Primal Brands, LLC et al v. Mainstream Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ronald Berkbuegler and Primal Brands, LLC
Defendant: Mainstream Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv12447
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
County: Genesee
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Paul D Borman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE re #5 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading ; RESPONSE SUBMITTED AND SATISFACTORY. (DTof)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Disclosure of LLC members: Response due by 8/31/2018 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Primal Brands, LLC (Moore, Todd)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 Patent Report Sent To Washington (Moore, Todd)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Mainstream Holdings, Inc.* (SKra)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by All Plaintiffs against Mainstream Holdings, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6850526 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Cottonwood. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A U.S. Patent No. 10,010,068, #4 Exhibit B Exclusive License Agreement, #5 Exhibit C Instruction Manual of Big Game Hightower XTL stand, #6 Exhibit D On-line Advertisement of Big Game Hightower XTL stand, #7 Exhibit E Claim Chart) (Moore, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primal Brands, LLC et al v. Mainstream Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainstream Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Berkbuegler
Represented By: Todd Lewis Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primal Brands, LLC
Represented By: Todd Lewis Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?