Leeal et al v. Ditech Financial LLC, f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Mati Leeal and Malka Leeal
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC, f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv10645
Filed: March 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Leitman
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER (1) Granting Defendant's 57 Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims and (2) Directing Defendant to Submit a Proposed Judgment. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION AND ORDER (1) Granting Defendant's 49 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and (2) Denying Without Prejudice Defendant's Request for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying Defendant's 30 Motion for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to Attend Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. (Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2018 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (1) Denying Defendant's 3 Motion to Dismiss, (2) Staying this Case, and (3) Directing Defendant to File Motion in State Action. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leeal et al v. Ditech Financial LLC, f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mati Leeal
Represented By: David A. Chasnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malka Leeal
Represented By: David A. Chasnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC, f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Courtney A. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?