Carro v. Barra et al
Plaintiff: Daniel J Carro
Defendant: Mary T. Barra, Daniel F. Akerson, Michael P Millikin, John Calabrese and General Motors Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv10479
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Presiding Judge: Mona K. Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendants' 25 Motion to Dismiss; 26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER setting deadlines., (Amended Complaint to be filed by 3/6/2017, Response to the complaint due by 4/5/2017), ( Motion to Dismiss (if any) to be filed by 4/5/2017, Response due by 5/5/2017, Reply due by 5/26/2017) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING 16 MOTION for Discovery filed by Daniel J Carro and setting a ( Scheduling Conference for 2/7/2017 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carro v. Barra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J Carro
Represented By: Andrew J. Morganti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary T. Barra
Represented By: Daniel J. LaCombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel F. Akerson
Represented By: Daniel J. LaCombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P Millikin
Represented By: Daniel J. LaCombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Calabrese
Represented By: Daniel J. LaCombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company
Represented By: Raymond W. Henney
Represented By: Robert J. Kopecky
Represented By: Joshua Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?