Sourander v. Hanft et al

Plaintiff: Patrick Alan Sourander
Defendant: Howard Hanft, Daniel Purtill, Brian Osier, Ogemaw County Jail, Ogemaw County, Michigan and Unknown Correctional Officers
Case Number: 2:2018cv11162
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Ogemaw
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A. Drain
Referring Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order 35 OPINION and ORDER Affirming Magistrate Judge Whalen's October 29, 2018 Order Granting Defendants' 25 Motion to Stay and Overruling Plaintiff's Objection re 27 Objection to Report and Recommendation Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 26 ORDER Accepting and Adopting 24 Report and Recommendation and Denying Defendants' 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order 25 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 18 Motion to Stay - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 16 OPINION and ORDER Affirming Magistrate Judge Whalen's June 25, 2018 Order 8 Granting Defendants' Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sourander v. Hanft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Hanft
Represented By: Melinda A. Balian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Purtill
Represented By: Melinda A. Balian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Osier
Represented By: Melinda A. Balian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogemaw County Jail
Represented By: Melinda A. Balian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogemaw County, Michigan
Represented By: Melinda A. Balian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Correctional Officers
Represented By: Melinda A. Balian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Alan Sourander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?