Waid et al v. Snyder et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Luke waid, Michelle rodriguez and SR
Defendant: RICHARD D SNYDER, State of Michigan, Daniel Wyant, Liane shekter-smith, Adam Rosenthal, Stephen Busch, Patrick Cook, Michael Prysby, Bradley Wurfel, Darnell Earley, Gerald Ambrose, Dayne Walling, Howard Croft, Michael Glasgow, Daugherty johnson and Flint, City of
Case Number: 2:2016cv10444
Filed: February 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Ann Arbor Office
County: Genesee
Presiding Judge: Mona K. Majzoub
Presiding Judge: John Corbett O'Meara
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Hunter Shkolnik appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shkolnik, Hunter)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McAlpine PC (McAlpine, Mark) Modified on 2/23/2016 (DWor). [AMENDED]
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED 8 Notice of Appearance by McAlpine PC (McAlpine, Mark)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L. McAlpine on behalf of McAlpine PC. (McAlpine, Mark)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER appointing next friend. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (DPer)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Matthew F. Leitman and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti in Detroit to District Judge John Corbett O'Meara and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub in Ann Arbor. (SSch)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Substitution of Attorney. Attorney Brian J. McKeen for Michelle Rodriguez and Luke Waid added. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT by All Plaintiffs (Carley, Joseph) Modified on 2/9/2016 (DWor). [DOCUMENT ENTITLED "SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL"]
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Ex-Parte Motion for Appointment of Next Friend (Carley, Joseph)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against Gerald Ambrose, Stephen Busch, City of Flint, Patrick Cook, Howard Croft, Darnell Earley, Michael Glasgow, Michael Prysby, Adam Rosenthal, RICHARD D SNYDER, State of Michigan, Dayne Walling, Bradley Wurfel, Daniel Wyant, Daugherty johnson, Liane shekter-smith with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-5543867 - Fee: $ 400. County Where Action Arose: Genesee County - [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Carley, Joseph) Modified on 2/8/2016 (DWor). [ATTORNEY DOES NOT WANT SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOSEPH CARLEY BUT TO BRIAN MCKEEN]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waid et al v. Snyder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke waid
Represented By: Brian J. McKeen
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle rodriguez
Represented By: Brian J. McKeen
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SR
Represented By: Brian J. McKeen
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD D SNYDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Wyant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liane shekter-smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Prysby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Wurfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darnell Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Ambrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayne Walling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Croft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Glasgow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daugherty johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?