Arab American Civil Rights League et al v. Donald Trump et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that President Trump's Executive Order (1) violated the Fifth Amendment by suspending the rights of lawful permanent residents to re-enter the United States without providing due process, (2) violated the Establishment Clause giving preference to Christianity; (3) violated the Equal Protection Clause by discriminating against plaintiffs on the basis of their country of origin and religion without sufficient justification; (4) violated the Fifth Amendment by denying plaintiffs the fundamental right to familial association; (5) violated the Administrative Procedure Act by discriminating against plaintiffs in the issuance of visas on the basis of race, nationality, place of birth and place of residence; and (6) violated the Religious Freedom Restoration Act.

Plaintiff: Arab American Civil Rights League, Kokab Algazali, Hend Alshawaish, Atik Mounira, Abubaker Abbass, Naji Algahaim, Samir Almasmari, Hana Almasmari, Shaika Shagera, Yusra Alsoufi, Walid Jammoul, Sahla Al-Talaqani, Hasan Al-Ahmed and Sabah Almasmary
Defendant: Donald Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly and Kevin McAleenan
Amicus Curiae: The Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Asian Americans Advancing Justice, National Native American Bar Association and South Asian Bar Association of North America
Case Number: 2:2017cv10310
Filed: January 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
0 Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
1 Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Helal A. Farhat on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Farhat, Helal)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order: Amended Complaint due by 2/5/17; Response due by 2/7/2017; Reply due by 2/9/2017; Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2017 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (see image for details and dates) (LVer)
February 3, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Briana Yuh on behalf of All Defendants. (Yuh, Briana)
February 3, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie C. Qandah on behalf of Arab American Civil Rights League. (Qandah, Natalie) Modified on 2/3/2017 (LHos).[DOCUMENT IS AN APPEARANCE FOR MONA FADLALLAH AND NATALIE QANDAH. ADVISED MS. FADLALLAH TO FILE AN APPEARANCE USING HER LOGIN]
February 2, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/2/2017 (Court Reporter: Janice Coleman) (CPin)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' 5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
February 2, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Relevant Authority by All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum from Counsel to the President) (Westwater, Gisela) Modified on 2/3/2017 (LHos).
February 2, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gisela Westwater on behalf of All Defendants. (Westwater, Gisela)
February 2, 2017 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Ayad, Nabih)
February 2, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kassem M. Dakhlallah on behalf of Arab American Civil Rights League. (Dakhlallah, Kassem)
January 31, 2017 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LHos)
January 31, 2017 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (LHos)
January 31, 2017 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, Kevin McAleenan, Donald Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection* (LHos)
January 31, 2017 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Samir Almasmari, Sabah Almasmary, Hana Almasmari, Atik Mounira, Walid Jammoul, Abubaker Abbass, Defendants Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, John Kelly, Kevin McAleenan. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing 1 Complaint,, Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Ayad, Nabih)
January 31, 2017 NOTICE of Error directed to: Nabih H. Ayad re 1 Complaint,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LHos)
January 31, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Arab American Civil Rights League against Donald Trump. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6068348 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Ayad, Nabih)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Requiring Response to Defendants' #33 Status Update. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (see image for details) (LVer)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting #30 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
February 13, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE by All Defendants re #31 MOTION re #15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Order on Motion for TRO MOTION for Order to Dissolve Injunction Status Update (Yuh, Briana)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion to File a Status Update. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
February 10, 2017 Filing 31 MOTION re #15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Order on Motion for TRO MOTION for Order to Dissolve Injunction Status Update by All Defendants. (Yuh, Briana)
February 10, 2017 TEXT-ONLY ORDER/NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 2/13/2017at 9:00 AM is Cancelled (CPin)
February 9, 2017 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by The Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Asian Americans Advancing Justice, National Native American Bar Association, South Asian Bar Association of North America. (Johnson, Robert)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
February 9, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of withdrawal of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc #5). (Ayad, Nabih)
February 9, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Press on behalf of All Defendants. (Press, Joshua)
February 8, 2017 Filing 26 ERRATA Sheet re: #24 Response to Motion filed by Donald Trump, John Kelly, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security. by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Amended Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for a Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 1) (Yuh, Briana)
February 8, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Defendants. (Yuh, Briana)
February 8, 2017 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Yuh, Briana)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Response to Motion to Dissolve Injunction Reply due by 10:00 AM 2/9/2017. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
February 8, 2017 Filing 22 REPLY to Response re #15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Order on Motion for TRO MOTION for Order to Dissolve Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Yuh, Briana)
February 8, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Response to Motion to Dissolve Injunction by All Defendants. (Yuh, Briana)
February 7, 2017 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Order on Motion for TRO MOTION for Order to Dissolve Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Ayad, Nabih)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #18 Stipulation for One Day Enlargement of Time to File Response and Reply Briefs. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
February 7, 2017 Filing 18 STIPULATION re #11 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, by All Defendants (Yuh, Briana)
February 7, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Miriam J. Aukerman on behalf of Hasan Al-Ahmed, Sahla Al-Talaqani. (Aukerman, Miriam)
February 7, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Mona Fadlallah on behalf of Arab American Civil Rights League. (Fadlallah, Mona)
February 6, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dissolve Injunction and Amend Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Response due 2/7/2017 by 5:00 pm. (LVer)
February 6, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Order on Motion for TRO , MOTION for Order to Dissolve Injunction by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Yuh, Briana)
February 6, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Steinberg on behalf of Hasan Al-Ahmed, Sahla Al-Talaqani. (Steinberg, Michael)
February 5, 2017 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Ayad, Nabih)
February 3, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Helal A. Farhat on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Farhat, Helal)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order: Amended Complaint due by 2/5/17; Response due by 2/7/2017; Reply due by 2/9/2017; Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2017 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (see image for details and dates) (LVer)
February 3, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Briana Yuh on behalf of All Defendants. (Yuh, Briana)
February 3, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie C. Qandah on behalf of Arab American Civil Rights League. (Qandah, Natalie) Modified on 2/3/2017 (LHos).[DOCUMENT IS AN APPEARANCE FOR MONA FADLALLAH AND NATALIE QANDAH. ADVISED MS. FADLALLAH TO FILE AN APPEARANCE USING HER LOGIN]
February 2, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/2/2017 (Court Reporter: Janice Coleman) (CPin)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
February 2, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Relevant Authority by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Memorandum from Counsel to the President) (Westwater, Gisela) Modified on 2/3/2017 (LHos).
February 2, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gisela Westwater on behalf of All Defendants. (Westwater, Gisela)
February 2, 2017 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Ayad, Nabih)
February 2, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kassem M. Dakhlallah on behalf of Arab American Civil Rights League. (Dakhlallah, Kassem)
January 31, 2017 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LHos)
January 31, 2017 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (LHos)
January 31, 2017 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, Kevin McAleenan, Donald Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection* (LHos)
January 31, 2017 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Samir Almasmari, Sabah Almasmary, Hana Almasmari, Atik Mounira, Walid Jammoul, Abubaker Abbass, Defendants Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, John Kelly, Kevin McAleenan. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Complaint,, Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Ayad, Nabih)
January 31, 2017 NOTICE of Error directed to: Nabih H. Ayad re #1 Complaint,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LHos)
January 31, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Arab American Civil Rights League against Donald Trump. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6068348 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Ayad, Nabih)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arab American Civil Rights League et al v. Donald Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arab American Civil Rights League
Represented By: Natalie C. Qandah
Represented By: Mona Fadlallah
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Represented By: Kassem M. Dakhlallah
Represented By: Helal A. Farhat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kokab Algazali
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hend Alshawaish
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atik Mounira
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abubaker Abbass
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naji Algahaim
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samir Almasmari
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hana Almasmari
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaika Shagera
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yusra Alsoufi
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walid Jammoul
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sahla Al-Talaqani
Represented By: Miriam J. Aukerman
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Represented By: Michael J. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hasan Al-Ahmed
Represented By: Miriam J. Aukerman
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Represented By: Michael J. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabah Almasmary
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Represented By: Briana Yuh
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Briana Yuh
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Briana Yuh
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kelly
Represented By: Briana Yuh
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Briana Yuh
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality
Represented By: Robert A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Americans Advancing Justice
Represented By: Robert A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Native American Bar Association
Represented By: Robert A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: South Asian Bar Association of North America
Represented By: Robert A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?