Era Polymers Proprietary Limited v. BASF SE et al
Plaintiff: Era Polymers Proprietary Limited
Defendant: Wanhua Chemical (America), Ltd., BASF SE, BASF Corporation, DowDuPont Inc., Huntsman International LLC, Wanhua Chemical Group Co., Ltd., Covestro, LLC, Bayer AG, The Dow Chemical Company, Bayer Corporation and Covestro, AG
Case Number: 2:2018cv12357
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
3 Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Patrick E. Cafferty on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Cafferty, Patrick)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #9 Agreed Motion to Extend All Deadlines Until After the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Rules on Pending Motion for Transfer. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
August 10, 2018 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by BASF Corporation identifying Corporate Parent BASF SE for BASF Corporation. (Marovitz, Andrew)
August 10, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Marovitz on behalf of BASF Corporation. (Marovitz, Andrew)
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION TO EXTEND All Deadlines Until After the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Rules on Pending Motion for Transfer (Agreed) by BASF Corporation, Bayer Corporation, Covestro, LLC, Huntsman International LLC, The Dow Chemical Company, Wanhua Chemical (America), Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit (1) JPML Docket, #3 Exhibit (2) JPML Briefing Schedule, #4 Exhibit (3) Order, #5 Exhibit (4) Order) (Marovitz, Andrew)
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Boni on behalf of Era Polymers Proprietary Limited. (Boni, Michael)
August 7, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *BASF Corporation, BASF SE, Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Covestro, AG, Covestro, LLC, DowDuPont Inc., Huntsman International LLC, The Dow Chemical Company, Wanhua Chemical (America), Ltd., Wanhua Chemical Group Co., Ltd.* (SKra)
August 7, 2018 REQUEST for SUMMONS for All Defendants. (Cafferty, Patrick)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Laurie J. Michelson and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to District Judge Victoria A. Roberts and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (NAhm)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Era Polymers Proprietary Limited (Cafferty, Patrick)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon K. Robertson on behalf of Era Polymers Proprietary Limited. (Robertson, Sharon)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica B. Weiner on behalf of Era Polymers Proprietary Limited. (Weiner, Jessica)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Meriwether on behalf of Era Polymers Proprietary Limited. (Meriwether, Ellen)
July 30, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-6836973 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of Country - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of Country. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): US District Court ED Mich, 18-cv-12089, Judge Victoria A. Roberts] (Cafferty, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Era Polymers Proprietary Limited v. BASF SE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanhua Chemical (America), Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew Marovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Marovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DowDuPont Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsman International LLC
Represented By: Andrew Marovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanhua Chemical Group Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covestro, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Marovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Andrew Marovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Marovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covestro, AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Era Polymers Proprietary Limited
Represented By: Ellen Meriwether
Represented By: Patrick E. Cafferty
Represented By: Sharon K. Robertson
Represented By: Jessica B. Weiner
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?