Promote the Vote et al v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Legner, Kellie Konsor, Promote the Vote and James Murray
Defendant: Jeannette Bradshaw, Ruth Johnson, Sally Williams, Colleen Pero, Julie Matuzak and Norman D Shinkle
Case Number: 2:2018cv12692
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond re #1 Complaint. Response due by 11/19/2018 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
September 18, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE by Kellie Konsor, Lauren Legner, James Murray of withdrawal of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order And/Or Preliminary Injunction . (Dolente, Sharon)
September 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/5/2018 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (AChu)
September 4, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 9/5/2018 03:00 PM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
September 4, 2018 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 9/6/2018 is Cancelled (AChu)
August 31, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order And/Or Preliminary Injunction filed by Jeannette Bradshaw, Ruth Johnson, Julie Matuzak, Colleen Pero, Norman D Shinkle, Sally Williams. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1. Staff Report, #3 Exhibit 2. September 6, 2018 Board Meeting Notice, #4 Exhibit 3. September 7, 2018 Board Meeting Notice) (Meingast, Heather)
August 31, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order And/Or Preliminary Injunction, #8 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, by All Plaintiffs (Korobkin, Daniel)
August 31, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ellen Gurewitz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Gurewitz, Mary Ellen)
August 31, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Heather S. Meingast appearing on behalf of Jeannette Bradshaw, Ruth Johnson, Julie Matuzak, Colleen Pero, Norman D Shinkle, Sally Williams (Meingast, Heather)
August 31, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Denise C. Barton appearing on behalf of Jeannette Bradshaw, Ruth Johnson, Julie Matuzak, Colleen Pero, Norman D Shinkle, Sally Williams (Barton, Denise)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order And/Or Preliminary Injunction: Response due by 9/3/2018, Reply due by 9/5/2018 by 12:00 PM, Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2018 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg - Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (CCie)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Korobkin, Daniel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order And/Or Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Transcript of Bd of Canvassers 8/24/18 Mtg, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Linton A. Mohammed, #4 Exhibit 3 - Transcript of Bd of Canvasser 4/26/18 Mtg, #5 Exhibit 4 - Supplemental Declaration of Sharon Dolente) (Nickelhoff, Andrew)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Dolente on behalf of Kellie Konsor, Lauren Legner, James Murray. (Dolente, Sharon)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Steinberg on behalf of Kellie Konsor, Lauren Legner, James Murray. (Steinberg, Michael)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S. Korobkin on behalf of Kellie Konsor, Lauren Legner, James Murray. (Korobkin, Daniel)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
August 29, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6881372 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Ingham. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Bureau of Elections Petition Guidelines, #3 Exhibit B - PTV Petition, #4 Exhibit C - 8/8/18 Bureau of Elections Notice, #5 Exhibit D - 8/14/18 Bureau of Elections Notice, #6 Exhibit E - 8/15/18 Email from Melissa Malerman, #7 Exhibit F - Petition Signers Affidavits, #8 Exhibit G - 8/21/18 Email and Letter to Sally Williams, #9 Exhibit H - 8/22/18 Email and Letter to Sally Williams, #10 Exhibit I - Sharon Dolente Affidavit) (Nickelhoff, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Promote the Vote et al v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannette Bradshaw
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Denise C. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Johnson
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Denise C. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Williams
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Denise C. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Pero
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Denise C. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Matuzak
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Denise C. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman D Shinkle
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Denise C. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Legner
Represented By: Mary Ellen Gurewitz
Represented By: Daniel S. Korobkin
Represented By: Michael J. Steinberg
Represented By: Sharon Dolente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Konsor
Represented By: Mary Ellen Gurewitz
Represented By: Daniel S. Korobkin
Represented By: Michael J. Steinberg
Represented By: Sharon Dolente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Promote the Vote
Represented By: Andrew A. Nickelhoff
Represented By: Mary Ellen Gurewitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Murray
Represented By: Mary Ellen Gurewitz
Represented By: Daniel S. Korobkin
Represented By: Michael J. Steinberg
Represented By: Sharon Dolente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?