Griffin et al v. Nexen Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Griffin and Maxwell McKearnen
Defendant: Steven Kirka, Amazon.com, Inc. and Nexen Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv12369
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Steven Kirka waiver sent on 8/4/2018, answer due 10/3/2018; Nexen Corporation waiver sent on 8/4/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (Yaldou, Bryan)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification #1 Complaint, and re #2 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally, ( Responsive Pleading due by 10/2/2018), Set Motion as to #2 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally, :( Defendants' Response due by 11/16/2018) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (TMcg)
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Amazon.com, Inc. (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie L. Sweitzer on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc.. (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith E. Riccio on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc.. (Riccio, Meredith)
July 31, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *Nexen Corporation* (EKar)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Steven Kirka* (EKar)
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Amazon.com, Inc.* (EKar)
July 31, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (EKar)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT to Sue by Maxwell McKearnen (Yaldou, Bryan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 CONSENT to Sue by Gregory Griffin (Yaldou, Bryan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit B - Proposed Notice & Consent, #4 Exhibit C - Griffin Declaration, #5 Exhibit D - McKearnen Declaration, #6 Exhibit E - Bunyan v Spectrum Brands, #7 Exhibit F - Crawford v Lexington-Fayette, #8 Exhibit G - Douglas v GE Energy, #9 Exhibit H - Flexter v Action Temporary, #10 Exhibit I - Frye v Baptist Mem'l, #11 Exhibit J - LaFleur v Dollar Tree Stores, #12 Exhibit K - Lankford v CWL Invs, #13 Exhibit L - Lee v Gab Telecom, #14 Exhibit M Lewis v Chow Time LLC, #15 Exhibit N - Lynch v Dining Concepts Grp, #16 Exhibit O Phelps v MC Commc'ns, #17 Exhibit P - Ritz v Mike Rory Corp, #18 Exhibit Q - Robinson v Roberts Hotels, #19 Exhibit R - Shabazz v Asurion, #20 Exhibit S - Shipes v Amurcom, #21 Exhibit T Smith v Lowe's, #22 Exhibit Taylor v Pittsburgh Mercy) (Yaldou, Bryan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6838762 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Griffin Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - McKearnen Declaraion, #4 Exhibit C - US DOL Fissured Workplace, #5 Exhibit D - Ali v Piron, #6 Exhibit E - Dowd v DirecTV, #7 Exhibit F - Parrott v Marriott) (Yaldou, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin et al v. Nexen Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Griffin
Represented By: Bryan Yaldou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxwell McKearnen
Represented By: Bryan Yaldou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Kirka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Represented By: Meredith E. Riccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?