Sandweiss et al v. Spirit Airlines, Inc.

Plaintiff: Valerie Sandweiss and Stuart Sandweiss
Defendant: Spirit Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv12114
Filed: June 9, 2016
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Leitman
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 39 ORDER (1) Denying Defendant's 32 Petition for Sanctions and Prior 13 Request for Sanctions, (2) Denying Plaintiffs' 35 MOTION for Sanctions, (3) Declining to Award Defendant its Costs re 33 Bill of Costs, and (4) Dismissing this Action With Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order 37 ORDER on Plaintiffs' Pending 35 MOTION. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order 30 ORDER Resolving Pending Motions and Setting Supplemental Briefing Schedule With Respect to Defendant's 13 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER on Motion Practice re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint or Alternatively Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. (Response due by 1/3/2017, Reply due by 1/17/2017. **SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINE**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER to Appear for Status Conference. (Status Conference set for 12/12/2016 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandweiss et al v. Spirit Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Sandweiss
Represented By: Brian H. Herschfus
Represented By: Stuart Sandweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Sandweiss
Represented By: Brian H. Herschfus
Represented By: Stuart Sandweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirit Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M. Schmidt
Represented By: Scott R. Torpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?