Stallworth v. City of Pleasant Ridge et al
Plaintiff: Larry Stallworth
Defendant: Pleasant Ridge, City of and S. Champine
Case Number: 2:2016cv10696
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Leitman
Presiding Judge: Anthony P. Patti
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OPINION AND ORDER (1) Granting Defendant James Farris' 40 Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant Scott Champine's 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; and (3) Dismissing Claims Against Defendant City of Ferndale. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 35 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Experts. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting Defendants' 28 Motion for Alternative Service. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Attend Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. (Scheduling Conference set for 5/26/2016 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stallworth v. City of Pleasant Ridge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Stallworth
Represented By: Shawn C. Cabot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleasant Ridge, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Champine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?