Doe 1 v. Deja Vu Consulting, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Defendant: Deja Vu Consulting, Inc, DV Saginaw, LLC, Deja Vu Showgirls, Harry Mohney and Deja Vu Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv10877
Filed: March 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Bay City Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: Thomas L. Ludington
Presiding Judge: Patricia T. Morris
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 OPINION and ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 86 Motion to Amend/Correct; Finding as Moot 98 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 OPINION and ORDER Overruling 39 , 47 , 50 , 51 , 56 Objections; Granting 41 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement; Granting Amended 43 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs; Finding as Moot 12 Motion to Dismiss and; Finding as Moot 42 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION and ORDER Granting 27 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION and ORDER Granting the Parties' 29 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, (Fairness Hearing set for 6/6/2017 02:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 1 v. Deja Vu Consulting, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: Megan Bonanni
Represented By: Rachael Elizabeth Kohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deja Vu Consulting, Inc
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DV Saginaw, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deja Vu Showgirls
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Mohney
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deja Vu Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?