Majeske v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Jill Majeske
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Quicken Loans and Affiliated Companies Welfare Benefits Plan and Quicken Loans Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv12403
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued for *Quicken Loans and Affiliated Companies Welfare Benefits Plan* (LGra)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jill Majeske as to Quicken Loans Inc. (Liepshutz, Greg)
September 28, 2018 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Quicken Loans and Affiliated Companies Welfare Benefits Plan. (Liepshutz, Greg)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Jill Majeske against Quicken Loans and Affiliated Companies Welfare Benefits Plan. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Liepshutz, Greg)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Quicken Loans Inc. served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Liepshutz, Greg)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Quicken Loans Inc.* (LGra)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jill Majeske as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (Liepshutz, Greg)
September 7, 2018 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Quicken Loans Inc.. (Liepshutz, Greg)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Jill Majeske against Quicken Loans Inc.. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Liepshutz, Greg)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston* (LGra)
August 3, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jill Majeske against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6844541 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Liepshutz, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Majeske v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans and Affiliated Companies Welfare Benefits Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Majeske
Represented By: Greg M. Liepshutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?