William Beaumont Hospital - Royal Oak v. Burwell
Plaintiff: William Beaumont Hospital - Royal Oak
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Case Number: 2:2016cv13528
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 33 RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT, DENYING DEFENDANTS 34 RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT, AND REMANDING THE CASE TO THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 30 Joint MOTION to Vacate 22 Order, and Joint MOTION to Dismiss ;. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT, DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT, AND ORDERING FURTHER BRIEFING Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (NAhm) Modified on 3/30/2018 (LWag).
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 19 Petition for leave to file a reply filed by Sylvia Mathews Burwell:( Reply due by 8/4/2017) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William Beaumont Hospital - Royal Oak v. Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Beaumont Hospital - Royal Oak
Represented By: Nasseem S. Ramin
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?