Yelder v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Mr. Jerome Yelder
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv10576
Filed: February 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
2 Judge: Stephanie Dawkins DavisM
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Filing 34 BILL OF COSTS by Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Endicott, Samuel)
March 20, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for reconsideration by Jerome Yelder. (DPer)
March 6, 2020 Filing 32 JUDGMENT. Approved by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #24 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
September 18, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by Jerome Yelder Notice of Video Evidence Deposition of Dr. Rebecca Summary (Kessinger, Carl)
August 28, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response re #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Devine, Joseph)
August 28, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF HEARING on #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
August 14, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to DEF Motion for Summ. Judgment, Brief, Exhibit Index and Exhibits 1-13 filed by Jerome Yelder. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits 1-13, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13) (Kessinger, Carl)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Carl Kessinger re #26 Notice (Other), #25 Notice (Other). Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DWor)
August 12, 2019 Filing 26 [STRICKEN] NOTICE by Jerome Yelder 1st Amended NOD Video Depo of Dr. Devassy 8.28 at 9am CST (Kessinger, Carl) Modified on 8/13/2019 (DWor).
August 12, 2019 Filing 25 [STRICKEN] NOTICE by Jerome Yelder PL Yelder NOD Video depo of Dr. Devassy 8.28.19 at 9am CST (Kessinger, Carl) Modified on 8/13/2019 (DWor).
July 26, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 -- Gaines Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 -- Yelder Deposition, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 -- Elium Deposition, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 -- Grace Deposition, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 -- Gaines Deposition, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 -- First Half of Decker Deposition, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 -- Second Half of Decker Deposition, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 -- Jackwak Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 -- Bolander Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9 -- Public Law Baord Award, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10 -- Unpublished Cases) (Devine, Joseph)
June 6, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Carl Kessinger re #23 Notice (Other). Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LGra)
June 5, 2019 Filing 23 [STRICKEN] NOTICE by Jerome Yelder 1st Amended Notice of Depo of Courtney Siffre 6.26.19 9am EST Pittsburgh, PA (Kessinger, Carl) Modified on 6/6/2019 (LGra).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend the Case Schedule (Discovery due by 7/1/2019, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/26/2019) Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
April 9, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Carl Kessinger re 20 Notice (Other), 21 Notice (Other). Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SKra)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend the Case Schedule. (Discovery due by 5/2/2019, TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 5/6/2019 10:30 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/27/2019) Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
September 4, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Mary C. O'Donnell on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (O'Donnell, Mary)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
May 24, 2018 NOTICE of Error directed to: John A. Tosto, Carl Kessinger re 15 Certificate of Service. Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SKra)
May 24, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Kessinger on behalf of Jerome Yelder. (Kessinger, Carl)
May 11, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Norfolk Southern Railway Company of the Joint Status Report (Devine, Joseph)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Parties are directed to file a joint status report by Friday, May 11, 2018 that summarizes other pending matters related to this action, describing what they are, and how they relate to this proceeding. Issued by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/1/2019, TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 2/6/2019 11:00 AM, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/25/2019. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (Refer to image for additional dates) (AChu)
May 2, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/2/2018 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (AChu)
May 1, 2018 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mary C. O'Donnell appearing on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (O'Donnell, Mary)
May 1, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph J. McDonnell appearing on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (McDonnell, Joseph)
April 30, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Charles Devine on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Devine, Joseph)
April 28, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John A. Tosto appearing on behalf of Jerome Yelder Co-Counsel (Tosto, John)
April 25, 2018 Filing 8 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Endicott, Samuel)
April 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2018 10:30 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
April 12, 2018 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Norfolk Southern Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation for Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Endicott, Samuel)
April 12, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Endicott, Samuel)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond re #1 Complaint. Response due by 4/12/2018 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
March 14, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service) (Holland, Eric)
February 21, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
February 21, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Norfolk Southern Railway Company* (DWor)
February 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jerome Yelder against Norfolk Southern Railway Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6607007 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne C ounty - County of 1st Defendant: Norfolk Co., Virginia. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Right to Sue) (Holland, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yelder v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Joseph Charles Devine
Represented By: Joseph J. McDonnell
Represented By: Mary C. O'Donnell
Represented By: Samuel E. Endicott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Jerome Yelder
Represented By: Eric D. Holland
Represented By: Carl Kessinger
Represented By: John A. Tosto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?