Holmes v. Romulus, City of et al
Plaintiff: Lorraine Holmes
Defendant: Romulus, City of, John Leacher, David Brooks and jadie settles
Case Number: 2:2016cv10610
Filed: February 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Presiding Judge: Anthony P. Patti
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER STAYING CASE and Administratively Closing Case. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 60 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING 46 Motion to Quash--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING AS Unopposed Defendants' 40 Motion for Protective Order--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Alternate Service--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Romulus, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romulus, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Leacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jadie settles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Holmes
Represented By: Ronnie E. Cromer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?