Graveline v Johnson, et al
Plaintiff: Willard H Johnson, Kellie K Deming, Christopher Graveline and Michael Leibson
Defendant: Ruth Johnson and Sally Williams
Case Number: 2:2018cv12354
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018 03:00 PM before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts SEE NOTICE FOR DETAILS (CPin)
September 12, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Ruth Johnson, Sally Williams. (Barton, Denise)
September 6, 2018 Filing 19 OPINION from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #13 Notice of Appeal filed by Sally Williams, Ruth Johnson [Appeal Case Number 18-1992] (DWor)
August 30, 2018 Filing 18 Appeal Fee received for #13 Notice of Appeal filed by Sally Williams, Ruth Johnson in the amount of $ 505.00 - Receipt No. DET116456. (BHan)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
August 30, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Stay re #12 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Pending Emergency Appeal filed by Kellie K Deming, Christopher Graveline, Willard H Johnson, Michael Leibson. (Hall, Oliver)
August 29, 2018 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Plaintiffs' response brief to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay #14 due by 12:00 noon on 8/30/18. (LVer)
August 29, 2018 Filing 15 Certificate of Service re #13 Notice of Appeal. (ATee)
August 29, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay re #12 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Pending Emergency Appeal by Ruth Johnson, Sally Williams. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1. Affidavit of Sally Williams) (Meingast, Heather)
August 29, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Sally Williams, Ruth Johnson re #12 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. (Meingast, Heather)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER Granting #4 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Oliver B. Hall on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hall, Oliver)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Answer/Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Response due by 9/12/2018 Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
August 22, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts: Motion Hearing held on 8/22/2018 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Willard H Johnson, Michael Leibson, Kellie K Deming, Christopher Graveline Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Janice Coleman) (CPin)
August 20, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY to Response re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by All Plaintiffs. (Tedards, William)
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ruth Johnson, Sally Williams. (Barton, Denise)
August 7, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sally Williams served on 8/1/2018, answer due 8/22/2018. (DPer)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ruth Johnson served on 8/1/2018, answer due 8/22/2018. (DPer)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Denise C. Barton appearing on behalf of Ruth Johnson, Sally Williams (Barton, Denise)
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Tedards, William)
August 1, 2018 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Order on Denise Barton at 525 West Ottaw Street, 5th Floor, Lansing, MI 48909. (LVer)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 811 before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
August 1, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/1/2018 (CPin)
August 1, 2018 Set Deadlines: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 8/1/2018 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. Plaintiff's counsel must initiate the call. (LVer)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Ruth Johnson, Sally Williams* (LGra)
July 30, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Christopher Graveline, Kellie K Deming, Michael Leibson, Willard H Johnson against Ruth Johnson, Sally Williams. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6836652 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Ingham. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Richard Winger, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Christopher Graveline, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Willard H Johnson, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Michael Leibson, #6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Kellie K Deming, #7 Exhibit F - Declaration of Janet M Urbanic, #8 Exhibit G - Declaration of Christa Byrd, #9 Exhibit H - David Foster email communication) (Tedards, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graveline v Johnson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willard H Johnson
Represented By: William P. Tedards, Jr.
Represented By: Oliver B. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie K Deming
Represented By: William P. Tedards, Jr.
Represented By: Oliver B. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Graveline
Represented By: William P. Tedards, Jr.
Represented By: Oliver B. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Leibson
Represented By: William P. Tedards, Jr.
Represented By: Oliver B. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Johnson
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Denise C. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Williams
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Denise C. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?