Findling v. United States of America Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service et al
Plaintiff: David Findling
Defendant: United States of America Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, David W. Thursfield and Linda J Thursfield
Case Number: 2:2017cv13560
Filed: November 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Stafford
Presiding Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION AND ORDER Granting 63 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED ORDER granting defendant Linda Thursfield's Emergency MOTION for Release of Funds from Receiver and taking under advisement requests for attorney's fees, to hold Receiver in Contempt and to Remove Receiver 51 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 United States' Emergency Motion to Stay of Order of Distribution of Interpleaded Funds. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPINION AND ORDER granting 30 defendant Linda Thursfield's Motion for Summary Judgment and for Immediate Relief. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER denying 12 defendant United States' Motion to Dismiss; granting 21 plaintiff's Motion for Authority to deposit funds. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Findling v. United States of America Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Findling
Represented By: Erica J. Ehrlichman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Thursfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda J Thursfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?