Ogden v. Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Ogden
Defendant: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. and LC Trademarks, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv12792
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David M Lawson
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 11/19/2018 is Cancelled re #17 Notice to Appear. (SPin)
November 2, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF HEARING on #20 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2019 at 3:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
November 2, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Stipulated Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Christopher Ogden (Miller, E.)
November 1, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Hackett on behalf of Christopher Ogden. (Hackett, Stephanie)
October 30, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean C. Russell on behalf of Christopher Ogden. (Russell, Sean)
October 30, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle E. Conston on behalf of Christopher Ogden. (Conston, Michelle)
October 26, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by LC Trademarks, Inc., Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Franchise Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Erin Martin, #4 Exhibit 3 - Appendix of Unpublished Authorities, #5 Exhibit 4 - Measurement of Market Concentration) (Zisk, Robert)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Extending Page Limits. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
October 24, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extension of Page Limits For Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Response by LC Trademarks, Inc., Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. (Huget, J.)
October 18, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 10:30 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin)
October 12, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Y. Brandt on behalf of Christopher Ogden. (Brandt, Derek)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint filed by Christopher Ogden. Answer or Response due by 10/26/2018. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
September 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Sturm on behalf of All Defendants. (Sturm, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Zisk on behalf of All Defendants. (Zisk, Robert)
September 26, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by LC Trademarks, Inc., Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. (Huget, J.)
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Michael Wenner on behalf of LC Trademarks, Inc., Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.. (Wenner, Adam)
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Ettinger on behalf of LC Trademarks, Inc., Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.. (Ettinger, David)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A. Lienhardt on behalf of Christopher Ogden. (Lienhardt, Dennis)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Michael Huget on behalf of LC Trademarks, Inc., Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.. (Huget, J.)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. LC Trademarks, Inc. served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Almonrode, Sharon)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Almonrode, Sharon)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. McCune on behalf of Christopher Ogden. (McCune, Richard)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.* (ATee)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *LC Trademarks, Inc.* (ATee)
September 7, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (ATee)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of Christopher Ogden. (Almonrode, Sharon)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Christopher Ogden against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6895222 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Corporate Website Franchising Information, #3 Exhibit 2-Franchise Opportunities, #4 Exhibit 3-Antitrust Guidance for Human Resource Professionals, #5 Exhibit 4-05/20/2014 CNN Money Article, #6 Exhibit 5-02/02/18 Marketplace Article, #7 Exhibit 6-09/27/2017 New York Times Article, #8 Exhibit 7-02/28/2018 New York Times Article, #9 Exhibit 8-2014 Hart Research Memorandum) (Miller, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ogden v. Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Michael L. Sturm
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Represented By: Robert L. Zisk
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LC Trademarks, Inc.
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Michael L. Sturm
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Represented By: Robert L. Zisk
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ogden
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Sean C. Russell
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: Derek Y. Brandt
Represented By: Michelle E. Conston
Represented By: Stephanie A. Hackett
Represented By: Richard D. McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?