Campbell v. Mack et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Campbell
Defendant: Daniel Mack, P. Morris, Officer Unknown and City of Allen Park
Case Number: 2:2016cv12922
Filed: August 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Leitman
Presiding Judge: Mona K. Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting Defendants' 89 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 73 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's 64 Objections to Magistrate Judge's November 7, 2017, Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER (1) Granting Plaintiff's 58 Motion for an Order to Show Cause and (2) Ordering Third-Party K-9 Academy Training Facility to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 12/15/2017. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL 37 AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL 48 - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LHos)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Extending Stay of All Discovery Directed Towards Defendant Daniel Mack. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant Daniel Mack's 10 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Mack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Mack
Represented By: Audrey J. Forbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Allen Park
Represented By: Audrey J. Forbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Campbell
Represented By: Thomas E. Kuhn
Represented By: David A. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?