Barringer v. Whitworth et al

Plaintiff: Jessie Barringer
Defendant: Kristin Whitworth, Brenda Carlson and Janette Parket
Case Number: 2:2018cv11174
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Presiding Judge: Bernard A. Friedman
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2018 74 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER denying Plaintiff's 72 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
August 27, 2018 71 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER granting Defendant Parker's 70 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment 68 . Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. Refer to order for additional instructions. (JCur)
July 27, 2018 69 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT WHITWORTHS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (MVer)
July 25, 2018 67 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 65 MOTION for Default Judgment and/or Summary Judgment as to Brenda Carlson, Janette Parket and Notice of Hearing: (Miscellaneous Hearing regarding damages set for 9/4/2018 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman) - Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
July 3, 2018 66 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER Denying Defendant Carlson's and Defendant Parker's Motions to Dismiss 57 , 58 . Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
May 31, 2018 50 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER granting Defendant Whitworth's 23 Motion to Dismiss and denying as moot Defendant Whitworth's 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barringer v. Whitworth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Barringer
Represented By: Collin H. Nyeholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Whitworth
Represented By: Marlo D. Bruch
Represented By: David E. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janette Parket
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?