Bellenbaum-Martin v. Social Security

Plaintiff: Renee Bellenbaum-Martin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2018cv12276
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Saginaw
0 Judge: Denise Page Hood
1 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney General served on August 14, 2018. (Taylor, Matthew)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Social Security Administration served on August 13, 2018. (Taylor, Matthew)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/10/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Taylor, Matthew)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Santen on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Santen, Sean)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Commissioner of Social Security* (DPer)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (THac)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SKra)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Renee Bellenbaum-Martin. (Taylor, Matthew)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Renee Bellenbaum-Martin against Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Saginaw - County Where Action Arose: Saginaw - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Taylor, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellenbaum-Martin v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Bellenbaum-Martin
Represented By: Matthew F. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sean Santen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?