Farnsworth et al v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Brandon Farnsworth and Tyrone Williams
Defendant: Carey Johnson
Case Number: 2:2017cv10966
Filed: March 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Lenawee
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 41 Motion to Make Copies - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 34 Motion for Court Order to Make Copies - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S 35 Motion for Leave to Depose Plaintiff- Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Adopting 25 Report and Recommendation and DENYING without prejudice 20 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Carey Johnson Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farnsworth et al v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Farnsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carey Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?