Buck v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Becky Jo Buck
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2017cv11151
Filed: April 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Leitman
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Dismissing Complaint Without Prejudice re 1 Notice of Removal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Terminating Appearance of Attorney David G. Lutz and Concerning Next Steps in Litigation. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (1) Requiring Service of Suspension Order and (2) Requiring In Person Attendance at Status Conference. (IN PERSON Status Conference set for 9/27/2017 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buck v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael J. Blalock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Jo Buck
Represented By: David G. Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?