The Estate of RICHIE MAJORS, deceased et al v. GERLACH et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of RICHIE MAJORS, deceased and RE'SHANE LONZO
Defendant: ROGER A. GERLACH, ROBERT L. PREVO, HEIDI SMITH, RENEE C. VIVES, HEIDI L. HERMAN, SAVITHRI KAKANI, JOHN R. SOLOMONSON, KAREN S. RICH, JOEL A. EVERTSEN, DORINA A. BLOHM, THOMAS A. LANORE and SUSAN M. HOWARD
Case Number: 2:2016cv13672
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Goldsmith
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 OPINION & ORDER Granting Corizon Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 113 ) and Granting MDOC Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 145 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 OPINION & ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (Dkt. 90 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 OPINION & ORDER Granting In Part Defendant's Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admission (Dkt. 106 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 OPINION & ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. 46 ) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OPINION & ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to Transfer to Venue (Dkt. 29 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of RICHIE MAJORS, deceased et al v. GERLACH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of RICHIE MAJORS, deceased
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RE'SHANE LONZO
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER A. GERLACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT L. PREVO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEIDI SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENEE C. VIVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEIDI L. HERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAVITHRI KAKANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN R. SOLOMONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN S. RICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEL A. EVERTSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DORINA A. BLOHM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS A. LANORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN M. HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?