking Account #8800001480 held in the name of Kartik H Shah d/b/a R K Jewelry, Approximately $98,936.10 seized from Bank of America Money Market Account #006093237565 held by Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah with Jury Demand. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 2:15-mc-51306, 15-mj-30461, 15-mj-30462, Judge Sean F. Cox, unassigned, unassigned] (Andrejko, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $7,041.73 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #375008753246 held in the name of Abyssinia Love Knot Physical Therapy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $7,041.73 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #375008753246 held in the name of Abyssinia Love Knot Physical Therapy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $10,732.49 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #006681356967 held in the name of Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah
Represented By: Anjali Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $200,367.65 seized from Comerica Bank Business Savings Account #9414025842 held in the name of 1st Priority Physical Therapy, LLC
Represented By: Alvin L. Keel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $2,066.12 seized from Fifth Third Bank Savings Account #9902488320 held by Gregory Allen
Represented By: Jorin G. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yogina Shah
Represented By: Anjali Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $68,903.21 seized from Bank of America Checking Account #375011433472 held in the name of Abyssinia Group, Inc
Represented By: Alvin L. Keel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $19,825.86 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7911867682 held by Gregory Allen
Represented By: Jorin G. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $19,123.10 seized from DFCU Financial Insured Money Market Account #206924185 held by Ranjan K Shah
Represented By: Alvin L. Keel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $8,833.35 seized from Talmer Bank Business Checking Account #8800001480 held in the name of Kartik H Shah d/b/a R K Jewelry
Represented By: Alvin L. Keel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $10,433.14 seized from Comerica Bank Basic Business Checking Account #1852621893 held in the name of 1st Priority Physical Therapy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $98,936.10 seized from Bank of America Money Market Account #006093237565 held by Atul Shah or Yogina A Shah
Represented By: Anjali Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $264,242.07 seized from Fifth Third Bank Checking Account #7913494873 held by GA Med, PC
Represented By: Jorin G. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole M. Andrejko
Represented By: Matthew Gerald Grisier
Represented By: Parker Tobin
Represented By: Marina C. Fernandez
Represented By: Kerry Blackburn
Represented By: Annie Zanobini
Represented By: Steven Brantley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven T Brantley
Represented By: Steven Brantley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dr. Kartik H Shah
Represented By: Alvin L. Keel
Represented By: Michael A. Rataj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: allen gregory
Represented By: Ronald William Chapman, II
Represented By: Jorin G. Rubin
Represented By: Kristin Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Atul C Shah
Represented By: Anjali Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ranjan K Shah
Represented By: Alvin L. Keel
Represented By: Michael A. Rataj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?