Arabian Motors Group W.L.L. v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Arabian Motors Group W.L.L.
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv13655
Filed: October 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Counsel's Oral Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney of John B. Alfs for Arabian Motors Group W.L.L.. (HRya)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 1/26/2022. Oral motion by John Alfs of the Clark Hill Law Firm to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff made and granted. Order to follow. Finally, Court and parties acknowledge this action has been stayed by the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HRya)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 1/26/2022 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MANDATE from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to #73 Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment [Appeal Case Number 20-2112/20-2152] (SKra)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 OPINION from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #66 Notice of Appeal filed by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L., #68 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Ford Motor Company [Appeal Case Number 20-2112] (SKra)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #66 Notice of Appeal filed by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L., #68 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Ford Motor Company [Appeal Case Number 20-2112 / 20-2152] (TTho)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference held on 02/12/2020. (Court Reporter: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 8) (Appeal Purposes) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 1/6/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2021. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on October 16, 2019. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 12) (Appeal Purposes) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 12/21/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2021. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Certificate of Service re #68 Notice of Cross Appeal. (ATee)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by Ford Motor Company. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8181630 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Sullivan, John)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Certificate of Service re #66 Notice of Appeal. (SKra)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L.. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8162963 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Alfs, John)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (MacKay, K)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 OPINION AND ORDER (1) Denying #55 Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings (ECF No. 55), (2) Dismissing Plaintiff's Claims in Part Based on Mootness, and (3) Dismissing Plaintiff's Remaining, Non-Moot Claims Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (MacKay, K)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE to #55 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 4/20/2020 Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - 8/18/2020 Transcript) (Alfs, John)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #55 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ford Motor Company. (Sullivan, John)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TRANSCRIPT of VIDEO STATUS CONFERENCE held on August 18, 2020. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 20) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 9/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2020. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER (1) Denying Ford Motor Company's #55 MOTION to Dismiss in Part and Taking Motion Under Advisement in Part and (2) Setting Briefing Schedule for Supplemental Briefs. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Video Status Conference held on 8/18/2020. Order to Follow. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY to Response re #55 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ford Motor Company. (Sullivan, John)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 RESPONSE to #55 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Transcript of 4/20/2020 hearing) (Alfs, John)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Filing Deadlines of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's #55 MOTION to Dismiss.Response due by 6/22/2020, Reply due by 7/6/2020. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF JOHN J. SULLIVAN, #2 EXHIBIT A - AMG RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM, #3 EXHIBIT B - Letter to L. Schaner, #4 Declaration of J. Ellsworth, #5 Ellsworth Declaration Exhibit 1) (Sullivan, John)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT of MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT held on April 20, 2020. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 17) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 5/27/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/8/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2020. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER (1) Denying Plaintiff's #46 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment and (2) Setting Schedule. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 4/20/2020 re #46 MOTION for Judgment (ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT) filed by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L. Disposition: Motion Denied. Order to Follow. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF HEARING BY ZOOM on #46 MOTION for Judgment (ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT). Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2020 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **HEARING WILL TAKE PLACE VIA ZOOM - THE COURT WILL FORWARD A LINK TO JOIN THE HEARING** (HMon)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Filing of Proposed Final Judgment (Sullivan, John)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L. re Status Conference,, of Filing of Proposed Judgment (Alfs, John)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/12/2020. Plaintiff to submit proposed final judgment to Defendant by March 4, 2020. Defendant to respond to proposed judgment by March 18, 2020. By not later than April 8, 2020, the parties shall jointly file a proposed final judgment, or Plaintiff shall file its proposed final judgment. If Plaintiff files its proposed final judgment, Defendant shall file its proposed final judgment by not later than April 13, 2020. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HMon)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATED ORDER for the Withdrawal of Loula Fuller. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE TO JOIN THE CALL** (HMon)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE to #46 MOTION for Judgment (ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Sullivan, John)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Judgment (ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT) by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L.. (Alfs, John)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Filing Deadlines of the Motion for Entry of Judgment. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/16/2019. Plaintiff to file motion for entry of judgment by 11/25/2019. Defendant to respond by 12/16/2019. Plaintiff to reply by 12/31/2019. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE TO JOIN THE CALL** (HMon)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MANDATE from 16-13655 as to #40 Notice of Appeal filed by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L. [Appeal Case Number 18-1748] (DWor)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #40 Notice of Appeal filed by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L. [Appeal Case Number 18-1748] (SKra)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Certificate of Service re #40 Notice of Appeal. (DPer)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L. re #39 Judgment. Receipt No: 0645-6799647 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Alfs, John)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Ex A - GIDSSA, #2 Ex B - Letter of Appointment, #3 Ex C - Final Award) (Sullivan, John)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER (1) Denying Plaintiff's #32 Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award and (2) Granting Defendant's #35 Cross-Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY to Response re #32 MOTION to Vacate Arbitrator's Award filed by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L.. (Alfs, John)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE to #32 MOTION to Vacate Arbitrator's Award and Defendant's Cross-Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Ford Motor Company. (Sullivan, John)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's #32 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award and Other Briefing Deadlines. Response due by 4/6/2018, Reply due by 4/20/2018. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #32 MOTION to Vacate Arbitrator's Award by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L. (Alfs, John)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Vacate Arbitrator's Award by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Final Award, #3 Exhibit 2 - Interim Award) (Alfs, John)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (SSch)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OPINION AND ORDER Denying Plaintiff's #26 Motion for a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY to Response re #26 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L.. (Alfs, John)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE to #26 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Letter from the General Counsel of Arabian Motors Group, W.L.L. (AMG) to the American Arbitration Associations (AAA) International Case Director dated April 30, 2016, #3 Exhibit B - Procedural Order No. 1, issued by AAA on September 14, 2016, #4 Exhibit C - Procedural Order No. 2, issued by AAA on November 14, 2016, #5 Exhibit D - Interim Award on Jurisdiction, issued by AAA on November 22, 2016, #6 Exhibit E - Procedural Order No. 3, issued by AAA on January 19, 2017, #7 Exhibit F - Docket Sheet in In Re A2P SMS Antitrust Litigation, No. 15- 758 (U.S. Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit), #8 Exhibit G - Declaration of Colm A. Moran in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Certify This Court's January 19, 2017 Opinion and Order for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b)) (Sullivan, John)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Striking #27 Response to Motion filed by Ford Motor Company. **PLEASE SEE R18 OF THE ECF POLICIES AND PROCEDURES MANUAL FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS** Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 [STRICKEN] RESPONSE to #26 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Ford Motor Company. (Sullivan, John) Modified on 5/1/2017 (HMon).
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Alfs, John)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/2/2017. Arabian Motors to file motion to certify case for interlocutory appeal by March 31, 2017; Ford to respond to that motion by April 28, 2017; Arabian Motors to reply by May 10, 2017. Ford need not respond to the Complaint until further order of the Court. A telephonic status conference will follow a ruling on the certification motion. (HMon)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 3/2/2017 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE** (HMon)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION AND ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (ECF #21 ). Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Sandusky, K)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE to #21 MOTION for Reconsideration re #18 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ford Motor Company. (Sullivan, John)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Requiring Ford Motor Company to Respond to Plaintiff's #21 MOTION for Reconsideration. (Response due by 2/17/2017) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Requiring Defendant to file a Response to the #1 Complaint within 10 days of the Court's decision on the Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Reconsideration re #18 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L.. (Alfs, John)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/2/2017. (HMon)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 2/2/2017 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE** (HMon)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Stay Arbitration held on 12/14/2016. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 74) (Appeal Purposes) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 2/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2017. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION AND ORDER Denying Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Stay Arbitration. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #13 Response to Motion,,,, Defendant Ford Motor Company's Notice of Filing Supplemental Exhibit H in Support of Ford's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Docket #13) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H - Supplemental Exhibit) (Guise, Clay)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2016 re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Stay Arbitration filed by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L. Disposition: Motion Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HMon)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Stay Arbitration filed by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L.. (Alfs, John)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Page Limit for Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Its #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Stay Arbitration. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ford Motor Company (Guise, Clay)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Stay Arbitration filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - UNCITRAL Rules, G.A. Res. 31/98, U.N. Doc. A/RES/31/98 (Dec. 15, 1976), #3 Exhibit B - UNCITRAL Rules, G.A. Res. 65/22, U.N. Doc. A/RES/65/22 (Jan. 10, 2011), #4 Exhibit C - Letter from the General Counsel of Arabian Motors Group, W.L.L. (AMG) to the American Arbitration Associations (AAA) International Case Director dated April 30, 2016, #5 Exhibit D - Procedural Order No.1, issued by AAA on September 14, 2016, #6 Exhibit E - E-mail string including e-mails dated September 15, 2016, October 10, 2016, and October 12, 2016, from Brooks Savage, counsel for AMG, to AAA Arbitrator Lawrence S. Schaner and, among others, Carl J. Chiappa and Colm A. Moran, counsel for Defendant Ford Motor Company (Ford), #7 Exhibit F - Procedural Order No.2, issued by AAA on November 14, 2016, #8 Exhibit G - Declaration of Colm A. Moran in Support of Ford Motor Companys Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Stay Arbitration) (Guise, Clay)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING on #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Stay Arbitration. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 at 09:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Defendant's Response is due by 11/15/2016. Plaintiff's Reply is due by 11/29/2016. Defendant's answer or other response to the Complaint is due 21 days from the Court's written order regarding the Motion for Preliminary Injunction). (Sandusky, K)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/1/2016. (Sandusky, K)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Sullivan on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Sullivan, John)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 11/1/2016 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE** (HMon)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 [STRICKEN] NOTICE by Ford Motor Company re #8 Notice of Appearance of John Sullivan of Hogan Lovells US LLP (Guise, Clay) Modified on 10/25/2016 (HMon).
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Clay A. Guise on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Guise, Clay)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Striking #9 Notice (Other) filed by Ford Motor Company. John Sullivan must enter his own appearance using his own CM/ECF login and password. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ford Motor Company served on 10/18/2016, answer due 11/8/2016. (Alfs, John)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Loula M. Fuller on behalf of Arabian Motors Group W.L.L.. (Fuller, Loula)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Stay Arbitration by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Alfs, John)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L. (Alfs, John)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Ford Motor Company* (DWor)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order REQUEST for SUMMONS for Ford Motor Company. (Alfs, John)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Ford Motor Company* (DWor)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Arabian Motors Group W.L.L. against Ford Motor Company Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-5914132 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of Country - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T) (Alfs, John)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arabian Motors Group W.L.L. v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arabian Motors Group W.L.L.
Represented By: Loula M. Fuller
Represented By: John B. Alfs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Clay A. Guise
Represented By: John J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?