Goss v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Goss, Jr.
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc. and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv14391
Filed: December 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Presiding Judge: Anthony P. Patti
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 56 Motion for Injunctive Relief and Staying Statutory Redemption Period until Furhter Order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION AND ORDER granting 32 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint and terminating as moot 25 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Construing 26 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order as Motion for Preliminary Injunction and denying without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING 4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goss v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Goss, Jr.
Represented By: Vanessa G. Fluker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?