Arnold v. VanPaemel et al
Plaintiff: Arnold and Angela M. Arnold
Defendant: VanPaemel, Fifth Third Bank Law Department and Jim VanPaemel
Case Number: 2:2016cv13112
Filed: August 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2017 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #13 and #12 on Angela M. Arnold at 16361 Glenmore, Redford, MI 48240. (KJac)
January 13, 2017 Filing 13 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (KJac)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER Dismissing Complaint Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (KJac)
October 13, 2016 Filing 11 REPLY to Response re #1 Complaint filed by Angela M. Arnold. (Ahmed, N)
October 12, 2016 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Angela M. Arnold. (BGar)
September 27, 2016 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Fifth Third Bank Law Department identifying Corporate Parent Fifth Third Bancorp for Fifth Third Bank Law Department. (You, Laura)
September 27, 2016 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Fifth Third Bank Law Department. (You, Laura)
September 23, 2016 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fifth Third Bank Law Department served on 8/29/2016, answer due 9/19/2016. (Ahmed, N)
September 20, 2016 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jim VanPaemel (Forest, David)
September 20, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Jim VanPaemel. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (Forest, David)
September 7, 2016 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KKra)
September 1, 2016 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David B. Forest appearing on behalf of Jim VanPaemel (Forest, David)
August 29, 2016 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Fifth Third Bank Law Department, Jim VanPaemel* (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DAll)
August 29, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Angela M. Arnold against Fifth Third Bank Law Department, Jim VanPaemel Receipt No: DET095410 - Fee: $ 400. (DAll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. VanPaemel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VanPaemel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank Law Department
Represented By: Laura N. You
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim VanPaemel
Represented By: David B. Forest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela M. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?