Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company v. Novosad et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Christopher Novosad, April Novosad, April Novosad, as Next Friend of Hanna Jolee Novosad and Michigan Assigned Claims Plan
Case Number: 2:2016cv12481
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Goldsmith
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPINION & ORDER Adopting the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation Dated July 26, 2018 (Dkt. 66 ), Overruling Defendant Christopher Novosad's Objections Thereto (Dkt. 70 ), and Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment AND (Dkt. 56 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 59 Motion to Appoint Counsel - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER (1) Accepting the Recommendation Contained in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation Date August 14, 2017 (Dkt. 52 )and (2) Granting Defendant Michigan Assigned Claims Plan's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 35 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION and ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S 23 MOTION to Set Aside 18 Clerks Entry of Default and for Permission to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Ameded Complaint AND ORDER VACATING 18 Clerks Entry of Default - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company v. Novosad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Novosad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Novosad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Novosad, as Next Friend of Hanna Jolee Novosad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Assigned Claims Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?