Waad et al v. Farmers Insurance Exchange, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maher Waad, Marks One Car Rental, Inc. and Marks One Collision, Inc.
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange, Inc., Sergeant Dan Willis, Detective Dave Kriss, Lieutenant Mark Oerman, Dana Goldberg, Macomb, County of, The Macomb County Sheriff's Department, Michigan Auto Theft Prevention Authority and Allen Keller
Case Number: 2:2016cv13362
Filed: September 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Macomb
Presiding Judge: Avern Cohn
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR A WAIVER AND OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS BILL OF COSTS AND REQUEST FOR A STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL (Doc. 85) Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING MACOMB COUNTYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Doc. 55) AND MACOMB COUNTY LIEUTENANT MARK OERMAN AND MACOMB COUNTY SERGEANT DAN WILLIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Doc. 56) AND DETECTIVE KRISS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Doc. 72) AND DENYING DETECTIVE KRISS RENEWED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (Doc. 75) AND DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2018: # 1 Exhibit A) (MVer).
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL (Doc. 66) WITH CONDITIONS AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT KRISS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (Doc. 68). Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT DANA GOLDBERG'S MOTION TO DISMISS [DOC. 14]. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE AND ALLEN KELLER Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waad et al v. Farmers Insurance Exchange, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maher Waad
Represented By: Steven Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marks One Car Rental, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marks One Collision, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel C. Damren
Represented By: Robert H. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Dan Willis
Represented By: John A. Schapka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Dave Kriss
Represented By: Raechel M. Badalamenti
Represented By: Robert T. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Mark Oerman
Represented By: John A. Schapka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Goldberg
Represented By: John A. Schapka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macomb, County of
Represented By: John A. Schapka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Macomb County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: John A. Schapka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Auto Theft Prevention Authority
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Joseph T. Froehlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Keller
Represented By: Robert H. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?