Sinistaj v. Department of Homeland Security et al

Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Department of Homeland Security and Immigration and Customs Enforcement Field Office Director
Petitioner: Djon Sinistaj
Case Number: 2:2018cv12289
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 8:1105
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Djon Sinistaj. (Pastor Cardinale, Caridad)
July 23, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/23/2018 (CPin)
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Vanessa Miree Mays appearing on behalf of Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Immigration and Customs Enforcement Field Office Director (Mays, Vanessa)
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of. (Pastor Cardinale, Caridad)
July 23, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Djon Sinistaj served on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Pastor Cardinale, Caridad)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 Emergency PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Regarding Deportation Emergency Stay Request filed by Djon Sinistaj against All Defendants, Receipt No: 0645-6827063 - Fee: 5 dollars. (Pastor Cardinale, Caridad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sinistaj v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Vanessa Miree Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Vanessa Miree Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement Field Office Director
Represented By: Vanessa Miree Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Djon Sinistaj
Represented By: Caridad Pastor Cardinale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?