Beaumont Hospital-Wayne f/k/a Oakwood Annapolis Hospital v. Azar, II

Plaintiff: Beaumont Hospital-Wayne f/k/a Oakwood Annapolis Hospital
Defendant: Matthew J. Schneider, Alex M. Azar, II and Jeff Sessions
Case Number: 2:2018cv12352
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:2005
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint. Response due by 11/13/2018 Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Attorney General of the United States served on 08/03/2018. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (Marcus, Kenneth)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Secretary of Health and Human Services served on 08/02/2018. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (Marcus, Kenneth)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Matthew J. Schneider served on 7/31/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Marcus, Kenneth)
August 10, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Secretary of Health and Human Services served on 08/02/2018. (Marcus, Kenneth)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. United States Attorney General served on 08/03/2018. (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (NAhm)
July 27, 2018 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Jeff Sessions, Matthew J. Schneider. (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 27, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Alex M. Azar, II* (NAhm)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF FINAL ADVERSE AGENCY DECISION ON MEDICARE REIMBURSEMENT filed by Beaumont Hospital-Wayne f/k/a Oakwood Annapolis Hospital against Alex M. Azar, II. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6836245 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Document Continuation Statement of Disclosure) (Marcus, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaumont Hospital-Wayne f/k/a Oakwood Annapolis Hospital v. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beaumont Hospital-Wayne f/k/a Oakwood Annapolis Hospital
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?