XPO CNW, INC. et al v. R & L CARRIERS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: XPO CNW, INC. and XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC.
Defendant: R & L CARRIERS, INC., JAMES MATTHEWS, SHAWN THACKRAY and JILL LANGLEY
Case Number: 2:2016cv10391
Filed: February 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER ADOPTING SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORTS AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING DISCOVERY Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions to Compel as to 63 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery, 50 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery by XPO CNW, INC., XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC.. :( Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2017 02:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland) At the US District Court in Port Huron, MI Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER EXTENDING Scheduling Order., ( Discovery due by 10/2/2017, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/10/2017, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2018 02:30 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland, Jury Trial set for 4/9/2018 09:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland) SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 OPINION AND ORDER granting 13 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the pleadings. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER RE: 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Holding 10 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC., XPO CNW, INC., 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC., XPO CNW, INC. In Abeyance and Directing Plaintiffs' Serve and Confer with Defendants. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XPO CNW, INC. et al v. R & L CARRIERS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XPO CNW, INC.
Represented By: Matthew M. Dybas
Represented By: Robert H. Ellis
Represented By: Patrick F. Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC.
Represented By: Matthew M. Dybas
Represented By: Robert H. Ellis
Represented By: Patrick F. Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & L CARRIERS, INC.
Represented By: Kevin N. Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MATTHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAWN THACKRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILL LANGLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?